This case was last updated from PACER on 01/17/2020 at 07:25:05 (UTC).

Washington v. Elwood Staffing

Case Summary

On 11/18/2019 Washington filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Elwood Staffing. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Karon O Bowdre and Corey L Maze. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01865

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Karon O Bowdre

Corey L Maze

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rochelle Linus Washington

Anniston, AL 36201

Defendant

Elwood Staffing

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Elwood Staffing, filed by Rochelle Linus Washington. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(JLC) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

#4

(#4) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 12/17/2019. (SRD) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

#3

(#3) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. This case is hereby reassigned to Judge Corey L Maze for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre no longer assigned to case. Please use case number 1:19-cv-1865-CLM on all future pleadings. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 11/22/2019. (JLC) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Rochelle Linus Washington. (JLC) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rochelle Linus Washington. Elwood Staffing served (no date on green card). (KEK) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

1 #1

Exhibit A

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Elwood Staffing. Delivered to US Marshals for service. (KEK) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rochelle Linus Washington. Elwood Staffing served (no date on green card). (KEK) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to Elwood Staffing. Delivered to US Marshals for service. (KEK) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 12/17/2019. (SRD) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. This case is hereby reassigned to Judge Corey L Maze for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre no longer assigned to case. Please use case number 1:19-cv-1865-CLM on all future pleadings. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 11/22/2019. (JLC) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Rochelle Linus Washington. (JLC) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Elwood Staffing, filed by Rochelle Linus Washington. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(JLC) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.