This case was last updated from PACER on 02/15/2020 at 08:20:07 (UTC).

Washington v. Cook County Department Of Corrections et al

Case Summary

On 12/17/2019 Washington filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Cook County Department Of Corrections. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is John J. Tharp, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-08247

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John J. Tharp, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tayah M Washington

Chicago, IL 60617

Defendant

Cook County Department Of Corrections

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) APPLICATION by Plaintiff Tayah M Washington for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. (nsf, ) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#2

(#2) PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet. (Attachment) (nsf, ) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#4

(#4) ORDER: Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #3 is denied without prejudice. Plaintiff must either (a) submit a renewed application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, as detailed in this order, or (b) pay the statutory $400 filing fee. In addition, Plaintiff's complaint #1 is dismissed without prejudice for failure to state a claim. If Plaintiff wants to proceed with this lawsuit, she must also submit an amended complaint that states a federal claim against proper defendants. If Plaintiff does not comply with all of these directives by January 31, 2020, the Court will summarily dismiss this case. The Clerk is directed to send Plaintiff a copy of this order, a blank application to proceed in forma pauperis, an amended complaint form, a blank USM-285 form, and instructions. Plaintiff must promptly submit a change-of- address notification if her address changes, or this action will be subject to dismissal for failure to comply with a Court order and for failure to prosecute. Signed by the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr on 12/23/2019. Mailed notice (nsf, ) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

#1

(#1) RECEIVED Complaint and 0 copies by Tayah M Washington. (Exhibits) (nsf, ) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/26/2019
  • DocketMAILED a copy of this order, a blank application to proceed in forma pauperis, an amended complaint form, a blank USM-285 form, and instructions to plaintiff. (nsf, ) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER: Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #3 is denied without prejudice. Plaintiff must either (a) submit a renewed application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, as detailed in this order, or (b) pay the statutory $400 filing fee. In addition, Plaintiff's complaint #1 is dismissed without prejudice for failure to state a claim. If Plaintiff wants to proceed with this lawsuit, she must also submit an amended complaint that states a federal claim against proper defendants. If Plaintiff does not comply with all of these directives by January 31, 2020, the Court will summarily dismiss this case. The Clerk is directed to send Plaintiff a copy of this order, a blank application to proceed in forma pauperis, an amended complaint form, a blank USM-285 form, and instructions. Plaintiff must promptly submit a change-of- address notification if her address changes, or this action will be subject to dismissal for failure to comply with a Court order and for failure to prosecute. Signed by the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr on 12/23/2019. Mailed notice (nsf, ) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) APPLICATION by Plaintiff Tayah M Washington for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. (nsf, ) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet. (Attachment) (nsf, ) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) RECEIVED Complaint and 0 copies by Tayah M Washington. (Exhibits) (nsf, ) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.