This case was last updated from PACER on 09/21/2019 at 07:28:17 (UTC).

Washington v. Commissioner of the Social Security Administration

Case Summary

On 07/23/2019 Washington filed a Government Benefit - Social Security lawsuit against Commissioner of the Social Security Administration. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District. The Judges overseeing this case are J Michelle Childs and Kaymani D West. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-02056

  • Filing Date:

    07/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Carolina District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

J Michelle Childs

Kaymani D West

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kristine Washington

Defendant

Commissioner of the Social Security Administration

Interested Party

Social Security Administrative Record

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Harry A Oxner

Attorney at Oxner and Stacy

Po Box 481

Georgetown, SC 29442

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 7/27/2019. (gnan ) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#1

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed Acknowledgment of Service on the Commissioner of Social Security by Kristine Washington. (Attachments: #1 Acknowledgment of Service)(Oxner, Harry) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kristine Washington. (Attachments: #1 Acknowledgment of Service)(Oxner, Harry) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kristine Washington. Commissioner of the Social Security Administration served on 8/6/2019, pursuant to Local Rule 83.VII.03 answer due 12/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Green card)(Oxner, Harry) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • (#8) DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 7 Reason: Incorrect filing, to be refiled by filing user. (gnan ) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 7/27/2019. (gnan ) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Kristine Washington. (Oxner, Harry) (Modified on 7/23/2019 to add case number to document). (gnan ). (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Commissioner of the Social Security Administration. U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Service due by 10/21/2019.(gnan ) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Commissioner of the Social Security Administration ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8571779.) Clerk's Note: See 28:636(b)(1)(C)(4)(c)(1) and Local Rule 83.VII.02 regarding Consents to Proceed before Magistrate Judge in Social Security cases. Consent to Proceed before Magistrate Judge forms are available on the Court's website, filed by Kristine Washington. Service due by 10/21/2019.(gnan ) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.