This case was last updated from PACER on 01/23/2021 at 12:25:27 (UTC).

WASHINGTON v. ASCENSION HEALTH MINISTRY SERVICE CENTER, LLC

Case Summary

On 11/24/2020 WASHINGTON filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against ASCENSION HEALTH MINISTRY SERVICE CENTER, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Doris L. Pryor and Jane Magnus-Stinson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00622

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Doris L. Pryor

Presiding Judge

Jane Magnus-Stinson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KRISTINA WASHINGTON

Defendants

ASCENSION HEALTH MINISTRY SERVICE CENTER, LLC D/B/A ASCENSION MINISTRY SERVICE CENTER

ASCENSION HEALTH MINISTRY SERVICE CENTER, LLC doing business as ASCENSION MINISTRY SERVICE CENTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Eric A. Frey

Attorney at FREY LAW FIRM

401 Ohio Street, Suite B13

Terre Haute, IN 47807

Defendant Attorneys

Bianca Black

Attorney at LITTLER MENDELSON, P.C. (Indianapolis)

111 Monument Circle, Suite 702

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Emily L. Connor

Attorney at LITTLER MENDELSON, P.C. (Indianapolis)

111 Monument Circle, Suite 702

Indianapolis, IN 46204

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) ANSWER to Complaint , filed by ASCENSION HEALTH MINISTRY SERVICE CENTER, LLC.(Connor, Emily) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

#10

(#10) ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE - An Initial Pretrial Conference is set for 2/3/2021 at 11:30 AM (Eastern Time) by Telephone before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. SEE ORDER for additional instruction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 12/4/2020.(KAA) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Eric A. Frey on behalf of Plaintiff KRISTINA WASHINGTON. (Frey, Eric) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant ASCENSION HEALTH MINISTRY SERVICE CENTER, LLC. (Black, Bianca) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

#7

(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by ASCENSION HEALTH MINISTRY SERVICE CENTER, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Ascension Health Alliance, Inc. for ASCENSION HEALTH MINISTRY SERVICE CENTER, LLC.. (Connor, Emily) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

#6

(#6) PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson. (RSF) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE to File Corporate Disclosure Statement to ASCENSION HEALTH MINISTRY SERVICE CENTER, LLC. (RAGS) (RSF) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

#4

(#4) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (RSF) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Bianca Black on behalf of Defendant ASCENSION HEALTH MINISTRY SERVICE CENTER, LLC D/B/A ASCENSION MINISTRY SERVICE CENTER. (Black, Bianca) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Emily L. Connor on behalf of Defendant ASCENSION HEALTH MINISTRY SERVICE CENTER, LLC D/B/A ASCENSION MINISTRY SERVICE CENTER. (Connor, Emily) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B - Complaint

1 #1

Exhibit A - State Court Record

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Vigo County Superior Court, case number 84D02-2011-CT-005731, filed by ASCENSION HEALTH MINISTRY SERVICE CENTER, LLC D/B/A ASCENSION MINISTRY SERVICE CENTER. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-6292742) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Record, #2 Exhibit B - Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Connor, Emily) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER to Complaint , filed by ASCENSION HEALTH MINISTRY SERVICE CENTER, LLC.(Connor, Emily) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE - An Initial Pretrial Conference is set for 2/3/2021 at 11:30 AM (Eastern Time) by Telephone before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. SEE ORDER for additional instruction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 12/4/2020.(KAA) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Eric A. Frey on behalf of Plaintiff KRISTINA WASHINGTON. (Frey, Eric) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant ASCENSION HEALTH MINISTRY SERVICE CENTER, LLC. (Black, Bianca) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by ASCENSION HEALTH MINISTRY SERVICE CENTER, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Ascension Health Alliance, Inc. for ASCENSION HEALTH MINISTRY SERVICE CENTER, LLC.. (Connor, Emily) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson. (RSF) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE to File Corporate Disclosure Statement to ASCENSION HEALTH MINISTRY SERVICE CENTER, LLC. (RAGS) (RSF) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (RSF) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Bianca Black on behalf of Defendant ASCENSION HEALTH MINISTRY SERVICE CENTER, LLC D/B/A ASCENSION MINISTRY SERVICE CENTER. (Black, Bianca) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Emily L. Connor on behalf of Defendant ASCENSION HEALTH MINISTRY SERVICE CENTER, LLC D/B/A ASCENSION MINISTRY SERVICE CENTER. (Connor, Emily) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Vigo County Superior Court, case number 84D02-2011-CT-005731, filed by ASCENSION HEALTH MINISTRY SERVICE CENTER, LLC D/B/A ASCENSION MINISTRY SERVICE CENTER. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-6292742) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Record, #2 Exhibit B - Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Connor, Emily) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ascension Healthcare is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bianca Black