This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/14/2021 at 10:31:49 (UTC).

Washington v. Ables et al

Case Summary

On 10/15/2021 Washington filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Ables. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are John F Heil, III and Jodi F Jayne. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00451

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John F Heil, III

Referral Judge

Jodi F Jayne

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nicholas Washington

Defendants

Jett Autrey Ables

Jett A Ables

Jett Ables

John Doe

Jane Doe

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John Paul Truskett

Attorney at Truskett Law Firm PLLC

2921 East 91St St. South, Suite 100

Tulsa, OK 74137

Defendant Attorneys

Brad Roberson

Attorney at Roberson, Kolker, Cooper & Goeres, P.C.

16408 Muirfield Place

Edmond, OK 73013

Lauren Nicole Watson

Attorney at Roberson, Kolker, Cooper & Goeres, P.C.

16408 Muirfield Place

Edmond, OK 73013

Timothy J Prentice

Attorney at Roberson, Kolker, Cooper & Goeres, P.C.

16408 Muirfield Place

Edmond, OK 73013

 

Court Documents

14 #6

Exhibit 6 - Muscogee Nation Med Center

14 #5

Exhibit 5 - Diagnostic Imaging Solutions

14 #4

Exhibit 4 - Eastern Oklahoma Wellness Center

14 #3

Exhibit 3 - Travis Chiropractic

14 #2

Exhibit 2 - Tulsa Medical + Ortho Center

14 #1

Exhibit 1 - Spine + Ortho Specialists

#14

(#14) NOTICE Issuing Subpoenas to Produce Documents by Jett Autrey Ables (With attachments) (Prentice, Timothy) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

#12

(#12) SCHEDULING ORDER by Chief Judge John F Heil, III , setting/resetting scheduling order date(s): ( Dispositive Motions due by 4/25/2022, Discovery due by 5/9/2022, Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/19/2022, Pretrial Conference set for 9/28/2022 at 09:30 AM before Chief Judge John F Heil III, Jury Trial set for 10/17/2022 at 08:45 AM before Chief Judge John F Heil III) (JFH1, Chambers) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

#11

(#11) JOINT STATUS REPORT by Nicholas Washington (Truskett, John) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

#10

(#10) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by John Paul Truskett on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Truskett, John) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

#9

(#9) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Timothy J Prentice on behalf of Jett Autrey Ables [Note: Attorney Timothy J Prentice added to party Jett Autrey Ables(pty:dft).] (Prentice, Timothy) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

#8

(#8) ORDER by Chief Judge John F Heil, III , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 11/22/2021) (JFH1, Chambers) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

#7

(#7) ANSWER (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Jett Autrey Ables (Watson, Lauren) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

#6

(#6) MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge John F Heil, III re: failure to prosecute (JFH1, Chambers) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

#5

#4

#3

2 #2

Exhibit Petition

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE Issuing Subpoenas to Produce Documents by Jett Autrey Ables (With attachments) (Prentice, Timothy) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge John F Heil, III : Modifying the scheduling order to show the trial start time to be 8:45 am, setting/resetting scheduling order date(s): (time change only) ( Jury Trial set for 10/17/2022 at 08:45 AM before Chief Judge John F Heil III) (Re: #12 Scheduling Order,, Setting/Resetting Scheduling Order Date(s), ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (pll, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SCHEDULING ORDER by Chief Judge John F Heil, III , setting/resetting scheduling order date(s): ( Dispositive Motions due by 4/25/2022, Discovery due by 5/9/2022, Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/19/2022, Pretrial Conference set for 9/28/2022 at 09:30 AM before Chief Judge John F Heil III, Jury Trial set for 10/17/2022 at 08:45 AM before Chief Judge John F Heil III) (JFH1, Chambers) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) JOINT STATUS REPORT by Nicholas Washington (Truskett, John) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by John Paul Truskett on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Truskett, John) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Timothy J Prentice on behalf of Jett Autrey Ables [Note: Attorney Timothy J Prentice added to party Jett Autrey Ables(pty:dft).] (Prentice, Timothy) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER by Chief Judge John F Heil, III , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 11/22/2021) (JFH1, Chambers) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Jett Autrey Ables (Watson, Lauren) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge John F Heil, III re: failure to prosecute (JFH1, Chambers) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STATUS REPORT on Removed Action by Jett Autrey Ables (Watson, Lauren) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Brad Roberson on behalf of Jett Autrey Ables [Note: Attorney Brad Roberson added to party Jett Autrey Ables(pty:dft).] (Roberson, Brad) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Lauren Nicole Watson on behalf of Jett Autrey Ables (Watson, Lauren) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Removal with Jury Demand from Tulsa County District Court, case number CJ-2021-2680 (paid $402 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2496057) by Jett Autrey Ables (With attachments) (Watson, Lauren) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Jett Autrey Ables (Watson, Lauren) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed in State Court against Jett Autrey Ables, Jane Doe, John Doe by Nicholas Washington (ll, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer John Paul Truskett