This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/27/2021 at 08:16:47 (UTC).

Washington Schools Risk Management Pool v. American Re-Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 06/28/2021 Washington Schools Risk Management Pool filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against American Re-Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard A. Jones. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00874

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard A. Jones

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Washington Schools Risk Management Pool

Defendants

Sompo International Reinsurance

Endurance Specialty Insurance Ltd.

American Re-Insurance Company

Endurance Specialty Insurance Ltd

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Paul Mark Rosner

Attorney at SOHA & LANG PS

1325 Fourth Ave, Ste 2000

Seattle, WA 98101-2570

Sarah E. Davenport

Attorney at SOHA & LANG PS

1325 Fourth Ave, Ste 2000

Seattle, WA 98101-2570

Defendant Attorneys

T. Daniel Heffernan

Attorney at HEFFERNAN LAW GROUP PLLC

1201 Market St

Kirkland, WA 98033

David A Attisani

Attorney at CHOATE HALL & STEWART LLP (MA)

Two International Place

Boston, MA 02110

Kevin J Finnerty

Attorney at CHOATE HALL & STEWART LLP (MA)

Two International Place

Boston, MA 02110

Matthew S Adams

Attorney at FORSBERG & UMLAUF (SEA)

901 5Th Ave Ste 1400

Seattle, WA 98164-1039

Sally Ann Clements

Attorney at FORSBERG & UMLAUF (SEA)

901 5Th Ave Ste 1400

Seattle, WA 98164-1039

 

Court Documents

29 #1

Proposed Order

#29

#28

#27

#26

#25

#24

21 #1

Proposed Order

#21

#4

#3

2 #2

Exhibit

2 #1

Exhibit

#2

1 #3

Certificate of Service

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Complaint

#1

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) Stipulated MOTION to Extend Time to Reply, filed by Defendant Sompo International Reinsurance. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 8/26/2021, (Heffernan, T.) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Washington Schools Risk Management Pool, to #21 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss WSRMPs Claims. (Rosner, Paul) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Washington Schools Risk Management Pool.(Rosner, Paul) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) NOTICE of Supplemental Authority re #24 Response to Motion, #21 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss WSRMPs Claims by Defendant Sompo International Reinsurance (Heffernan, T.) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Washington Schools Risk Management Pool, TO RESPONSE to #14 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment re Arbitration and Choice of Law Provisions in Reinsurance (Rosner, Paul) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) RESPONSE, by Defendant Sompo International Reinsurance, to #14 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment re Arbitration and Choice of Law Provisions in Reinsurance. (Heffernan, T.) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) DECLARATION of John D. O'Connor filed by Defendant Sompo International Reinsurance re #21 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss WSRMPs Claims (Heffernan, T.) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) DECLARATION of Kevin J. Finnerty filed by Defendant Sompo International Reinsurance re #21 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss WSRMPs Claims (Heffernan, T.) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss WSRMPs Claims, filed by Defendant Sompo International Reinsurance. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 8/27/2021, (Heffernan, T.) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Munich Reinsurance America, Inc. for American Re-Insurance Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by American Re-Insurance Company (Adams, Matthew) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY David A. Attisani FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Sompo International Reinsurance (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7160800 (Heffernan, T.) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AFFIDAVIT of Mailing of Summons and Complaint to Sompo International Reinsurance on 6/28/2021, filed by Plaintiff Washington Schools Risk Management Pool. (Rosner, Paul) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AFFIDAVIT of Mailing of Summons and Complaint to American Re-Insurance Company on 6/28/2021, filed by Plaintiff Washington Schools Risk Management Pool. (Rosner, Paul) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (CDA) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketJudge Richard A. Jones added. (CDA) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Pendancy of Other Action ; filed by Defendant Sompo International Reinsurance. (Heffernan, T.) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Sompo Holdings, Ltd. for Sompo International Reinsurance. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Sompo International Reinsurance (Heffernan, T.) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DECLARATION of T. Daniel Heffernan re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant Sompo International Reinsurance (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Heffernan, T.) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 21-2-08110-6 KNT; (Receipt # AWAWDC-7143582) Attorney T. Daniel Heffernan added to party Sompo International Reinsurance (pty:dft), filed by Sompo International Reinsurance. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Certificate of Service)(Heffernan, T.) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MUNICH REINSURANCE COMPANY FKA AMERICAN REINSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where ENDURANCE SPECIALTY INSURANCE LTD is a litigant

Latest cases where Sompo International Insurance is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sarah E. Davenport