This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/21/2020 at 08:30:08 (UTC).

Washington et al v. City Of Chicago et al

Case Summary

On 01/21/2020 Washington filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against City Of Chicago. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Manish S. Shah. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00442

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Manish S. Shah

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Donte Howard

Tabatha Washington

Defendants

Vincent Alonzo

City Of Chicago

Demosthenes Balodimas

Adrian Garcia

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Paul K Vickrey

Attorney at Vitale, Vickrey, Niro, Solon & Gasey LLP

311 South Wacker Drive, Suite 2470

Chicago, IL 60606

Dylan Michael Brown

Attorney at Vitale, Vickrey, Niro, Solon & Gasey LLP

311 S. Wacker Drive - Suite 2470

Chicago, IL 60606

Mark Daniel Roth

Attorney at Roth Fioretti LLC

311 S. Wacker, Ste 2470

Chicago, IL 60606

Patrick F. Solon

Attorney at Vitale, Vickrey, Niro, Solon & Gasey LLP

311 South Wacker Drive, Suite 2470

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#29

28 #1

Notice of Filing

#28

27 #1

Notice of Filing

#27

26 #1

Notice of Filing

#26

25 #1

Notice of Filing

#25

7 #1

Exhibit A

#6

#5

#3

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

44 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) ORDER Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 16, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Amended General Order. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/16/2020: Mailed notice. (ecw, ) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Vincent Alonzo, Demosthenes Balodimas, Adrian Garcia by Christiane Elizabeth Murray (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Murray, Christiane) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Vincent Alonzo, Demosthenes Balodimas, Adrian Garcia by Emily Erin Schnidt (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Schnidt, Emily) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Vincent Alonzo, Demosthenes Balodimas, Adrian Garcia by Misha Itchhaporia (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Itchhaporia, Misha) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Vincent Alonzo, Demosthenes Balodimas, Adrian Garcia by Timothy P Scahill (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Scahill, Timothy) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Vincent Alonzo, Demosthenes Balodimas, Adrian Garcia by Steven Blair Borkan (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Borkan, Steven) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The unopposed motion for extension of time #20 is granted, and no appearance on the motion is necessary. All defendants have until 4/14/20 to respond to the complaint. Initial status hearing remains set for 4/16/20 at 9:30 a.m. (mss) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: A status hearing is set for 4/16/20 at 9:30 a.m. No later than three business days before the status hearing, the parties shall file a joint initial status report. A template for the Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges.aspx by clicking on Judge Shah's name and then again on the link entitled 'Initial Status Conferences.' Notices mailed. (psm, ) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE of Motion by Emily Erin Schnidt for presentment of extension of time #20 before Honorable Manish S. Shah on 2/20/2020 at 09:45 AM. (Schnidt, Emily) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) MOTION by Defendant City Of Chicago for extension of time to Answer or Otherwise Plead, Unopposed (Schnidt, Emily) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Motion by Paul K Vickrey for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #7 before Honorable Manish S. Shah on 1/28/2020 at 09:45 AM. (Vickrey, Paul) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION by Plaintiffs Donte Howard, Tabatha WashingtonTo Release Grand Jury Transcripts (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Vickrey, Paul) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Vincent Alonzo, Demosthenes Balodimas, City Of Chicago, and Adrian Garcia. (acm, ) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Donte Howard, Tabatha Washington by Mark Daniel Roth (Roth, Mark) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Manish S. Shah. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings. Case assignment: Random assignment. (acm, ) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Donte Howard, Tabatha Washington by Patrick F. Solon (Solon, Patrick) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Donte Howard, Tabatha Washington by Dylan Michael Brown (Brown, Dylan) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Donte Howard, Tabatha Washington by Paul K Vickrey (Vickrey, Paul) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Vickrey, Paul) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Tabatha Washington, Donte Howard; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16634184. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Vickrey, Paul) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dylan Michael Brown

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Patrick F. Solon

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark Daniel Roth