This case was last updated from PACER on 09/07/2019 at 07:07:07 (UTC).

WARRINER TAPPER LLC v. LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 07/09/2019 WARRINER TAPPER LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are M CASEY RODGERS and MICHAEL J FRANK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-00197

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

M CASEY RODGERS

Referral Judge

MICHAEL J FRANK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WARRINER TAPPER LLC

Defendant

LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JAMES SCOTT CONSTABLE

Attorney at CONSTABLE LAW PA - SAFETY HARBOR FL

323 Main Street

Safety Harbor, FL 34695

ALLISON SARAH FREEMAN

Attorney at CONSTABLE LAW PA - SAFETY HARBOR FL

323 Main Street

Safety Harbor, FL 34695

Defendant Attorneys

ANNE E KEVLIN

Attorney at CLAUSEN MILLER - TAMPA FL

4830 West Kennedy Blvd, Suite 600

Tampa, FL 33609

MICHAEL O'BRIEN COLGAN

Attorney at CLAUSEN MILLER PC - TAMPA FL

4830 W Kennedy Boulevard, Suite 600

Tampa, FL 33609

THOMAS JAMES MOODY

4835 Spears Street

Pace, FL 32571

JOHN F MEADE

Attorney at CLAUSEN MILLER PC - TAMPA FL

4830 W Kennedy Boulevard, Suite 600

Tampa, FL 33609

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEDIATION REFERRAL re #8 Joint Report. Dispositive Motions to be filed by 2/27/2020. Discovery due by 2/6/2020. Mediation to take place by 3/5/2020. Mediation Report due by 3/19/2020. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 8/13/2019. (sdw) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #8 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (sdw) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (MOODY, THOMAS) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS JAMES MOODY on behalf of All Defendants (MOODY, THOMAS) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL O'BRIEN COLGAN on behalf of All Defendants (COLGAN, MICHAEL) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint by LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY. (MEADE, JOHN) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN F MEADE on behalf of LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY (MEADE, JOHN) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 7/23/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/22/2019. Discovery due by 1/9/2020. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 7/9/2019. (sdw) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #1 Notice of Removal. (please see proposed ISO) (sdw) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Filing Rule 7.1 Statement by LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY (KEVLIN, ANNE) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY from BAY COUNTY CIRCUIT COURT, case number 2019-CA-002006. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4545503.), filed by LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (KEVLIN, ANNE) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Lexington Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MICHAEL O'BRIEN COLGAN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thomas James Moody

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Anne Elizabeth Kevlin