This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/10/2021 at 09:10:54 (UTC).

Warren v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 06/11/2021 Warren filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are David C. Bramlette, III and LaKeysha Greer Isaac. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-00056

  • Filing Date:

    06/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Mississippi Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David C. Bramlette, III

Referral Judge

LaKeysha Greer Isaac

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Catherine Warren

Defendants

Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.

John Does 1-10

Wal-Mart Stores East, LP.

Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Martin R. Jelliffe

Attorney at MORGAN & MORGAN, PA - Jackson

4450 Old Canton Road, Suite 200

Jackson, MS 39211-5991

Defendant Attorneys

J. Caroline Johnson

Attorney at WELLS, MARBLE & HURST, PLLC - Ridgeland

P. O. Box 131 (Jackson - 39205-0131)

300 Concourse Blvd., SUIT 200

Thomas M. Louis

Attorney at WELLS, MARBLE & HURST, PLLC - Ridgeland

P. O. Box 131 (Jackson - 39205-0131), 300 Concourse Blvd., Suite 200

Ridgeland, MS 39157

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER Disclosure due by 7/30/2021; Jury Trial set for 8/1/2022 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1 (Natchez) Bramlette before District Judge David C. Bramlette III; Pretrial Conference set for 7/13/2022 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac; Discovery due by 3/1/2022; Motions for Amended Pleadings due by 8/23/2021; Motions for Joinder of Parties due by 8/23/2021; Designate Experts Plaintiff Deadline due by 12/1/2021; Designate Experts for Defendant Deadline due by 1/6/2022 ; Motions due by 3/15/2022; Settlement Conference set for 4/5/2022 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac; ADR Report due by 7/6/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac on 8/2/21 (Lewis, Nijah) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

#6

(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP., Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. (Johnson, J.) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Service of Pre-Discovery Disclosure by Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP., Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. (Johnson, J.) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

#4

(#4) State Court Record by Defendants Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP., Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. (Johnson, J.) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

#3

(#3) Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 7/23/2021 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e-mail to isaac_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. The parties are instructed to use the following dial-in number for the conference call. Dial-in #:(888) 684-8852; Passcode: 3566012(Lewis, Nijah) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas M. Louis on behalf of Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP., Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. (Louis, Thomas) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit C - Copies of process, pleadings served on Walmart.

1 #2

Exhibit B - PL's Responses to RFA

1 #1

Exhibit A - State Court Complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., and Wal-Mart Stores East, LP., from Circuit Court of Adams County, Mississippi, case number 20-KV-0074-S. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0538-4575730) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - PL's Responses to RFA, #3 Exhibit C - Copies of process, pleadings served on Walmart., #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(CO) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER Disclosure due by 7/30/2021; Jury Trial set for 8/1/2022 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1 (Natchez) Bramlette before District Judge David C. Bramlette III; Pretrial Conference set for 7/13/2022 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac; Discovery due by 3/1/2022; Motions for Amended Pleadings due by 8/23/2021; Motions for Joinder of Parties due by 8/23/2021; Designate Experts Plaintiff Deadline due by 12/1/2021; Designate Experts for Defendant Deadline due by 1/6/2022 ; Motions due by 3/15/2022; Settlement Conference set for 4/5/2022 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac; ADR Report due by 7/6/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac on 8/2/21 (Lewis, Nijah) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2021
  • DocketMINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac: Telephonic Case Management Conference held on 7/23/2021. Participants: Martin Jelliffe, Caroline Johnson, and Thomas Louis. The Court spoke with counsel. Order to be entered. (BB) (Entered: 07/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP., Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. (Johnson, J.) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Service of Pre-Discovery Disclosure by Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP., Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. (Johnson, J.) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) State Court Record by Defendants Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP., Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. (Johnson, J.) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 7/23/2021 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e-mail to isaac_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. The parties are instructed to use the following dial-in number for the conference call. Dial-in #:(888) 684-8852; Passcode: 3566012(Lewis, Nijah) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas M. Louis on behalf of Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP., Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. (Louis, Thomas) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., and Wal-Mart Stores East, LP., from Circuit Court of Adams County, Mississippi, case number 20-KV-0074-S. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0538-4575730) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - PL's Responses to RFA, #3 Exhibit C - Copies of process, pleadings served on Walmart., #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(CO) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wal-Mart Associates, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Martin R. Jelliffe