This case was last updated from PACER on 03/14/2020 at 08:22:22 (UTC).

Warren v. Oasis Lifestyle, LLC

Case Summary

On 01/14/2020 Warren filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Oasis Lifestyle, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Philip P Simon and Michael G Gotsch, Sr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00048

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Philip P Simon

Referral Judge

Michael G Gotsch, Sr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RICHARD A. WARREN

Richard A Warren

Defendants

OASIS LIFESTYLE, LLC

Oasis Lifestyle LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Robert P Kondras, Jr

Attorney at Hassler Kondras & Miller LLP

100 Cherry St

Terre Haute, IN 47807

Robert J Hunt

Attorney at The Law Office Robert J Hunt LLC

1905 S New Market St Ste 220

Carmel, IN 46032

Defendant Attorneys

Peter J Wozniak

Attorney at Barnes & Thornburg LLP - Chi/IL

One N Wacker Dr Ste 4400

Chicago, IL 60606-2833

Mark W Wallin

Attorney at Barnes & Thornburg LLP - Chi/IL

One N Wacker Dr Ste 4400

Chicago, IL 60606-2833

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Proposed Summons

#2

#3

RESTRICTED

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

8 #1

Exhibit 1 - Consent of Richard Warren

#9

#10

#11

#12

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet Deadlines per #11 Agreed Notice. Defendant Oasis Lifestyle LLC answer due by 4/6/2020. (mrm) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Oasis Lifestyle LLC ; answer due by April 6, 2020. (Wozniak, Peter) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) AMENDED COMPLAINT First against Oasis Lifestyle LLC, filed by Richard A Warren.(Kondras, Robert) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER: Unable to discern Defendant's preference from the Notice, the Court EXTENDS the deadline for Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint to 03/10/2020, consistent with the limits of Local Rule 6-1(b). Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 02/06/2020. (jat) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Oasis Lifestyle LLC ; answer due by March 28, 2020. (Wozniak, Peter) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE by Richard A Warren of Filing Consent to Become Party Plaintiff Form (First) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Consent of Richard Warren)(Hunt, Robert) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Mark W Wallin on behalf of Oasis Lifestyle LLC (Wallin, Mark) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Peter J Wozniak on behalf of Oasis Lifestyle LLC (Wozniak, Peter) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Richard A Warren. Oasis Lifestyle LLC served on 1/21/2020, answer due 2/11/2020. (Kondras, Robert) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert J Hunt on behalf of Richard A Warren (Hunt, Robert) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Oasis Lifestyle LLC. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (nae) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • Docket**NEW CASE** Judge Philip P Simon and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. (nae) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert P Kondras, Jr on behalf of RICHARD A. WARREN (Kondras, Robert) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against OASIS LIFESTYLE, LLC( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4115683.), filed by RICHARD A. WARREN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Kondras, Robert) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark William Wallin