This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/29/2019 at 07:52:28 (UTC).

WARREN v. LEVY AND ASSOCIATES, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 01/28/2019 WARREN filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against LEVY AND ASSOCIATES, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Richard L. Young and Matthew P. Brookman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00019

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard L. Young

Referral Judge

Matthew P. Brookman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JACK L. WARREN

Defendants

LEVY AND ASSOCIATES, LLC

PALISADES COLLECTION, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Marwan Rocco Daher

Attorney at SULAIMAN LAW GROUP LTD.

2500 South Highland Avenue, Suite 200

Lombard, IL 60148

Omar Tayseer Sulaiman

Attorney at SULAIMAN LAW GROUP LTD.

2500 South Highland Avenue, Suite 200

Lombard, IL 60148

Alexander J. Taylor

Attorney at SULAIMAN LAW GROUP LTD.

2500 South Highland Avenue, Suite 200

Lombard, IL 60148

Defendant Attorney

Boyd W. Gentry

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF BOYD W. GENTRY, LLC

4031 Colonel Glenn, Suite 100

Beavercreek, OH 45431

 

Court Documents

#16

#15

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

6 #1

Part 2

#6

#5

#4

#3

1 #2

Proposed Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ANSWER to #1 Complaint , filed by LEVY AND ASSOCIATES, LLC, PALISADES COLLECTION, LLC.(Gentry, Boyd) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER SETTING INITIAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - Initial Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 4/22/2019 at 11:00 AM (Central Time) before Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. SEE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 3/20/2019.(JRB) (Entered: 03/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Corporate Disclosure Statement by PALISADES COLLECTION, LLC. (Gentry, Boyd) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Corporate Disclosure Statement by LEVY AND ASSOCIATES, LLC. (Gentry, Boyd) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE to File Corporate Disclosure Statement to LEVY AND ASSOCIATES, LLC and PALISADES COLLECTION, LLC. (LAB) (JRB) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Boyd W. Gentry on behalf of Defendants LEVY AND ASSOCIATES, LLC, PALISADES COLLECTION, LLC. (Gentry, Boyd) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendants LEVY AND ASSOCIATES, LLC, PALISADES COLLECTION, LLC. (Gentry, Boyd) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) RETURN of Service, filed by JACK L. WARREN. PALISADES COLLECTION, LLC served on 2/7/2019. (Sulaiman, Omar) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) RETURN of Service, filed by JACK L. WARREN. LEVY AND ASSOCIATES, LLC served on 2/7/2019. (Sulaiman, Omar) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (JRB) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Summons Issued as to LEVY AND ASSOCIATES, LLC, PALISADES COLLECTION, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Part 2)(JRB) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander J. Taylor on behalf of Plaintiff JACK L. WARREN. (Taylor, Alexander) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Marwan Rocco Daher on behalf of Plaintiff JACK L. WARREN. (Daher, Marwan) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Omar Tayseer Sulaiman on behalf of Plaintiff JACK L. WARREN. (Sulaiman, Omar) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Proposed Summons submitted for issuance by the clerk as to PALISADES COLLECTION, LLC. (Sulaiman, Omar) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against LEVY AND ASSOCIATES, LLC, PALISADES COLLECTION, LLC, filed by JACK L. WARREN. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5257175) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Sulaiman, Omar) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Levy & Associates, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where PALISADES COLLECTION LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Marwan R. Daher

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Omar Tayseer Sulaiman