This case was last updated from PACER on 12/21/2019 at 07:14:22 (UTC).

Warren v. J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.

Case Summary

On 10/22/2019 Warren filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against J P Morgan Chase Bank, N A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Leslie R. Hoffman and Roy B. Dalton, Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:19-CV-02027

  • Filing Date:

    10/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Leslie R. Hoffman

Presiding Judge

Roy B. Dalton, Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Raegan C. Warren

Defendant

J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Alexander J. Taylor

Attorney at Sulaiman Law Group, Ltd.

2500 S. Highland Avenue, Suite 200

Lombard, IL 60148

Defendant Attorneys

Tyrone Andre Adras

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, LLP

777 S Flagler Dr

West Palm Beach, FL 33401-6167

Colin Baker

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, LLP

450 S Orange Ave, Suite 650

Orlando, FL 32801

Courtney M. Keller

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, LLP

450 S Orange Ave, Suite 650

Orlando, FL 32801

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) NOTICE of voluntary dismissal with prejudice by Raegan C. Warren (Taylor, Alexander) Modified on 12/20/2019 (LDJ). (Entered: 12/20/2019)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of settlement by Raegan C. Warren (Taylor, Alexander) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

#13

(#13) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Adras, Tyrone) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#12

(#12) MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim by J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Adras, Tyrone) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#11

(#11) ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint #1. The deadline for Defendant to answer or respond is extended up to and including December 4, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 11/20/2019. (MKH) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

#10

(#10) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Keller, Courtney) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. (Entered: 11/20/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Raegan C. Warren. Related case(s): No (Taylor, Alexander) (Entered: 11/11/2019)

#7

(#7) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Raegan C. Warren. (Taylor, Alexander) (Entered: 11/11/2019)

#6

(#6) RETURN of service executed on 10/30/2019 by Raegan C. Warren as to J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Taylor, Alexander) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

#5

(#5) INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 11/12/2019. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 10/28/2019. (ctp)(JLC) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

#4

(#4) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 11/12/2019. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 10/28/2019. (ctp)(JLC) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS issued as to J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. (ALL) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

1 #2

Proposed Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16058049) filed by Raegan C. Warren. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Taylor, Alexander) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) NOTICE of voluntary dismissal with prejudice by Raegan C. Warren (Taylor, Alexander) Modified on 12/20/2019 (LDJ). (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Remark: Doc. #13 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 12/12/2019. (EJV) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) NOTICE of settlement by Raegan C. Warren (Taylor, Alexander) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Adras, Tyrone) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim by J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Adras, Tyrone) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • Set deadlines: for J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. Answer due by 12/4/2019. (SPM) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint #1. The deadline for Defendant to answer or respond is extended up to and including December 4, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 11/20/2019. (MKH) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Keller, Courtney) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Remark: Doc. #7 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 11/12/19. (MT) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Raegan C. Warren. Related case(s): No (Taylor, Alexander) (Entered: 11/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Raegan C. Warren. (Taylor, Alexander) (Entered: 11/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) RETURN of service executed on 10/30/2019 by Raegan C. Warren as to J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Taylor, Alexander) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 11/12/2019. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 10/28/2019. (ctp)(JLC) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 11/12/2019. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 10/28/2019. (ctp)(JLC) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS issued as to J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. (ALL) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • (#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. New case number: 6:19-cv-2027-Orl-37LRH. (SJB) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16058049) filed by Raegan C. Warren. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Taylor, Alexander) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JPMorgan Chase Bank NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Tyrone Andre Adras

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Colin Baker

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Courtney M. Keller