This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/13/2021 at 11:58:22 (UTC).

WARREN v. IBM CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 02/12/2021 WARREN filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against IBM CORPORATION. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Brian R. Martinotti and Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-02513

  • Filing Date:

    02/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brian R. Martinotti

Referral Judge

Tonianne J. Bongiovanni

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STEPHEN WARREN

Defendant

IBM CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KATHERINE CHARBONNIER OELTJEN

Attorney at CONSOLE MATTIACCI LAW, LLC

110 Marter Ave, Suite 105

Moorestown, NJ 08057

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by STEPHEN WARREN. IBM CORPORATION waiver sent on 3/25/2021, answer due 5/24/2021. (OELTJEN, KATHERINE) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to IBM CORPORATION. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jal, ) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against IBM CORPORATION ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12122827) with JURY DEMAND, filed by STEPHEN WARREN.(OELTJEN, KATHERINE) (Entered: 02/12/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by STEPHEN WARREN. IBM CORPORATION waiver sent on 3/25/2021, answer due 5/24/2021. (OELTJEN, KATHERINE) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to IBM CORPORATION. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jal, ) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketJudge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (jal, ) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketCLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: This case was incorrectly opened using office code 8(Miscellaneous) and assigned civil action no. 8:21-cv-2513. This case has been copied to Trenton and assigned a new civil action no. 3:21-cv-2513. In the future, please refrain from using office code 8(Miscellaneous) . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, ) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against IBM CORPORATION ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12122827) with JURY DEMAND, filed by STEPHEN WARREN.(OELTJEN, KATHERINE) (Entered: 02/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where IBM 401 (k) Plus Plan is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KATHERINE OELTJEN