This case was last updated from PACER on 05/24/2020 at 08:14:59 (UTC).

Warren & Griffin, P.C. et al v. Monge & Associates, P.C. (TV1)

Case Summary

On 03/25/2020 Warren Griffin, P C filed an Other lawsuit against Monge Associates, P C TV1. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Susan K Lee and Thomas A Varlan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00076

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Susan K Lee

Presiding Judge

Thomas A Varlan

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Warren & Griffin, P.C.

John Mark Griffin

C. Mark Warren

Defendant

Monge & Associates, P.C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Stephen S Duggins

Attorney at Law Office of Stephen S. Duggins

8052 Standifer Gap Road, Suite B

Chattanooga, TN 37421

Defendant Attorneys

John G Jackson

Attorney at Chambliss, Bahner & Stophel, PC

605 Chestnut Street, Suite 1700

Chattanooga, TN 37450

Robert C Khayat, Jr

Attorney at The Khayat Law Firm

75 Fourteenth Street, N.E., Suite 2750

Atlanta, GA 30309

 

Court Documents

#27

(#27) RESPONSE in Opposition re #22 MOTION to Stay Briefing on Motion to Dismiss Pending Resolution of Motion for Remand filed by Monge & Associates, P.C.. (Jackson, John) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

#26

(#26) NOTICE OF NONCONSENT to Magistrate by Monge & Associates, P.C. (Jackson, John) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

#25

(#25) REPLY to Response to Motion re #19 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by C. Mark Warren, John Mark Griffin, Warren & Griffin, P.C.. (Duggins, Stephen) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

24 #2

Exhibit A to Declaration

#22

(#22) MOTION to Stay by C. Mark Warren, John Mark Griffin, Warren & Griffin, P.C.. (Duggins, Stephen) (Entered: 05/08/2020)

19 #3

Exhibit Declaration of Warren for Warren and Griffin, P.C.

19 #2

Exhibit Declaration of John Mark Griffin

19 #1

Exhibit Declaration of C. Mark Warren

#19

(#19) MOTION to Remand to State Court by C. Mark Warren, John Mark Griffin, Warren & Griffin, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of C. Mark Warren, #2 Exhibit Declaration of John Mark Griffin, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Warren for Warren and Griffin, P.C.)(Duggins, Stephen) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

#6

(#6) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 03/25/2020. (Copy of Order mailed to Robert C. Khayat, Jr.) (CAT) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac). Attorney Robert C. Khayat, Jr. is not admitted (See LR 83.5). This matter will be referred to a magistrate judge if a pro hac motion is not filed within 15 days of this Notice. (Copy of Notice mailed to Robert C. Khayat, Jr.) (CAT) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

#4

(#4) Administrative Notice to Counsel #3 Supplement : INFORMATIONAL ONLY. For future reference please file the Civil Cover Sheet in a non-fillable format. (CAT) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

#3

(#4) Administrative Notice to Counsel #3 Supplement : INFORMATIONAL ONLY. For future reference please file the Civil Cover Sheet in a non-fillable format. (CAT) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

#2

(#2) Certificate of Corporate Interest by Monge & Associates, P.C.. (Jackson, John) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Chancery Court for Hamilton County, Tennessee, case number 20-0141. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNEDC-4281644), filed by Monge & Associates, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Jackson, John) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) RESPONSE in Opposition re #22 MOTION to Stay Briefing on Motion to Dismiss Pending Resolution of Motion for Remand filed by Monge & Associates, P.C.. (Jackson, John) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) NOTICE OF NONCONSENT to Magistrate by Monge & Associates, P.C. (Jackson, John) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Consent/Non-Consent to Magistrate Judge as required by prior court order (BJL) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) REPLY to Response to Motion re #19 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by C. Mark Warren, John Mark Griffin, Warren & Griffin, P.C.. (Duggins, Stephen) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) RESPONSE in Opposition re #19 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Monge & Associates, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Other Declaration of John G. Jackson, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration)(Jackson, John) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #22 MOTION to Stay filed by C. Mark Warren, John Mark Griffin, Warren & Griffin, P.C.. (Duggins, Stephen) (Entered: 05/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) MOTION to Stay by C. Mark Warren, John Mark Griffin, Warren & Griffin, P.C.. (Duggins, Stephen) (Entered: 05/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Jackson, John) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #19 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by C. Mark Warren, John Mark Griffin, Warren & Griffin, P.C.. (Duggins, Stephen) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MOTION to Remand to State Court by C. Mark Warren, John Mark Griffin, Warren & Griffin, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of C. Mark Warren, #2 Exhibit Declaration of John Mark Griffin, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Warren for Warren and Griffin, P.C.)(Duggins, Stephen) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Certificate of Corporate Interest by Warren & Griffin, P.C.. (Duggins, Stephen) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 03/25/2020. (Copy of Order mailed to Robert C. Khayat, Jr.) (CAT) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 03/25/2020. (Copy of Order mailed to Robert C. Khayat, Jr.) (CAT) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 03/25/2020. (Copy of Order mailed to Robert C. Khayat, Jr.) (CAT) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac). Attorney Robert C. Khayat, Jr. is not admitted (See LR 83.5). This matter will be referred to a magistrate judge if a pro hac motion is not filed within 15 days of this Notice. (Copy of Notice mailed to Robert C. Khayat, Jr.) (CAT) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Administrative Notice to Counsel #3 Supplement : INFORMATIONAL ONLY. For future reference please file the Civil Cover Sheet in a non-fillable format. (CAT) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • DocketDistrict Judge Thomas A Varlan and Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee added. (CAT) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUPPLEMENT Civil Cover Sheet by Monge & Associates, P.C.. (Jackson, John) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Certificate of Corporate Interest by Monge & Associates, P.C.. (Jackson, John) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Chancery Court for Hamilton County, Tennessee, case number 20-0141. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNEDC-4281644), filed by Monge & Associates, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Jackson, John) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less