This case was last updated from PACER on 05/25/2020 at 08:22:39 (UTC).

Warren Farming Partnership v. Southern Produce Distributors, Inc.

Case Summary

On 03/26/2020 Warren Farming Partnership filed a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit against Southern Produce Distributors, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are James C. Dever, III and Malcolm J. Howard. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:20-CV-00058

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Carolina Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

James C. Dever, III

Malcolm J. Howard

 

Party Details

Appellant

Warren Farming Partnership

Appellee

Southern Produce Distributors, Inc.

Interested Party

Stephanie J. Butler

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorneys

James Michael Fields

Attorney at Ward & Smith, P.A.

751 Corporate Drive, Suite 300

Raleigh, NC 27636-3009

Luther D Starling, Jr.

Attorney at Daughtry & Starling

405 E. Market Street, P.O. Drawer 1960

Smithfield, NC 27577

John A. Northen

Attorney at Northen Blue, LLP

P. O. Box 2208

Chapel Hill, NC 27515-2208

Michael J. Parrish

Attorney at Ward and Smith, P.A.

Post Office Box 867, 1001 College Court

New Bern, NC 28563-0867

Luther Donald Starling, Jr.

Attorney at Daughtry, Woodard, Lawrence & Starling

P. O. Drawer 1960, 405 East Market St.

Smithfield, NC 27577

Appellee Attorneys

Steven Craig Newton, II

Attorney at Nicholls & Crampton, P.A.

3700 Glenwood Avenue, Suite 500, Post Office Box 18237

Raleigh, NC 27612

Gregory Byrd Crampton

Attorney at Nicholls & Crampton, P.A.

3700 Glenwood Avenue, Suite 500, Post Office Box 18237

Raleigh, NC 27612

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) REPLY to Motion regarding #3 MOTION for Leave to Appeal filed by Warren Farming Partnership. (Fields, James) Modified on 4/21/2020 to correct docket text. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

#13

(#13) RESPONSE in Opposition regarding #3 MOTION for Leave to Appeal filed by Southern Produce Distributors, Inc.. (Newton, Steven) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

#12

(#12) Financial Disclosure Statement by Southern Produce Distributors, Inc. (Crampton, Gregory) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

#11

(#11) Notice of Appearance filed by Gregory Byrd Crampton on behalf of Southern Produce Distributors, Inc.. (Crampton, Gregory) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

#10

(#10) Notice of Appearance filed by Steven Craig Newton, II on behalf of Southern Produce Distributors, Inc.. (Newton, Steven) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

#9

(#9) Notice of Appearance filed by Luther Donald Starling, Jr on behalf of Warren Farming Partnership. (Starling, Luther) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

#8

(#8) Notice of Appearance filed by Michael J. Parrish on behalf of Warren Farming Partnership. (Parrish, Michael) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

#7

(#7) Financial Disclosure Statement by Warren Farming Partnership (Fields, James) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

#6

(#6) Notice of Appearance filed by James Michael Fields on behalf of Warren Farming Partnership. (Fields, James) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

#5

(#5) Notice of Appearance filed by John A. Northen on behalf of Warren Farming Partnership. (Northen, John) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

#4

(#4) Memorandum in Support regarding #3 MOTION for Leave to Appeal from Interlocutory Order filed by Warren Farming Partnership. [Filed in US Bankruptcy Court on 3/24/2020]. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

#3

(#3) MOTION for Leave to Appeal from Interlocutory Order filed by Warren Farming Partnership. [Filed in US Bankruptcy Court on 3/24/2020]. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

#2

(#2) Notice of Docketing and Briefing Deadline regarding #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

1 #1

Order Under Appeal - Judge Humrickhouse's Order filed March 11, 2020

#1

(#1) Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 19-00069-5-SWH. File received. (Attachments: #1 Order Under Appeal - Judge Humrickhouse's Order filed March 11, 2020) (McNeill, A) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion Submitted to Senior Judge Malcolm J. Howard regarding #3 MOTION for Leave to Appeal. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) REPLY to Motion regarding #3 MOTION for Leave to Appeal filed by Warren Farming Partnership. (Fields, James) Modified on 4/21/2020 to correct docket text. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) RESPONSE in Opposition regarding #3 MOTION for Leave to Appeal filed by Southern Produce Distributors, Inc.. (Newton, Steven) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Financial Disclosure Statement by Southern Produce Distributors, Inc. (Crampton, Gregory) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Notice of Appearance filed by Gregory Byrd Crampton on behalf of Southern Produce Distributors, Inc.. (Crampton, Gregory) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Notice of Appearance filed by Steven Craig Newton, II on behalf of Southern Produce Distributors, Inc.. (Newton, Steven) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Notice of Appearance filed by Luther Donald Starling, Jr on behalf of Warren Farming Partnership. (Starling, Luther) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice of Appearance filed by Michael J. Parrish on behalf of Warren Farming Partnership. (Parrish, Michael) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Financial Disclosure Statement by Warren Farming Partnership (Fields, James) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice of Appearance filed by James Michael Fields on behalf of Warren Farming Partnership. (Fields, James) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Appearance filed by John A. Northen on behalf of Warren Farming Partnership. (Northen, John) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Memorandum in Support regarding #3 MOTION for Leave to Appeal from Interlocutory Order filed by Warren Farming Partnership. [Filed in US Bankruptcy Court on 3/24/2020]. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Leave to Appeal from Interlocutory Order filed by Warren Farming Partnership. [Filed in US Bankruptcy Court on 3/24/2020]. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketTEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. At the direction of the Court, this case is reassigned to Senior United States District Judge Malcolm J. Howard for all further proceedings. United States District Judge James C. Dever III is no longer assigned to the case. All future filings shall reflect the revised case number of 7:20-CV-58-H. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 3/27/2020. (Hockaday, A.) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketNotice to Counsel - All Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Docketing and Briefing Deadline regarding #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 19-00069-5-SWH. File received. (Attachments: #1 Order Under Appeal - Judge Humrickhouse's Order filed March 11, 2020) (McNeill, A) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less