This case was last updated from PACER on 12/01/2020 at 09:06:59 (UTC).

Warren et al v. Meridian Security Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 10/02/2020 Warren filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Meridian Security Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Karen Gren Scholer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-03029

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Karen Gren Scholer

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Lance Warren

Erin Warren

Defendant

Meridian Security Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jeffrey T Embry

Attorney at Hossley & Embry LLP

4733 Don Drive

Dallas, TX 75247

Christopher Patrick Peirce

Attorney at Hossley & Embry LLP

4733 Don Drive

Dallas, TX 75247

Defendant Attorney

Clinton James Wolbert

808 Travis Street, Suite 1100

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: FRCP 16 Scheduling Conference via teleconference set for 11/6/2020 at 02:30 PM before Judge Karen Gren Scholer. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 10/27/2020) (twd) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

#7

(#7) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Meridian Security Insurance Company. (Wolbert, Clinton) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

6 #1

Exhibit(s) A

#6

(#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Meridian Security Insurance Company. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)Attorney Clinton James Wolbert added to party Meridian Security Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Wolbert, Clinton) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Meridian Security Insurance Company. (mjr) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

#4

(#4) Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Erin Warren, Lance Warren. (Peirce, Christopher) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

#3

(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mjr) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Erin Warren, Lance Warren. (Peirce, Christopher) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

1 #1

Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Meridian Security Insurance Company filed by Lance Warren, Erin Warren. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-11229885) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Peirce, Christopher) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2020
  • Docket(#11) ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Karen Gren Scholer: Telephone Scheduling Conference held on 11/30/2020. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Christopher Peirce; Defense - Clinton Wolbert. (Court Reporter: Tutti Bui) (No exhibits) Time in Court - :30. (TUB) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • Docket(#10) ELECTRONIC ORDER: The Court RESETS the November 30, 2020 telephonic Scheduling Conference at 1:30 p.m. to November 30, 2020, at 3:00 p.m. Updated dial-in information will be sent to counsel via email. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 11/30/2020) (chmb) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketHearing Modification per 9 Order: FRCP 16 Scheduling Conference set for 11/30/2020 01:30 PM before Judge Karen Gren Scholer. (jmg) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • Docket(#9) ELECTRONIC ORDER: The Court RESETS the November 6, 2020 telephonic Scheduling Conference to November 30, 2020, at 1:30 p.m. Dial-in information will be sent to counsel via email. The Court encourages the parties to submit or file a proposed agreed scheduling order at least two days before the hearing based on: http://www.txnd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/documents/ScholerSO.doc. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 11/4/2020) (chmb) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: FRCP 16 Scheduling Conference via teleconference set for 11/6/2020 at 02:30 PM before Judge Karen Gren Scholer. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 10/27/2020) (twd) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Meridian Security Insurance Company. (Wolbert, Clinton) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Meridian Security Insurance Company. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)Attorney Clinton James Wolbert added to party Meridian Security Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Wolbert, Clinton) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Meridian Security Insurance Company. (mjr) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Erin Warren, Lance Warren. (Peirce, Christopher) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mjr) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Erin Warren, Lance Warren. (Peirce, Christopher) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Meridian Security Insurance Company filed by Lance Warren, Erin Warren. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-11229885) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Peirce, Christopher) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Meridian Security Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Clinton James Wolbert