This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/15/2021 at 07:03:27 (UTC).

Warnick v. City Of Chicago et al

Case Summary

On 09/16/2021 Warnick filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against City Of Chicago. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Matthew F. Kennelly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-04926

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Matthew F. Kennelly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Devin J. Warnick

South Holland, IL 60473

Defendants

City Of Chicago

Chicago Police Department

C.J. Sides

B.D McDonald

T.J Smith

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#8

#9

(#9) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is granted [3-1]. Plaintiff's motion for appointment of counsel #4 is deferred until Defendants respond to Plaintiff's complaint. The Marshal is appointed to serve the defendants with summons and the complaint. It appears that Plaintiff has already completed USM-285 forms to facilitate service of summons. The Clerk is directed to provide the completed USM-285 forms 6 and the completed summonses 7 to the Marshal. The Marshal is directed to serve the defendants. The case is set for a telephonic status hearing on 12/14/2021 at 8:45 a.m. The following call-in number will be used for the hearing: 888-684-8852 conference code 746-1053. Plaintiff and counsel for the defendants are directed to call in for the status hearing at that time. Mailed notice. (mma, ) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Chicago Police Department, City Of Chicago, B.D McDonald, C.J. Sides, T.J Smith (jn, ) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is granted [3-1]. Plaintiff's motion for appointment of counsel #4 is deferred until Defendants respond to Plaintiff's complaint. The Marshal is appointed to serve the defendants with summons and the complaint. It appears that Plaintiff has already completed USM-285 forms to facilitate service of summons. The Clerk is directed to provide the completed USM-285 forms 6 and the completed summonses 7 to the Marshal. The Marshal is directed to serve the defendants. The case is set for a telephonic status hearing on 12/14/2021 at 8:45 a.m. The following call-in number will be used for the hearing: 888-684-8852 conference code 746-1053. Plaintiff and counsel for the defendants are directed to call in for the status hearing at that time. Mailed notice. (mma, ) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STATEMENT of case by Devin J. Warnick (received for docketing on 9/21/2021) (gw, ) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (daj, ) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff Devin J. Warnick (daj, ) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION by Plaintiff Devin J. Warnick for attorney representation (daj, ) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) APPLICATION by Plaintiff Devin J. Warnick for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (daj, ) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (daj, ) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) RECEIVED COMPLAINT and Zero copies by Devin J. Warnick (daj, ) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Chicago Police Department is a litigant