This case was last updated from PACER on 02/09/2020 at 07:53:30 (UTC).

Warner v. The Bank of Missouri

Case Summary

On 12/11/2019 Warner filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against The Bank of Missouri. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are John T. Maughmer and M. Douglas Harpool. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:19-CV-03424

  • Filing Date:

    12/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

John T. Maughmer

M. Douglas Harpool

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mary K Warner

Defendant

The Bank of Missouri

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Greggory D Groves

Attorney at Lowther Johnson, LLC

901 St. Louis Street, 20Th Floor

Springfield, MO 65806

Defendant Attorneys

Thomas Owen McCarthy

Attorney at McMahon Berger

2730 North Ballas Road, Suite 200, P. O. Box 31901

St. Louis, MO 63131-3039

Rex P. Fennessey

Attorney at McMahon Berger

2730 North Ballas Road, Suite 200, P. O. Box 31901

St. Louis, MO 63131-3039

 

Court Documents

#31

#30

#29

#28

#24

#22

#13

#7

6 #1

MAP General Order

#6

#5

#3

#2

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketNOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your post-mediation status report is due within 10 calendar days after the mediation. See MAP FAQs on Court's website for specifics and submit report(s) to: map@mow.uscourts.gov. (ADI, MAP) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by The Bank of Missouri filed by Thomas Owen McCarthy on behalf of Defendant The Bank of Missouri.(McCarthy, Thomas) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Kevin Fitzgerald(Groves, Greggory) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION. A modification has been made to the document filed on 2/3/20 as Document No. 27, Designation of Mediator. The document has been deleted as the incorrect event was used when filing the document (Designation). Counsel will refile the document using the correct event under Civil Events - Other Filings - ADR Documents - Designation of Mediator. This is a text entry only - no document is attached. (Siegert, Karen) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Thomas Owen McCarthy on behalf of Defendant The Bank of Missouri.(McCarthy, Thomas) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Greggory D Groves on behalf of Plaintiff Mary K Warner.(Groves, Greggory) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • Docket(#27) DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR CERTIFICATE by Mary K Warner. (Groves, Greggory) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) ORDER granting in part and denying in part #22 joint motion to modify scheduling and trial order. The Court modifies the scheduling order as follows: Daubert motions shall be filed on or before September 28, 2020. Dispositive motions shall be filed on or before October 12, 2020. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Roubal, Kristen) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • Docket(#25) Minute Entry. Proceedings held before District Judge M. Douglas Harpool: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 2/3/2020 Time in court: 10:00 a.m. to 10:05 a.m. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Howard, Linda) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Thomas Owen McCarthy on behalf of Defendant The Bank of Missouri. (Related document(s) #13 ) (McCarthy, Thomas) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AMENDED COMPLAINT AS A MATTER OF COURSE against The Bank of Missouri filed by Greggory D Groves on behalf of Mary K Warner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Groves, Greggory) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/25/2019
  • DocketNOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP) (Entered: 12/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 2/3/2020. Rule 26 conference due by 1/20/2020. Signed on 12/19/2019 by Magistrate Judge John T. Maughmer. (Stepp, Jane) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Siegert, Karen) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF MAGISTRATE ASSIGNMENT. This is a docket entry only. No document is attached. Magistrate Return due by 1/2/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Siegert, Karen) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Thomas Owen McCarthy on behalf of Defendant The Bank of Missouri.(McCarthy, Thomas) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to Complaint on behalf of The Bank of Missouri.(McCarthy, Thomas) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUGGESTIONS in support re #2 MOTION to dismiss case (partial) filed by Thomas Owen McCarthy on behalf of Defendant The Bank of Missouri. (Related document(s) #2 ) (McCarthy, Thomas) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION to dismiss case (partial) filed by Thomas Owen McCarthy on behalf of The Bank of Missouri. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/26/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (McCarthy, Thomas) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Green County, MO County, case number 1931-CC01376, filed by Thomas Owen McCarthy on behalf of The Bank of Missouri. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-6624313. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(McCarthy, Thomas) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Bank of Missouri is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thomas O. McCarthy

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rex P. Fennessey