This case was last updated from PACER on 10/14/2019 at 08:45:00 (UTC).

Warner v. Centra Health, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 08/15/2019 Warner filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Centra Health, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Norman K. Moon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:19-CV-00055

  • Filing Date:

    08/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Virginia Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Norman K. Moon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ruth Ann Warner

Defendants

James Barr

James Bard

Centra Health, Inc.

Wesley Thomas Gillespie

Michael E. Judd

Katherine Prater

Michael Dunlop

Baskervill Architecture, Inc.

Dana Luck

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Edward Kyle McNew

Attorney at Michie Hamlett PLLC

500 Court Square, Suite 300

Charlottesville, VA 22902

Michael Bryan Slaughter

Attorney at Michie, Hamlett, Lowry, Rasmussen & Tweel, P.C.

500 Court Square, Suite 300

Charlottesville, VA 22902

Michael Paul Valois

Attorney at James River Legal Associates

7601 Timberlake Road

Lynchburg, VA 24502

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ruth Ann Warner. Katherine Prater waiver sent on 9/17/2019, answer due 11/18/2019.(Slaughter, Michael)

#8

(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ruth Ann Warner. Baskervill Architecture, Inc. waiver sent on 9/17/2019, answer due 11/18/2019.(Slaughter, Michael)

#7

(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ruth Ann Warner. James Barr waiver sent on 9/17/2019, answer due 11/18/2019.(Slaughter, Michael)

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ruth Ann Warner. Dana Luck waiver sent on 9/17/2019, answer due 11/18/2019.(Slaughter, Michael)

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ruth Ann Warner. Wesley Thomas Gillespie waiver sent on 9/17/2019, answer due 11/18/2019.(Slaughter, Michael)

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ruth Ann Warner. Michael E. Judd waiver sent on 9/17/2019, answer due 11/18/2019.(Slaughter, Michael)

#3

(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ruth Ann Warner. Michael Dunlop waiver sent on 9/17/2019, answer due 11/18/2019.(Slaughter, Michael)

#2

(#2) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ruth Ann Warner. Centra Health, Inc. waiver sent on 9/17/2019, answer due 11/18/2019.(Slaughter, Michael)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Plaintiff's Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing & Administrative fee $400.00, Receipt 0423-3206647) filed by Ruth Ann Warner. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff's Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(sfc)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ruth Ann Warner. Katherine Prater waiver sent on 9/17/2019, answer due 11/18/2019.(Slaughter, Michael)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ruth Ann Warner. Baskervill Architecture, Inc. waiver sent on 9/17/2019, answer due 11/18/2019.(Slaughter, Michael)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ruth Ann Warner. James Barr waiver sent on 9/17/2019, answer due 11/18/2019.(Slaughter, Michael)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ruth Ann Warner. Dana Luck waiver sent on 9/17/2019, answer due 11/18/2019.(Slaughter, Michael)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ruth Ann Warner. Wesley Thomas Gillespie waiver sent on 9/17/2019, answer due 11/18/2019.(Slaughter, Michael)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ruth Ann Warner. Michael E. Judd waiver sent on 9/17/2019, answer due 11/18/2019.(Slaughter, Michael)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ruth Ann Warner. Michael Dunlop waiver sent on 9/17/2019, answer due 11/18/2019.(Slaughter, Michael)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ruth Ann Warner. Centra Health, Inc. waiver sent on 9/17/2019, answer due 11/18/2019.(Slaughter, Michael)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing & Administrative fee $400.00, Receipt 0423-3206647) filed by Ruth Ann Warner. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff's Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(sfc)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.