This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2019 at 05:14:55 (UTC).

Warner v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/22/2019 a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability case was filed by Warner against Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:19-CV-01642

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Embry J. Kidd

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Georgia Warner

Defendant

Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

 

Court Documents

6 #1

Complaint

#10

(#10) INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Defendant Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. shall file a Certificate of Interested Persons within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 10/7/2019. (GNB) copies e-mailed (Entered: 10/07/2019)

#3

(#3) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. The Notice of Pendency of Other Actions shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 8/23/2019. (GNB) copies e-mailed (Entered: 08/23/2019)

#9

(#9) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Other Affiliate Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation for Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc... (Kruppa, Andrew) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

#4

(#4) INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. The Certificate of Interested Persons shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 8/23/2019. (GNB) copies e-mailed (Entered: 08/23/2019)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Georgia Warner. Related case(s): yes (Childers, Charles) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#5

(#5) SUMMONS issued as to Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (RDO) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

#8

(#8) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to Plaintiff Georgia Warner. Plaintiff has failed to comply with the Court's Orders #3 and #4. Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE and file her response to said Orders within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Failure to comply with this Order may result in dismissal without prejudice or other appropriate sanctions. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 10/7/2019. (GNB) copies e-mailed (Entered: 10/07/2019)

#12

(#12) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by Georgia Warner. (Childers, Charles) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

#7

(#7) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Kruppa, Andrew) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

#13

(#13) RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #8 Order to show cause filed by Georgia Warner. (Childers, Charles) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

1 #2

Proposed Summons Summons

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15836963) filed by Georgia Warner. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Summons)(Childers, Charles) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

#6

(#6) POSSIBLE MDL Tag Along case for MDL Case Number 2385, In re: Praxada Products Liability Litigation. Information emailed to MDL Panel on 8/26/19, including cover letter, copy of complaint, and docket sheet. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Docket Sheet) (RDO) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

6 #2

Docket Sheet

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ENDORSED ORDER discharging #8 Order to show cause. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 10/17/2019. (GNB) copies e-mailed (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #8 Order to show cause filed by Georgia Warner. (Childers, Charles) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by Georgia Warner. (Childers, Charles) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Georgia Warner. Related case(s): yes (Childers, Charles) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Defendant Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. shall file a Certificate of Interested Persons within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 10/7/2019. (GNB) copies e-mailed (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Other Affiliate Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation for Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc... (Kruppa, Andrew) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to Plaintiff Georgia Warner. Plaintiff has failed to comply with the Court's Orders #3 and #4. Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE and file her response to said Orders within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Failure to comply with this Order may result in dismissal without prejudice or other appropriate sanctions. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 10/7/2019. (GNB) copies e-mailed (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Kruppa, Andrew) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) POSSIBLE MDL Tag Along case for MDL Case Number 2385, In re: Praxada Products Liability Litigation. Information emailed to MDL Panel on 8/26/19, including cover letter, copy of complaint, and docket sheet. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Docket Sheet) (RDO) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS issued as to Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (RDO) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. The Certificate of Interested Persons shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 8/23/2019. (GNB) copies e-mailed (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. The Notice of Pendency of Other Actions shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 8/23/2019. (GNB) copies e-mailed (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • (#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Paul G. Byron and Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. New case number: 6:19-cv-1642-Orl-40EJK. (SJB) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15836963) filed by Georgia Warner. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Summons)(Childers, Charles) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.