This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/02/2022 at 18:18:13 (UTC).

Warner Records Inc et al v. Charter Communications, Inc.

Case Summary

On 03/22/2019 Warner Records Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Charter Communications, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judges overseeing this case are Wiley Y. Daniel, R. Brooke Jackson and Michael E. Hegarty. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00874

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Michael E. Hegarty

Presiding Judges

Wiley Y. Daniel

R. Brooke Jackson

 

Party Details

Counter Claimants, Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

Stone Diamond Music Corp.

Universal Music Publishing Inc.

Elektra Entertainment Group Inc.

EMI Miller Catalog Inc.

EMI Unart Catalog Inc.

Arista Music

EMI Blackwood Music Inc.

EMI Algee Music Corp.

Songs of Universal, Inc.

Warner Bros. Records Inc

Colgems-EMI Music Inc.

Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited

Volcano Entertainment III, LLC

Universal Music Publishing AB

EMI Feist Catalog Inc.

Roadrunner Records, Inc.

EMI Consortium Songs, INc.

Bad Boy Records LLC

Universal Music Publishing Limited

EMI Mills Music, Inc.

195 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Counter Claimant, Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Jonathan Michael Sperling

Attorney at Covington & Burling LLP-New York

620 Eighth Avenue, The New York Times Building

New York, NY 10018-1405

Neema T. Sahni

Attorney at Covington & Burling LLP-Los Angeles

1999 Avenue Of The Stars, Suite 3500

Los Angeles, CA 90067-4643

Jeffrey M. Gould

Attorney at Oppenheim & Zebrak LLP

4530 Wisconsin Avenue N.W., 5Th Floor

Washington, DC 20016

Matthew J. Oppenheim

Attorney at Oppenheim & Zebrak LLP

4530 Wisconsin Avenue N.W., 5Th Floor

Washington, DC 20016

Mitchell Aaron Kamin

Attorney at Covington & Burling LLP-Los Angeles

1999 Avenue Of The Stars, Suite 3500

Los Angeles, CA 90067-4643

Scott A. Zebrak

Attorney at Oppenheim & Zebrak LLP

4530 Wisconsin Avenue N.W., 5Th Floor

Washington, DC 20016

William E. O'Neil

Attorney at Covington & Burling LLP-New York

620 Eighth Avenue, The New York Times Building

New York, NY 10018-1405

Mark Y. Chen

Attorney at Covington & Burling LLP-Los Angeles

1999 Avenue Of The Stars, Suite 3500

Los Angeles, CA 90067-4643

Megan Michelle O'Neill

Attorney at Covington & Burling LLP-DC

One Citycenter, 850 Tenth Street Nw

Washington, DC 20001-4956

Rebecca G. Van Tassell

Attorney at Covington & Burling LLP-Los Angeles

1999 Avenue Of The Stars, Suite 3500

Los Angeles, CA 90067-4643

Benjamin M. Leoni

Attorney at Williams Weese Pepple & Ferguson PC

1801 California Street, Suite 3400

Denver, CO 80202

Jacqueline C. Charlesworth

Attorney at Covington & Burling LLP-New York

620 Eighth Avenue, The New York Times Building

New York, NY 10018-1405

Kerry M. Mustico

Attorney at Oppenheim & Zebrak LLP

4530 Wisconsin Avenue N.W., 5Th Floor

Washington, DC 20016

Janette Lee Ferguson

1801 California Street, Suite 3400

Denver, CO 80202

Other Attorneys

Thomas Patrick Lane

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP-New York

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166-4193

Stacey Foltz Stark

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP-New York

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166-4193

Seth Eliot Spitzer

Attorney at Winston & Strawn, LLP-New York

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166-4193

Michael Stuart Elkin

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166-4193

Jack Markham Tanner

1801 California Street, Suite 2600

Denver, CO 80202-2645

Jennifer Ann Golinveaux

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP-San Francisco

101 California Street, Suite 3400

San Francisco, CA 94111-5802

41 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#616

(#616) MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 12/28/2021. Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Restrict [filed December 17, 2021; ECF #597 ] is granted. Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Restrict [filed December 17, 2021; ECF #598 ] also is granted. (agarc, ) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

#615

(#615) Joint MOTION for Leave to File Consolidated Motion to Restrict by Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal/MCA Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC. (Sahni, Neema) (Entered: 12/23/2021)

598 #2

Exhibit 2

598 #1

Exhibit 1

598 #598

Main Document

597 #1

Exhibit A

597 #597

Main Document

#9

#7

#6

#4

#3

#2

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

1,154 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#616) MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 12/28/2021. Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Restrict [filed December 17, 2021; ECF #597 ] is granted. Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Restrict [filed December 17, 2021; ECF #598 ] also is granted. (agarc, ) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#615) Joint MOTION for Leave to File Consolidated Motion to Restrict by Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal/MCA Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC. (Sahni, Neema) (Entered: 12/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#623) RESPONSE to 573 MOTION to Exclude filed by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Public Entry for Restricted Document #607 filed on 12/20/2021). Text Only Entry. (sphil, ) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#622) Plaintiffs' Opposition to 569 MOTION to Exclude filed by Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC., et al. (Public Entry for Restricted Document #606 filed on 12/20/2021). Text Only Entry. (sphil, ) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#621) Plaintiffs' Opposition to 566 MOTION to Exclude filed by Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC., et al (Public Entry for Restricted Document #605 filed on 12/20/2021). Text Only Entry. (sphil, ) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#620) RESPONSE to 572 MOTION to Exclude filed by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Public Entry for Restricted Document #604 filed on 12/20/2021 ). Text Only Entry. (sphil, ) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#619) RESPONSE to 563 MOTION to Exclude filed by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Public Entry for Restricted Document #602 filed on 12/20/2021). Text Only Entry. (sphil, ) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#618) RESPONSE to 570 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Public Entry for Restricted Document #601 filed on 12/20/2021). Text Only Entry. (sphil, ) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#617) Plaintiffs' Opposition to 567 Charter's MOTION to Exclude filed by Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation. (Public Entry for Restricted Document #600 filed on 12/20/2021). Text Only Entry. (sphil, ) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#614) RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: by Plaintiffs All Blacks U.S.A., INC., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Century Family, Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Music Corporation of America Inc., Musik Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal/MCA Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc, Warner Records/Sire Ventures LLC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recordings LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of J. Gould, #2 Plaintiffs' Exhibit 1, #3 Plaintiffs' Exhibit 2, #4 Plaintiffs' Exhibit 3, #5 Plaintiffs' Exhibit 4, #6 Plaintiffs' Exhibit 5, #7 Plaintiffs' Exhibit 6, #8 Plaintiffs' Exhibit 7, #9 Plaintiffs' Exhibit 8, #10 Plaintiffs' Exhibit 9, #11 Plaintiffs' Exhibit 10, #12 Plaintiffs' Exhibit 11, #13 Plaintiffs' Exhibit 12, #14 Plaintiffs' Exhibit 13, #15 Plaintiffs' Exhibit 14, #16 Plaintiffs' Exhibit 15, #17 Plaintiffs' Exhibit 16, #18 Plaintiffs' Exhibit 17, #19 Plaintiffs' Exhibit 18, #20 Plaintiffs' Exhibit 19, #21 Plaintiffs' Exhibit 20, #22 Plaintiffs' Exhibit 21, #23 Plaintiffs' Exhibit 22, #24 Plaintiffs' Exhibit 23, #25 Plaintiffs' Exhibit 24, #26 Plaintiffs' Exhibit 25, #27 Plaintiffs' Exhibit 26, #28 Plaintiffs' Exhibit 27, #29 Plaintiffs' Exhibit 28, #30 Plaintiffs' Exhibit 29, #31 Plaintiffs' Exhibit 30, #32 Plaintiffs' Exhibit 31, #33 Plaintiffs' Exhibit 32, #34 Plaintiffs' Exhibit 33, #35 Plaintiffs' Exhibit 34, #36 Plaintiffs' Exhibit 35, #37 Declaration of K. Buchan, #38 Buchan Decl. Exhibit 1, #39 Declaration of H. Furchtgott-Roth, #40 Furchtgott-Roth Decl. Exhibit 1)(Oppenheim, Matthew) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
601 More Docket Entries
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SUMMONS REQUEST as to Charter Communications, Inc. re #1 Complaint,,,, by Plaintiffs Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Island Music Limited, Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Nonesuch Records, Inc., PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC,, Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W.B.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Bros. Records Inc, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Warner/Chappell Music, Inc., Zomba Recordings LLC. (Ferguson, Janette) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MINUTE ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 03/26/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 5/17/2019 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (mdave, ) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • (#8) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty for dispositive matters. That pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this matter is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge is designated to conduct proceedings in this civil action as follows: (1) Convene a scheduling conference under Fed.R.Civ.P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2. (2) Conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause. (3) Hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions. (4) Conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. (5) Alternative Dispute Resolution Authority: Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLOLCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge, or on the request of the parties by motion, the court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. (6) Conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order. It is further ORDERED that parties and counsel shall be familiar and comply with the above judge's requirements found at www.cod.uscourts.gov. By Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 3/26/19. Text Only Entry (rkeec) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). No Summons Issued. Summonses submitted contain incomplete caption and will not be issued. Please file completed summonses using the event, "Summons Request." (cmadr, ) Modified to correct entry on 3/25/2019 (cmadr, ). (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Report re Copyright: Report on the filing of an action emailed separately to the Director of the Copyright Office. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • (#5) Case assigned to Judge Wiley Y. Daniel and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Ferguson, Janette) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE re #1 Complaint,,,, Civil Cover Sheet w/Attachment by Plaintiffs Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., FUELED BY RAMEN LLC, NONESUCH RECORDS INC, ROADRUNNER RECORDS, INC, WEA INTERNATIONAL INC, Warner Bros. Records Inc (Ferguson, Janette) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUMMONS REQUEST as to Charter Communications, Inc. re #1 Complaint,,,, by Plaintiffs Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., FUELED BY RAMEN LLC, NONESUCH RECORDS INC, ROADRUNNER RECORDS, INC, WEA INTERNATIONAL INC, Warner Bros. Records Inc. (Ferguson, Janette) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against All Plaintiffs (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6597217)Attorney Janette Lee Ferguson added to party Atlantic Recording Corporation(pty:pla), Attorney Janette Lee Ferguson added to party Bad Boy Records LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Janette Lee Ferguson added to party Elektra Entertainment Group Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Janette Lee Ferguson added to party FUELED BY RAMEN LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Janette Lee Ferguson added to party NONESUCH RECORDS INC(pty:pla), Attorney Janette Lee Ferguson added to party ROADRUNNER RECORDS, INC(pty:pla), Attorney Janette Lee Ferguson added to party WEA INTERNATIONAL INC(pty:pla), Attorney Janette Lee Ferguson added to party Warner Bros. Records Inc(pty:pla), filed by NONESUCH RECORDS INC, Bad Boy Records LLC, ROADRUNNER RECORDS, INC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, WEA INTERNATIONAL INC, Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Warner Bros. Records Inc, FUELED BY RAMEN LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Ferguson, Janette) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bad Boy Records LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where EMI Mills Music, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where WARNER BROS. RECORDS, INC., a Delaware Corporation is a litigant