This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/28/2022 at 01:00:38 (UTC).

Deborah Ann Warner v. Surefox Consulting LLC et al

Case Summary

On 09/24/2021 Deborah Ann Warner filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Surefox Consulting LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Donna M. Ryu and Richard Seeborg. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-07473

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Donna M. Ryu

Richard Seeborg

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Deborah Ann Warner a/k/a Deborah Ann Zoll

Deborah Ann Warner

Deborah Ann Zoll

Defendants

Surefox Consulting LLC

Surefox North America

Wolfhound Corp.

Initial Lease, LLC

Surefox Entertainment, LLC

655 3rd Street LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Melinda Arbuckle

Attorney at Shellist Lazarz Slobin, LLP

402 West Broadway, Suite 400

San Diego, CA 92101

Glenn Deutsch Levy

Attorney at The Law Office Of Glenn D. Levy

906 Basse Road

San Antionio, TE 78213

Defendant Attorneys

Melinda S. Riechert

Attorney at Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP

1400 Page Mill Road

Palo Alto, CA 94304

Melinda Riechert

One Market, Spear Street Tower

San Francisco, CA 94105-1596

Clayton M. Davis

Attorney at Morgan Lewis and Bockius, LLP

1717 Main Street, Suite 3200

Dallas, TX 75201-7347

Robert Elwood Sheeder

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP

1717 Main Street, Suite 3200

Dallas, TX 75201-7347

 

Court Documents

#30

(#30) ORDER RE #28 GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO SUBMIT SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING PER ORDER [ECF NO. 25]. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/12/2022. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2022) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

#29

(#29) *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET #30 . *** ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg GRANTING #28 STIPULAITON TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO SUBMIT SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING PER ORDER [ECF NO. 25].(cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2022) Modified on 1/12/2022 (cl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/12/2022)

28 #1

Proposed Order

28 #28

Main Document

#25

(#25) ORDER REQUESTING SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING. Signed by Chief Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/13/2021. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2021) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

15 #3

Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or Transfer Venue

15 #2

Declaration of Pete Twedell in Support of Motion to Dismiss or Transfer Venue

15 #1

Declaration of Jeffrey Chase in Support of Motion to Dismiss or Transfer Venue

15 #15

Main Document

6 #5

Certificate/Proof of Service

6 #2

Certificate/Proof of Service

6 #1

Certificate/Proof of Service

6 #6

Main Document

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to 655 3rd Street LLC, Initial Lease, LLC, Surefox Consulting LLC, Surefox Entertainment, LLC, Surefox North America, Wolfhound Corp.. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2021) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

#4

(#4) Proposed Summons. (Arbuckle, Melinda) (Filed on 9/27/2021) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

#3

(#3) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 12/22 /2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/29/2021 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2021) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

52 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines as to #15 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer Venue; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof. Motion Hearing set for 2/10/2022 01:30 PM in San Francisco, - Telephonic Only before Judge Richard Seeborg. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2022) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) ORDER RE #28 GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO SUBMIT SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING PER ORDER [ECF NO. 25]. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/12/2022. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2022) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET #30 . *** ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg GRANTING #28 STIPULAITON TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO SUBMIT SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING PER ORDER [ECF NO. 25].(cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2022) Modified on 1/12/2022 (cl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #25 Order filed by Deborah Ann Warner. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Arbuckle, Melinda) (Filed on 1/12/2022) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • Docket(#27) CLERK'S NOTICE. Initial Case Management Conference previously set for 1/27/2022 is continued to 3/17/2022 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. Case Management Statement due by 3/10/2022. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2022) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing as to #15 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer Venue. Motion Hearing previously set for December 16, 2021 has been continued to January 27, 2022 at 01:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Richard Seeborg. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2021) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) ORDER REQUESTING SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING. Signed by Chief Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/13/2021. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2021) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) REPLY (re #15 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer Venue; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof ) filed by655 3rd Street LLC, Initial Lease, LLC, Surefox Consulting LLC, Surefox Entertainment, LLC, Surefox North America, Wolfhound Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Supplemental Declaration of Pete Twedell)(Riechert, Melinda) (Filed on 12/3/2021) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #15 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer Venue; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof ) filed byDeborah Ann Warner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Decl, #2 Exhibit B - Surefox LinkedIn, #3 Exhibit C - Szott Facebook, #4 Exhibit D - Szott LinkedIn, #5 Exhibit E - Szott Email, #6 Exhibit F - Plaintiff's Paystubs, #7 Exhibit G - Plaintiff's Offer Letter, #8 Exhibit H - Esquire Article, #9 Exhibit I - Levy Decl, #10 Exhibit J - Arbuckle Decl, #11 Exhibit K - 3824 Cedar Springs Street View, #12 Exhibit L - Surefox Security Google Search, #13 Exhibit M - Surefox.com as of Oct. 19, 2021, #14 Proposed Order)(Arbuckle, Melinda) (Filed on 11/22/2021) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet/Reset as to #15 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer Venue; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof. Motion Hearing previously set for 12/2/2021 is continued to 12/16/2021 at 01:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Richard Seeborg. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2021) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu Granting #8 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2021) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-16497495.) filed by Deborah Ann Warner. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Levy, Glenn) (Filed on 10/14/2021) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-16497129.) filed by 655 3rd Street LLC, Initial Lease, LLC, Surefox Consulting LLC, Surefox Entertainment, LLC, Surefox North America, Wolfhound Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Sheeder, Robert) (Filed on 10/14/2021) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINITFF Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 10/26/2021. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2021) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deborah Ann Warner. 655 3rd Street LLC served on 9/30/2021, answer due 10/21/2021; Initial Lease, LLC served on 9/30/2021, answer due 10/21/2021; Surefox Consulting LLC served on 9/30/2021, answer due 10/21/2021; Surefox Entertainment, LLC served on 9/30/2021, answer due 10/21/2021; Surefox North America served on 9/30/2021, answer due 10/21/2021; Wolfhound Corp. served on 9/30/2021, answer due 10/21/2021. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service, #4 Certificate/Proof of Service, #5 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Arbuckle, Melinda) (Filed on 10/6/2021) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to 655 3rd Street LLC, Initial Lease, LLC, Surefox Consulting LLC, Surefox Entertainment, LLC, Surefox North America, Wolfhound Corp.. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2021) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Proposed Summons. (Arbuckle, Melinda) (Filed on 9/27/2021) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 12/22 /2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/29/2021 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2021) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • Docket(#2) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/8/2021. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2021) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against 655 3rd Street LLC, Initial Lease, LLC, Surefox Consulting LLC, Surefox Entertainment, LLC, Surefox North America, Wolfhound Corp. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-16428675.). Filed byDeborah Ann Warner a/k/a Deborah Ann Zoll. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Arbuckle, Melinda) (Filed on 9/24/2021) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Clayton McCarthy Davis

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert E Sheeder

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Melinda S. Riechert