This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/28/2023 at 07:44:15 (UTC).

WARMINSKI v. STATE FARM INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/27/2023 WARMINSKI filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against STATE FARM INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is JUAN R. SANCHEZ. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-00331

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JUAN R. SANCHEZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MAUREEN WARMINSKI

Defendant

STATE FARM INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TRAVIS J. SAVOIA

Defendant Attorneys

JAMES P. SHAY

KATHERINE COLE DOUGLAS

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by STATE FARM INSURANCE COMPANY (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-16460396), filed by STATE FARM INSURANCE COMPANY.(SHAY, JAMES) (Entered: 01/27/2023)

#2

(#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by STATE FARM INSURANCE COMPANY.(SHAY, JAMES) (Entered: 01/27/2023)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by KATHERINE COLE DOUGLAS on behalf of STATE FARM INSURANCE COMPANY (DOUGLAS, KATHERINE) (Entered: 01/27/2023)

#4

(#4) Letter re: Arbitration Certification (Attachments: #1 Arbitration Certification Form)(sbt) (Entered: 01/27/2023)

4 #1

Arbitration Certification Form

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint together with Affirmative Defenses by STATE FARM INSURANCE COMPANY.(DOUGLAS, KATHERINE) (Entered: 02/01/2023)

#6

(#6) Notice Re: Arbitration Video Conference (Attachments: #1 Consent)(sah) (Entered: 02/14/2023)

6 #1

Consent

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by TRAVIS SAVOIA on behalf of MAUREEN WARMINSKI, and Withdrawal of Barry Scatton. (SAVOIA, TRAVIS) Modified on 2/16/2023 (md). (Entered: 02/14/2023)

#8

(#8) Notice Re: Arbitration Consent of Video Conference(SAVOIA, TRAVIS) (Entered: 02/21/2023)

#9

(#9) Notice Re: Arbitration Consent of Video Conference(SHAY, JAMES) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Hearing: VIRTUAL ARBITRATION HEARING SET FOR 6/13/2023 10:00 AM.(sah) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

#11

(#11) Arbitration Procedural Order 02/24/2023 Entered and copies e-mailed.(sah) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Arbitration Procedural Order 02/24/2023 Entered and copies e-mailed.(sah) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Hearing: VIRTUAL ARBITRATION HEARING SET FOR 6/13/2023 10:00 AM.(sah) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Notice Re: Arbitration Consent of Video Conference(SHAY, JAMES) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice Re: Arbitration Consent of Video Conference(SAVOIA, TRAVIS) (Entered: 02/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by TRAVIS SAVOIA on behalf of MAUREEN WARMINSKI, and Withdrawal of Barry Scatton. (SAVOIA, TRAVIS) Modified on 2/16/2023 (md). (Entered: 02/14/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice Re: Arbitration Video Conference (Attachments: #1 Consent)(sah) (Entered: 02/14/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to Complaint together with Affirmative Defenses by STATE FARM INSURANCE COMPANY.(DOUGLAS, KATHERINE) (Entered: 02/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Letter re: Arbitration Certification (Attachments: #1 Arbitration Certification Form)(sbt) (Entered: 01/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by KATHERINE COLE DOUGLAS on behalf of STATE FARM INSURANCE COMPANY (DOUGLAS, KATHERINE) (Entered: 01/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by STATE FARM INSURANCE COMPANY.(SHAY, JAMES) (Entered: 01/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by STATE FARM INSURANCE COMPANY (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-16460396), filed by STATE FARM INSURANCE COMPANY.(SHAY, JAMES) (Entered: 01/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less