This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/19/2021 at 08:15:55 (UTC).

Wark v. Chevron Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 09/20/2021 Wark filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Chevron Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are David Counts and David B. Fannin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00075

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David Counts

Referral Judge

David B. Fannin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

James H. Wark

Defendants

Chevron Corporation

Noble Energy, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Andrew W. Dunlap

Attorney at Josephson Dunlap Law Firm

11 Greenway Plaza, Suite 3050

Houston, TX 77046

William R. Liles

Attorney at Josephson Dunlap

11 Greenway Plaza, Suite 3050

Houston, TX 77046

Richard J. Burch

Attorney at Bruckner Burch PLLC

8 Greenway Plaza, Suite 1500

Houston, TX 77046

Michael A. Josephson

Attorney at Josephson Dunlap Law Firm

11 Greenway Plaza, Suite 3050

Houston, TX 77046

Defendant Attorney

Michael Carter Crow

Attorney at Norton Rose Fulbright US LLP

1301 Mckinney, Suite 5100

Houston, TX 77010

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) ORDER and ADVISORY, The parties are hereby ORDERED to notify the Court whether or not they consent, under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Therefore, within thirty (30) days of the date of thefiling of this Order, each party shall sign the attached form to be filed with the Court. Signed by Judge David Counts. (ab1) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

#13

(#13) ORDER for Scheduling Recommendations. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall submit a proposed scheduling order to the Courtwithin thirty (30) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge David Counts. (ab1) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

#12

(#12) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Noble Energy, Inc..(Crow, Michael) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

11 #1

Proposed Order

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by James H. Wark (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dunlap, Andrew) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Stipulation Regarding Defendants' Responsive Pleading Deadlines for Plaintiff's Original Complaint by Chevron Corporation, Noble Energy, Inc. re #1 Complaint (Crow, Michael) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

#9

(#9) STIPULATION re Defendants' Responsive Pleading Deadlines by Chevron Corporation, Noble Energy, Inc.. (Crow, Michael) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by James H. Wark. Noble Energy, Inc. served on 10/4/2021, answer due 10/25/2021. (Dunlap, Andrew) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by James H. Wark. Chevron Corporation served on 10/1/2021, answer due 10/22/2021. (Dunlap, Andrew) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Chevron Corporation, Noble Energy, Inc.. (ab1) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - Consent

#1

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER and ADVISORY, The parties are hereby ORDERED to notify the Court whether or not they consent, under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Therefore, within thirty (30) days of the date of thefiling of this Order, each party shall sign the attached form to be filed with the Court. Signed by Judge David Counts. (ab1) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER for Scheduling Recommendations. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall submit a proposed scheduling order to the Courtwithin thirty (30) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge David Counts. (ab1) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Noble Energy, Inc..(Crow, Michael) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by James H. Wark (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dunlap, Andrew) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Stipulation Regarding Defendants' Responsive Pleading Deadlines for Plaintiff's Original Complaint by Chevron Corporation, Noble Energy, Inc. re #1 Complaint (Crow, Michael) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STIPULATION re Defendants' Responsive Pleading Deadlines by Chevron Corporation, Noble Energy, Inc.. (Crow, Michael) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by James H. Wark. Noble Energy, Inc. served on 10/4/2021, answer due 10/25/2021. (Dunlap, Andrew) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by James H. Wark. Chevron Corporation served on 10/1/2021, answer due 10/22/2021. (Dunlap, Andrew) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Chevron Corporation, Noble Energy, Inc.. (ab1) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketCASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge David B. Fannin. (ab1) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge David Counts. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (ab1) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by James H. Wark. (Josephson, Michael) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew W. Dunlap on behalf of James H. Wark. Attorney Andrew W. Dunlap added to party James H. Wark(pty:pla) (Dunlap, Andrew) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William R. Liles on behalf of James H. Wark. Attorney William R. Liles added to party James H. Wark(pty:pla) (Liles, William) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by James H. Wark. (Josephson, Michael) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15242201), filed by James H. Wark. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Consent, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Josephson, Michael) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NOBLE ENERGY INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Chevron USA, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael Carter Crow