This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/11/2023 at 15:17:44 (UTC).

Wargo v. NYU Winthrop Hospital et al

Case Summary

On 05/01/2020 Wargo filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against NYU Winthrop Hospital. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Sandra J. Feuerstein and Steven Tiscione. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-01993

  • Filing Date:

    05/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sandra J. Feuerstein

Referral Judge

Steven Tiscione

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gregory Wargo, Jr.

Defendants, Cross Claimants and 3Rd Party Plaintiffs

Timothy Irby

NYU Langone Health System

NYU Winthrop Hospital

Towne Park LLC

Dennis Sheridan

Mark Warren

NYU Langone Hospitals

E&B PARKING SERVICES, INC.

John Grosse

Winthrop University Hospital Services Corp.

John Gross

Defendants and Cross Defendants

Towne Park LLC

E&B PARKING SERVICES, INC.

Defendant, 3Rd Party Defendant and Cross Defendant

E&B PARKING SERVICES, INC.

20 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Daniel Shay Kirschbaum

Attorney at Derek Smith Law Group

One Penn Plaza, Ste 4905

New York, NY 10119

Defendant, Cross Claimant and 3Rd Party Plaintiff Attorneys

Christopher Michael McFadden

Attorney at Schoeman Updike Kaufman & Gerber LLP

551 Fifth Avenue, 12Th Floor

New York, NY 10176

Steven Gerber

Attorney at Schoeman Updike Kaufman & Gerber LLP

551 Fifth Avenue, 12Th Floor

New York, NY 10176

Rachel B. Jacobson

Attorney at Winthrop University Hospital

200 Old Country Rd, Suite 310

Mineola, NY 11501

Lincoln Owens Bisbee

Attorney at Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP

101 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10178

Eric C. Kim

Attorney at Philadelphia

1701 Market Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

John Paul Guyette

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP

101 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10178

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Lincoln Owens Bisbee

Attorney at Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP

101 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10178

Eric C. Kim

Attorney at Philadelphia

1701 Market Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

John Paul Guyette

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP

101 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10178

 

Court Documents

#59

(#59) Letter MOTION to Stay Discovery - on behalf of all parties by Gregory Wargo, Jr. (Kirschbaum, Daniel) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

#58

(#58) ORDER re #57 Stipulation and Proposed Consent Order. Ordered by Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein on 9/25/2020. (Florio, Lisa) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

#57

(#57) STIPULATION and Proposed Consent Order by E&B Parking Services, Inc., Towne Park LLC (Bisbee, Lincoln) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

#56

(#56) ANSWER to #51 Answer to Amended Complaint,, Crossclaim, by E&B Parking Services, Inc., Towne Park LLC. (Bisbee, Lincoln) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

#60

(#60) STIPULATION of Dismissal by Gregory Wargo, Jr (Kirschbaum, Daniel) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

#40

#39

#38

#37

50 #4

Proposed Order

50 #3

NJ Certificate of Good Standing

50 #2

PA Certificate of Good Standing

50 #1

Affidavit

#50

No Description Available

46 #1

Appendix

#46

No Description Available

65 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER DISMISSING CASE: Pursuant to #60 Stipulation of Dismissal, all complaints, third-party complaints, claims, and crossclaims in this matter are dismissed in their entirety with prejudice, and without costs, expenses, or fees against any party. Ordered by Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein on 2/8/2021. c/ECF (Adell, April) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#60) STIPULATION of Dismissal by Gregory Wargo, Jr (Kirschbaum, Daniel) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER denying #59 Motion to Stay: The application is denied. Ordered by Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein on 10/20/2020. c/ECF (Adell, April) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#59) Letter MOTION to Stay Discovery - on behalf of all parties by Gregory Wargo, Jr. (Kirschbaum, Daniel) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#58) ORDER re #57 Stipulation and Proposed Consent Order. Ordered by Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein on 9/25/2020. (Florio, Lisa) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#57) STIPULATION and Proposed Consent Order by E&B Parking Services, Inc., Towne Park LLC (Bisbee, Lincoln) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#56) ANSWER to #51 Answer to Amended Complaint,, Crossclaim, by E&B Parking Services, Inc., Towne Park LLC. (Bisbee, Lincoln) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) Corporate Disclosure Statement by E&B Parking Services, Inc. (Bisbee, Lincoln) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Towne Park LLC (Bisbee, Lincoln) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) ANSWER to #44 Amended Complaint, by E&B Parking Services, Inc., Towne Park LLC. (Bisbee, Lincoln) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
57 More Docket Entries
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint by Gregory Wargo, Jr (Kirschbaum, Daniel) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint by Gregory Wargo, Jr (Kirschbaum, Daniel) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint by Gregory Wargo, Jr (Kirschbaum, Daniel) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • DocketSCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Conference set for 9/9/2020 at 11:15 AM in Courtroom 1010 before Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein at the Central Islip Federal Courthouse, located at 100 Federal Plaza, Central Islip, New York 11722. The parties shall appear with authority, or with individuals with authority, to settle this matter. Plaintiff(s) shall serve a copy of this SCHEDULING ORDER upon Defendant(s) and file proof of such service with the Court.Ordered by Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein on 5/1/2020.c/ECF (Killigrew, Patricia) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein and Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • DocketIncorrect Document Entry Information. Defendant was added to the case incorrectly; docket entry 1 was deleted and re-entered against corrected defendant. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • DocketFILING FEE: $400, receipt number ANYEDC-12742628 (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Gregory Wargo, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less