This case was last updated from PACER on 04/06/2021 at 08:46:33 (UTC).

Wargaming.Net Limited v. Apple, Inc.

Case Summary

On 02/05/2021 Wargaming Net Limited filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Apple, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Dean D. Pregerson, Jean P. Rosenbluth and James V. Selna. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-01066

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Jean P. Rosenbluth

Presiding Judges

Dean D. Pregerson

James V. Selna

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WARGAMING.NET LIMITED, a Cyprus limited company

Wargaming.Net Limited

Defendants

APPLE, INC., a California corporation

Apple, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jill M Pietrini

Attorney at Sheppard Mullin Richter and Hampton LLP

1901 Avenue Of The Stars Suite 1600

Los Angeles, CA 90067-6055

Christopher Scott Ponder

Attorney at Sheppard Mullin Richter and Hampton LLP

379 Lytton Avenue

Palo Alto, CA 94301

Paul A Bost

Attorney at Sheppard Mullin Richter and Hampton LLP

1901 Avenue Of The Stars Suite 1600

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Defendant Attorney

Nicolas A Jampol

Attorney at Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

865 South Figueroa Street Suite 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90017-2566

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference for 5/3/2021 at 11:30 am before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file the Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report, with the completed Exhibit A, by 4/26/2021. (lb) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

#15

(#15) ORDER GRANTING SECOND STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR APPLE INC. TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT #14 by Judge James V. Selna, it is HEREBY ORDERED that the time for Apple Inc. to respond to Wargaming.net Limited's complaint shall be extended to April 30, 2021. (es) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

#13

(#13) INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

#12

(#12) ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 21-01. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Dean D. Pregerson to Judge James V. Selna for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:21-cv-01066 JVS(JPRx). (rn) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

#11

(#11) First STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Apple, Inc. answer now due 3/31/2021, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Apple, Inc..(Attorney Nicolas A Jampol added to party Apple, Inc.(pty:dft))(Jampol, Nicolas) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

#10

(#10) ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03 (Related Case) filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge Cormac J. Carney, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. 2:20-cv-02763 CJC(MRWx) (rn) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

#9

(#9) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Apple, Inc. (et) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

#8

(#8) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (et) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

#6

(#6) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff WARGAMING.NET LIMITED, a Cyprus limited company. (Pietrini, Jill) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

#5

(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff WARGAMING.NET LIMITED, a Cyprus limited company identifying Wargaming Group Limited as Corporate Parent. (Pietrini, Jill) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

#4

(#4) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by WARGAMING.NET LIMITED, a Cyprus limited company. (Pietrini, Jill) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

#3

(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff WARGAMING.NET LIMITED, a Cyprus limited company. (Pietrini, Jill) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

#2

(#2) Certificate and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff WARGAMING.NET LIMITED, a Cyprus limited company, identifying Wargaming Group Limited. (Pietrini, Jill) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference for 5/3/2021 at 11:30 am before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file the Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report, with the completed Exhibit A, by 4/26/2021. (lb) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER GRANTING SECOND STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR APPLE INC. TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT #14 by Judge James V. Selna, it is HEREBY ORDERED that the time for Apple Inc. to respond to Wargaming.net Limited's complaint shall be extended to April 30, 2021. (es) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Second STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Apple, Inc. answer now due 4/30/2021, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jampol, Nicolas) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 21-01. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Dean D. Pregerson to Judge James V. Selna for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:21-cv-01066 JVS(JPRx). (rn) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) First STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Apple, Inc. answer now due 3/31/2021, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Apple, Inc..(Attorney Nicolas A Jampol added to party Apple, Inc.(pty:dft))(Jampol, Nicolas) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03 (Related Case) filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge Cormac J. Carney, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. 2:20-cv-02763 CJC(MRWx) (rn) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Apple, Inc. (et) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (et) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff WARGAMING.NET LIMITED, a Cyprus limited company. (Pietrini, Jill) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff WARGAMING.NET LIMITED, a Cyprus limited company identifying Wargaming Group Limited as Corporate Parent. (Pietrini, Jill) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by WARGAMING.NET LIMITED, a Cyprus limited company. (Pietrini, Jill) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff WARGAMING.NET LIMITED, a Cyprus limited company. (Pietrini, Jill) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Certificate and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff WARGAMING.NET LIMITED, a Cyprus limited company, identifying Wargaming Group Limited. (Pietrini, Jill) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: BCACDC-30423616 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff WARGAMING.NET LIMITED, a Cyprus limited company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - K) (Attorney Jill M Pietrini added to party WARGAMING.NET LIMITED, a Cyprus limited company(pty:pla))(Pietrini, Jill) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WARGAMING.NET LIMITED, a Cyprus limited company is a litigant

Latest cases where Apple Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nicolas A Jampol