This case was last updated from PACER on 12/08/2020 at 08:09:50 (UTC).

Wares v. Safeco Insurance Company of America

Case Summary

On 10/09/2020 Wares filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Safeco Insurance Company of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kansas District. The Judges overseeing this case are Holly L. Teeter and James P. O'Hara. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-CV-01278

  • Filing Date:

    10/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kansas District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Holly L. Teeter

Referral Judge

James P. O'Hara

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michael S. Wares

Defendant

Safeco Insurance Company of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John Hadley Sizemore

Attorney at Brad Pistotnik Law, PA

10111 East 21St Street North, Suite 204

Wichita, KS 67206

Tony L. Atterbury

Attorney at Brad Pistotnik Law, PA

10111 East 21St Street North, Suite 204

Wichita, KS 67206

Defendant Attorney

Oscar P. Espinoza

Attorney at Law Office of Stephanie Warmund

9001 State Line Road, Suite 130

Kansas City, MO 64114

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE by Plaintiff Michael S. Wares Plaintiff's Good Faith Settlement Proposal. (Atterbury, Tony) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

#8

(#8) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery Requests to Defendant by Michael S. Wares. (Atterbury, Tony) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

#7

(#7) INITIAL ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 12/21/2020 at 9:00 AM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 12/10/2020. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 12/10/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 11/9/2020. All parties and counsel participating in this phone conference are directed to dial the conference center line 888-363-4749, using access code 8914911 to join the conference. (ss) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

#6

(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Safeco Insurance Company of America identifying Safeco Corporation as corporate parent (Espinoza, Oscar) (Entered: 11/07/2020)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint by Safeco Insurance Company of America.(Espinoza, Oscar) (Entered: 11/07/2020)

#4

(#4) ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Oscar P. Espinoza on behalf of Safeco Insurance Company of America (Espinoza, Oscar) (Entered: 11/07/2020)

3 #1

Proof of Service

#3

(#3) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- certified mail by Michael S. Wares upon Safeco Insurance Company of America served on 10/16/2020, answer due 11/6/2020 (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Atterbury, Tony) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Michael S. Wares. (Atterbury, Tony) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita (Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5284469.), filed by Michael S. Wares.(Atterbury, Tony) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE by Plaintiff Michael S. Wares Plaintiff's Good Faith Settlement Proposal. (Atterbury, Tony) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery Requests to Defendant by Michael S. Wares. (Atterbury, Tony) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) INITIAL ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 12/21/2020 at 9:00 AM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 12/10/2020. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 12/10/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 11/9/2020. All parties and counsel participating in this phone conference are directed to dial the conference center line 888-363-4749, using access code 8914911 to join the conference. (ss) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Safeco Insurance Company of America identifying Safeco Corporation as corporate parent (Espinoza, Oscar) (Entered: 11/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to Complaint by Safeco Insurance Company of America.(Espinoza, Oscar) (Entered: 11/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Oscar P. Espinoza on behalf of Safeco Insurance Company of America (Espinoza, Oscar) (Entered: 11/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- certified mail by Michael S. Wares upon Safeco Insurance Company of America served on 10/16/2020, answer due 11/6/2020 (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Atterbury, Tony) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED as to Safeco Insurance Company of America (issued to Attorney for service). (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jk) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Holly L. Teeter and Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Michael S. Wares. (Atterbury, Tony) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita (Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5284469.), filed by Michael S. Wares.(Atterbury, Tony) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less