Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 01/09/2021 at 09:48:25 (UTC).

Warehouse Market, Inc. v. State of Oklahoma

Case Summary

On 11/10/2020 Warehouse Market, Inc filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against State of Oklahoma. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Claire V Eagan and Jodi F Jayne. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00577

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Oklahoma Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Claire V Eagan

Referral Judge

Jodi F Jayne

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Warehouse Market, Inc.

Defendant

State of Oklahoma

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

James H Ferris

Attorney at Moyers Martin, LLP

401 S Boston Ave Ste 1100

Tulsa, OK 74103

Randall Jay Lewin

Attorney at Moyers Martin, LLP

401 S Boston Ave Ste 1100

Tulsa, OK 74103

Scott VanBrunt Morgan

Attorney at Moyers Martin, LLP

401 S. Boston Avenue, Suite 1100

Tulsa, OK 74103

Defendant Attorney

Randall John Yates

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General (OKC 313)

313 Ne 21St St

Oklahoma City, OK 73105

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) OPINION AND ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan - Defendant's Motion to Stay and Brief in Support (Dkt. # 10) is granted, and this case is stayed pending a ruling by the Oklahoma Supreme Court in the interpleader action filed by Warehouse Market in Oklmulgee County District Court. The parties shall file notice within seven days of the Oklahoma Supreme Court's decision, and the parties shall attach a copy of the Oklahoma Supreme Court's ruling to the notice. ; staying case; granting #10 Motion to Stay (Re: #1 Complaint, #10 MOTION to Stay and Brief in Support ) (RGG, Chambers) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

#14

(#14) REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #10 MOTION to Stay and Brief in Support ) by State of Oklahoma ; (Yates, Randall) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

13 #3

Exhibit 3

13 #2

Exhibit 2

13 #1

Exhibit 1

#13

(#13) RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #10 MOTION to Stay and Brief in Support ) by Warehouse Market, Inc. ; (With attachments) (Lewin, Randall) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

#11

(#11) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: #1 Complaint ) by State of Oklahoma (Yates, Randall) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

#10

(#10) MOTION to Stay and Brief in Support by State of Oklahoma (Yates, Randall) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

#9

(#9) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Randall John Yates on behalf of State of Oklahoma [Note: Attorney Randall John Yates added to party State of Oklahoma(pty:dft).] (Yates, Randall) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to State of Oklahoma (sc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

#6

(#6) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Scott V Morgan on behalf of Warehouse Market, Inc. (Lewin, Randall) Modified on 11/12/2020 to change text to reflect correct attorney appearing (sac, Dpty Clk). (Entered: 11/10/2020)

#5

(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Warehouse Market, Inc. (Lewin, Randall) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

#4

(#4) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Warehouse Market, Inc. (Lewin, Randall) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Randall Jay Lewin on behalf of Warehouse Market, Inc. (Lewin, Randall) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

#2

(#2) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by James H Ferris on behalf of Warehouse Market, Inc. (Lewin, Randall) Modified on 11/12/2020 to change text to reflect correct attorney appearing (sac, Dpty Clk). (Entered: 11/10/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against State of Oklahoma (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2299990) by Warehouse Market, Inc. [Note: Attorney Randall Jay Lewin added to party Warehouse Market, Inc.(pty:pla).] (Lewin, Randall) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) OPINION AND ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan - Defendant's Motion to Stay and Brief in Support (Dkt. # 10) is granted, and this case is stayed pending a ruling by the Oklahoma Supreme Court in the interpleader action filed by Warehouse Market in Oklmulgee County District Court. The parties shall file notice within seven days of the Oklahoma Supreme Court's decision, and the parties shall attach a copy of the Oklahoma Supreme Court's ruling to the notice. ; staying case; granting #10 Motion to Stay (Re: #1 Complaint, #10 MOTION to Stay and Brief in Support ) (RGG, Chambers) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #10 MOTION to Stay and Brief in Support ) by State of Oklahoma ; (Yates, Randall) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #10 MOTION to Stay and Brief in Support ) by Warehouse Market, Inc. ; (With attachments) (Lewin, Randall) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MINUTE ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan that defendant's unopposed motion #11 is granted. Defendant, Oklahoma Tax Commission, is granted an extension of time to file its answer or other responsive pleading to either 14 days from the date the pending motion #10 is denied, or if granted, 14 days after the stay is lifted. ; granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: #1 Complaint, #10 MOTION to Stay and Brief in Support ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (RGG, Chambers) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: #1 Complaint ) by State of Oklahoma (Yates, Randall) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to Stay and Brief in Support by State of Oklahoma (Yates, Randall) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Randall John Yates on behalf of State of Oklahoma [Note: Attorney Randall John Yates added to party State of Oklahoma(pty:dft).] (Yates, Randall) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to State of Oklahoma (sc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • Docket(#7) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Warehouse Market, Inc. to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (jln, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Scott V Morgan on behalf of Warehouse Market, Inc. (Lewin, Randall) Modified on 11/12/2020 to change text to reflect correct attorney appearing (sac, Dpty Clk). (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Warehouse Market, Inc. (Lewin, Randall) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Warehouse Market, Inc. (Lewin, Randall) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Randall Jay Lewin on behalf of Warehouse Market, Inc. (Lewin, Randall) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by James H Ferris on behalf of Warehouse Market, Inc. (Lewin, Randall) Modified on 11/12/2020 to change text to reflect correct attorney appearing (sac, Dpty Clk). (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against State of Oklahoma (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2299990) by Warehouse Market, Inc. [Note: Attorney Randall Jay Lewin added to party Warehouse Market, Inc.(pty:pla).] (Lewin, Randall) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Warehouse Market, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Randall John Yates