This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2019 at 05:41:28 (UTC).

WARE v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Case Summary

On 08/22/2019 WARE filed a Prisoner - Vacate Sentence lawsuit against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judge overseeing this case is John Michael Vazquez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-17224

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Vacate Sentence

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John Michael Vazquez

 

Party Details

Petitioner

REGINALD H. WARE

Minersville, PA 17954

Respondent

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorneys

JOSE ALMONTE

Attorney at U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

970 Broad Street

Newark, NJ 07101

ROBERT L. FRAZER

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE US ATTORNEY

970 Broad Street, Suite 700

Newark, NJ 07102

JOHN GAY

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE US ATTORNEY

970 Broad Street, Suite 700

Newark, NJ 07102

 

Court Documents

3 #1

Envelope

#3

(#3) Letter from REGINALD WARE. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(dam, ) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

#2

(#2) ORDER that the United States shall, within sixty (60) days of the entry of this Order, file an Answer in Ware's present habeas matter. Ware may, within thirty (30) days of receiving the United States' Answer or other appropriate motion, submit a response to the same. etc. Signed by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 8/3/2019. (dam, ) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

1 #2

Order

1 #1

Petition

#1

(#1) MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) pursuant to the Johnson Ruling. In Re to Criminal Case file 2:11-cr-00224-JMV-1, filed by REGINALD H. WARE. "Forwarded to FPD'S Office". (Attachments: #1 Petition, #2 Order)(bt, ) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Letter from REGINALD WARE. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(dam, ) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER that the United States shall, within sixty (60) days of the entry of this Order, file an Answer in Ware's present habeas matter. Ware may, within thirty (30) days of receiving the United States' Answer or other appropriate motion, submit a response to the same. etc. Signed by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 8/3/2019. (dam, ) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) pursuant to the Johnson Ruling. In Re to Criminal Case file 2:11-cr-00224-JMV-1, filed by REGINALD H. WARE. "Forwarded to FPD'S Office". (Attachments: #1 Petition, #2 Order)(bt, ) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.