This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2020 at 09:58:45 (UTC).

Ward v. United States of America

Case Summary

On 07/16/2020 Ward filed a Prisoner - Vacate Sentence lawsuit against United States of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Tu M. Pham and Samuel H. Mays, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-02523

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Vacate Sentence

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Tu M. Pham

Presiding Judge

Samuel H. Mays, Jr

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Rickey Ward

Ayer, MA 01432

Respondent

United States of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorneys

Naya Bedini

Attorney at DOJ-USAO

167 N Main St., Ste 800

Memphis, TN 38103

2255 AUSA

Attorney at U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE - Memphis

167 N. Main St., Suite 800

Memphis, TN 38103

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint and Response in Opposition by United States of America.(Bedini, Naya) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

#4

(#4) ORDER directing United States to Respond, sgned by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. on 07/22/2020. (Mays, Samuel) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Naya Bedini on behalf of United States of America (Bedini, Naya) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

1 #3

Judicial Cards

1 #2

Envelope

1 #1

Letter to FPD

#1

(#1) PRO SE Motion Under 28 U.S.C. 2255 to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence filed by Rickey Ward against United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Letter to FPD, #2 Envelope)(csf) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/22/2020: #3 Judicial Cards) (csf). (Entered: 07/20/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to Complaint and Response in Opposition by United States of America.(Bedini, Naya) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER directing United States to Respond, sgned by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. on 07/22/2020. (Mays, Samuel) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Naya Bedini on behalf of United States of America (Bedini, Naya) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Pro Se Prisoner track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (csf) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PRO SE Motion Under 28 U.S.C. 2255 to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence filed by Rickey Ward against United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Letter to FPD, #2 Envelope)(csf) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/22/2020: #3 Judicial Cards) (csf). (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less