This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/02/2022 at 08:49:26 (UTC).

Ward v. Raymond James Financial, Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/03/2021 Ward filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Raymond James Financial, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Virginia M. Hernandez Covington and Anthony E. Porcelli. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:21-CV-02584

  • Filing Date:

    11/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Virginia M. Hernandez Covington

Referral Judge

Anthony E. Porcelli

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PAMELA WARD

Defendant

Raymond James Financial, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew W. Birk

Attorney at Matthew Birk, Esq., Law Office

309 Ne 1St St.

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Raymond James Financial, Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-18890743) filed by Pamela Ward. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Birk, Matthew) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

1 #1

Proposed Summons

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

(#3) SUMMONS issued as to Raymond James Financial, Inc. (LNR) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

#4

(#4) MOTION to Stay by Pamela Ward. (Birk, Matthew) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ENDORSED ORDER denying #4 Plaintiff's Motion to Stay. The record does not reflect that Defendant has been served with process to date, and Plaintiff has until February 1, 2022, in which to effect service of process. At this point, the granting of a unilateral motion to stay the case is not appropriate. If Plaintiff determines that it is appropriate to do so, she may file a notice of dismissal under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1), which allows plaintiffs to file a voluntary notice of dismissal at any point before the opposing party serves an answer or a motion for summary judgment. Otherwise, this case will proceed as provided by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 12/17/2021. (SGM) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Stay by Pamela Ward. (Birk, Matthew) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS issued as to Raymond James Financial, Inc. (LNR) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington and Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. New case number: 8:21-cv-2584-VMC-AEP. (SJB) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Raymond James Financial, Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-18890743) filed by Pamela Ward. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Birk, Matthew) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RAYMOND JAMES FINANCIAL SERVICES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew William Kumin