This case was last updated from PACER on 11/10/2020 at 09:24:57 (UTC).

Ward v. Payne

Case Summary

On 09/11/2020 Ward filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Payne. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Shirley Padmore Mensah. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-01244

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Missouri Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Shirley Padmore Mensah

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Timothy L. Ward

Bonne Terre, MO 63628

Respondent

Stanley Payne

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

Office of Missouri Attorney General - Habeas Division

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF MISSOURI - Habeas Division

221 W. High Street

Jefferson City, MO 65101

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) ORDER OF TRANSFER TO OTHER DISTRICT to: the United States District Court for the Western District of Missouri.( Case to be transferred after 9/29/2020.). Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 09/15/2020. (AAT) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner Timothy L. Ward. (JWD) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

1 #3

Envelope

1 #2

Original Filing Form

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Petitioner Timothy L. Ward. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Envelope)(JWD) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2020
  • Docket***REMARK - Case transferred from Missouri Eastern has been opened in Western District of Missouri as case 4:20-cv-00806. (KXS) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • Docket***REMARK - Case was electronically transferred to United States District Court for the Western District of Missouri on October 5, 2020. (MCB) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 4. Tue Sep 15 15:11:58 CDT 2020 (Thompson, Alicia) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER OF TRANSFER TO OTHER DISTRICT to: the United States District Court for the Western District of Missouri.( Case to be transferred after 9/29/2020.). Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 09/15/2020. (AAT) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • Docket(#3) Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (FLJ) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • Docket***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Mon Sep 14 11:01:03 CDT 2020 (admin,) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • Docket***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (JWD) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketCase Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: Honorable Shirley P. Mensah. (JWD) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner Timothy L. Ward. (JWD) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Petitioner Timothy L. Ward. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Envelope)(JWD) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less