This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/27/2023 at 07:16:22 (UTC).

Ward v. Kammrad et al

Case Summary

On 01/26/2023 Ward filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Kammrad. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Gordon P. Gallagher. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-00233

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gordon P. Gallagher

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Demontray Ward

Defendants

A.W. Altizer

Lindgren

T. Wagner

Kreisman

John McGaugh

Azzoz

T. Bales

J. Kammrad

Bayer

Martin

Starr

Kornder

Neal

Schilling

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) MOTION for Clarification, by Plaintiff Demontray Ward. (angar, ) (Entered: 03/17/2023)

#16

(#16) Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915, by Plaintiff Demontray Ward. (angar, ) (Entered: 03/17/2023)

#15

(#15) MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiff filed a motion requesting the Court to order USP Florence to provide a certified copy of his six month account statement. (ECF No. #14 ). The motion is DENIED. Plaintiff is ordered to comply with the directives in the Court's March 2, 2023 Order to cure deficiencies (ECF No. #13 ) within the time allowed. If he fails to cure the deficiencies as directed, the action will be dismissed without further notice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 3/8/2023.(angar, ) (Entered: 03/08/2023)

#14

(#14) MOTION Requesting that the Court Order USP Florence to Turn Over a Certified Copy of My 6 Month Account Statement by Plaintiff Demontray Ward. (athom, ) (Entered: 03/06/2023)

#13

(#13) ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiencies. the Court's January 30, 2023 Order to Cure Deficiencies (ECF No. #9 ) is VACATED. Plaintiffs Motion for Clarification (ECF No. #10 ) is GRANTED. Plaintiff is informed that the January 30, 2023 Order to Cure Deficiencies has been vacated. Plaintiff shall cure the deficiency designated above within 30 days from the date of this Order. Any papers that Plaintiff files in response to this Order must include the civil action number on this Order. Plaintiff's "Motion Requesting that the Court Enforce My Motion for a Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order" (ECF No. #11 ) is DENIED as moot. Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Counsel (ECF No. #8 ) is denied without prejudice as premature. ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 3/2/2023.(angar, ) (Entered: 03/02/2023)

#12

(#12) Account Statements, by Plaintiff Demontray Ward. (angar, ) (Entered: 03/01/2023)

#11

(#11) MOTION Requesting That the Court Enforce My Motions for a Preliminary Injunction and the Temporary Restraining Order Because My Life Is In Danger by Plaintiff Demontray Ward. (trvo, ) (Entered: 02/21/2023)

#10

(#10) MOTION for Clarification by Plaintiff Demontray Ward. (trvo, ) (Entered: 02/15/2023)

#9

(#9) VACATED ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiencies. If Plaintiff fails to cure the designated deficiencies within 30 days from the date of this Order the action will be dismissed without further notice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 1/30/2023. (angar, ) Modified on 3/15/2023 to show as vacated pursuant to #9 Order (angar, ). (Entered: 01/30/2023)

#8

(#8) MOTION for Appointment Counsel, by Plaintiff Demontray Ward. (angar, ) (Entered: 01/30/2023)

#7

(#7) Notice of Proposed Order for a Preliminary injunction, by Plaintiff Demontray Ward (angar, ) (Entered: 01/30/2023)

#6

(#6) Motion and Affidavit in Forma Pauperis, by Plaintiff Demontray Ward. (angar, ) (Entered: 01/30/2023)

#5

(#5) Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915, by Plaintiff Demontray Ward. (angar, ) Modified on 2/28/2023 to correct document (angar, ). (Entered: 01/30/2023)

4 #4

Affidavit

4 #3

Declaration

4 #2

Declaration of De'Montray Ward

4 #1

Summons

#4

(#4) AMENDED Prisoner COMPLAINT against A.W. Altizer, Lindgren, T. Wagner, Kreisman, John McGaugh, Azzoz, T. Bales, J. Kammrad, Bayer, Martin, Starr, Kornder, Neal, Schilling, filed by Demontray Ward. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Declaration of De'Montray Ward, #3 Declaration, #4 Affidavit, #5 Envelope)(angar, ) Modified on 3/1/2023 to add missing pages (angar, ). (Entered: 01/30/2023)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION for Clarification, by Plaintiff Demontray Ward. (angar, ) (Entered: 03/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915, by Plaintiff Demontray Ward. (angar, ) (Entered: 03/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiff filed a motion requesting the Court to order USP Florence to provide a certified copy of his six month account statement. (ECF No. #14 ). The motion is DENIED. Plaintiff is ordered to comply with the directives in the Court's March 2, 2023 Order to cure deficiencies (ECF No. #13 ) within the time allowed. If he fails to cure the deficiencies as directed, the action will be dismissed without further notice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 3/8/2023.(angar, ) (Entered: 03/08/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION Requesting that the Court Order USP Florence to Turn Over a Certified Copy of My 6 Month Account Statement by Plaintiff Demontray Ward. (athom, ) (Entered: 03/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiencies. the Court's January 30, 2023 Order to Cure Deficiencies (ECF No. #9 ) is VACATED. Plaintiffs Motion for Clarification (ECF No. #10 ) is GRANTED. Plaintiff is informed that the January 30, 2023 Order to Cure Deficiencies has been vacated. Plaintiff shall cure the deficiency designated above within 30 days from the date of this Order. Any papers that Plaintiff files in response to this Order must include the civil action number on this Order. Plaintiff's "Motion Requesting that the Court Enforce My Motion for a Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order" (ECF No. #11 ) is DENIED as moot. Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Counsel (ECF No. #8 ) is denied without prejudice as premature. ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 3/2/2023.(angar, ) (Entered: 03/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Account Statements, by Plaintiff Demontray Ward. (angar, ) (Entered: 03/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION Requesting That the Court Enforce My Motions for a Preliminary Injunction and the Temporary Restraining Order Because My Life Is In Danger by Plaintiff Demontray Ward. (trvo, ) (Entered: 02/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Clarification by Plaintiff Demontray Ward. (trvo, ) (Entered: 02/15/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) VACATED ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiencies. If Plaintiff fails to cure the designated deficiencies within 30 days from the date of this Order the action will be dismissed without further notice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 1/30/2023. (angar, ) Modified on 3/15/2023 to show as vacated pursuant to #9 Order (angar, ). (Entered: 01/30/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Appointment Counsel, by Plaintiff Demontray Ward. (angar, ) (Entered: 01/30/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice of Proposed Order for a Preliminary injunction, by Plaintiff Demontray Ward (angar, ) (Entered: 01/30/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Motion and Affidavit in Forma Pauperis, by Plaintiff Demontray Ward. (angar, ) (Entered: 01/30/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915, by Plaintiff Demontray Ward. (angar, ) Modified on 2/28/2023 to correct document (angar, ). (Entered: 01/30/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AMENDED Prisoner COMPLAINT against A.W. Altizer, Lindgren, T. Wagner, Kreisman, John McGaugh, Azzoz, T. Bales, J. Kammrad, Bayer, Martin, Starr, Kornder, Neal, Schilling, filed by Demontray Ward. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Declaration of De'Montray Ward, #3 Declaration, #4 Affidavit, #5 Envelope)(angar, ) Modified on 3/1/2023 to add missing pages (angar, ). (Entered: 01/30/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Inmate Statement by Plaintiff Demontray Ward (jcharl, ) (Entered: 01/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • Docket(#2) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (jcharl, ) (Entered: 01/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) LETTER by Plaintiff Demontray Ward. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jcharl, ) (Entered: 01/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less