This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2019 at 09:48:23 (UTC).

Ward-Jones v. Amsted Industries, Inc.,

Case Summary

On 05/17/2019 Ward-Jones filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Amsted Industries, Inc . This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Charles P. Kocoras. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-03356

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Charles P. Kocoras

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lyndsey Ward-Jones

Defendants

Amsted Industries, Inc., d/b/a Burgess-Norton Mfg. Co., Inc.

Amsted Industries, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lisa R. Kane

Attorney at Lisa Kane & Associates, PC

141 West Jackson Boulevard, Suite 3620

Chicago, IL 60604

Nicky M Priovolos

Attorney at Lisa Kane & Associates

141 W. Jackson Boulevard, Suite 3620

Chicago, IL 60604

Defendant Attorneys

Priya Prakash Khatkhate

Attorney at Jackson Lewis, P.C

150 N. Michigan Avenue, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60601

Jane M. McFetridge

Attorney at Jackson Lewis P.C. (Chicago)

150 N. Michigan Ave, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60601

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Lyndsey Ward-Jones; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15840233.(Kane, Lisa) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Kane, Lisa) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Lyndsey Ward-Jones by Lisa R. Kane (Kane, Lisa) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lyndsey Ward-Jones as to Amsted Industries, Inc. on 5/22/2019, answer due 6/12/2019. (Kane, Lisa) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Lyndsey Ward-Jones by Nicky M Priovolos (Priovolos, Nicky) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

#6

(#6) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Status hearing set for 6/20/2019 at 9:30 AM. At the initial hearing, parties to report on the following: 1. Possibility of settlement. 2. If no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary to prepare the case for resolution. Lead counsel for each party is required to attend the initial hearing. Failure to appear at any scheduled court hearing may result in the dismissal of claims for want of prosecution. Pursuant to Local Rule 5.3(a)(1), service of motions and notice of motions must be accomplished no later than 4:00 p.m. of the third business day preceding the date of presentment. This includes delivering a hard copy of the motion and notice of motion to Courtroom Deputy, Vettina Franklin at room 1744B no later than 4:00 p.m. the day of filing. Failure to comply may result in the striking of the matter from the Court's motion call. The Court requires hard copies of all documents be submitted to Courtroom Deputy, Vettina Franklin at room 1744B the same day of filing. Failure to comply may result in the striking of the document from the record. The Court directs counsel's attention to its Motion Schedule and Case Management Procedures located at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Plaintiff is directed to advise all other parties of the Court's action herein. Mailed notice (vcf, ) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

#7

(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Amsted Industries, Inc. by Jane M. McFetridge ATTORNEY APPEARANCE (McFetridge, Jane) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

#8

(#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Amsted Industries, Inc. by Priya Prakash Khatkhate ATTORNEY APPEARANCE (Khatkhate, Priya) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

#27

RESTRICTED

#21

(#21) MOTION by Plaintiff Lyndsey Ward-Jones to supplement Instanter Plaintiff's Motion to Amend (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Kane, Lisa) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

24 #3

Exhibit C

#26

(#26) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Motion hearing held. For the reasons stated in open court, Plaintiff's motion for leave to supplement plaintiff's motion to amend instanter #21 is denied as moot. Defendants' motion for an enlargement of time within which to answer or otherwise respond to plaintiffs first amended complaint by 7/30/2019 #24 is granted. Mailed notice (vcf, ) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

#24

(#24) MOTION by Defendant Amsted Industries, Inc. for extension of time to file answer regarding amended complaint #23 Defendants' Motion for an Enlargement of TIme within which to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(McFetridge, Jane) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

24 #2

Exhibit B

24 #1

Exhibit A

21 #6

Exhibit F

21 #7

Exhibit G

21 #1

Exhibit A

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on July 11, 2019 before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras. Order Number: 35363. Court Reporter Contact Information: Ms. Joene Hanhardt, Official Court Reporter, 219 S. Dearborn St., Suite 1744-A, Chicago, Illinois 60604, 312-435-6874. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 8/5/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/15/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/15/2019. (Hanhardt, Joene) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Motion hearing held. For the reasons stated in open court, Plaintiff's motion for leave to supplement plaintiff's motion to amend instanter #21 is denied as moot. Defendants' motion for an enlargement of time within which to answer or otherwise respond to plaintiffs first amended complaint by 7/30/2019 #24 is granted. Mailed notice (vcf, ) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) NOTICE of Motion by Jane M. McFetridge for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer, #24 before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 7/11/2019 at 09:30 AM. (McFetridge, Jane) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) MOTION by Defendant Amsted Industries, Inc. for extension of time to file answer regarding amended complaint #23 Defendants' Motion for an Enlargement of TIme within which to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(McFetridge, Jane) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) First AMENDED complaint by Lyndsey Ward-Jones against Amsted Industries, Inc. et al (Kane, Lisa) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) NOTICE of Motion by Lisa R. Kane for presentment of motion to supplement, #21 before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 7/11/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Kane, Lisa) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) MOTION by Plaintiff Lyndsey Ward-Jones to supplement Instanter Plaintiff's Motion to Amend (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Kane, Lisa) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) RESPONSE by Defendant Amsted Industries, Inc. Redacted-Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend the Named Parties Listed in Plaintiff's Complaint #15 (McFetridge, Jane) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Plaintiff's motion for leave to amend the named parties listed in Plaintiff's Complaint #15 is granted. Motion hearing set for 6/27/2019 is stricken, no appearance is required. Mailed notice (vcf, ) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) RESPONSE by Amsted Industries, Inc. to MOTION by Plaintiff Lyndsey Ward-Jones to amend/correct the Named Parties Listed in Plaintiff's Complaint #15 DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND THE NAMED PARTIES LISTED IN PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT (McFetridge, Jane) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Amsted Industries, Inc. by Priya Prakash Khatkhate ATTORNEY APPEARANCE (Khatkhate, Priya) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Amsted Industries, Inc. by Jane M. McFetridge ATTORNEY APPEARANCE (McFetridge, Jane) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Status hearing set for 6/20/2019 at 9:30 AM. At the initial hearing, parties to report on the following: 1. Possibility of settlement. 2. If no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary to prepare the case for resolution. Lead counsel for each party is required to attend the initial hearing. Failure to appear at any scheduled court hearing may result in the dismissal of claims for want of prosecution. Pursuant to Local Rule 5.3(a)(1), service of motions and notice of motions must be accomplished no later than 4:00 p.m. of the third business day preceding the date of presentment. This includes delivering a hard copy of the motion and notice of motion to Courtroom Deputy, Vettina Franklin at room 1744B no later than 4:00 p.m. the day of filing. Failure to comply may result in the striking of the matter from the Court's motion call. The Court requires hard copies of all documents be submitted to Courtroom Deputy, Vettina Franklin at room 1744B the same day of filing. Failure to comply may result in the striking of the document from the record. The Court directs counsel's attention to its Motion Schedule and Case Management Procedures located at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Plaintiff is directed to advise all other parties of the Court's action herein. Mailed notice (vcf, ) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Lyndsey Ward-Jones by Nicky M Priovolos (Priovolos, Nicky) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lyndsey Ward-Jones as to Amsted Industries, Inc. on 5/22/2019, answer due 6/12/2019. (Kane, Lisa) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Amsted Industries, Inc. (rc, ) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Mary M. Rowland. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lma, ) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Lyndsey Ward-Jones by Lisa R. Kane (Kane, Lisa) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Kane, Lisa) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Lyndsey Ward-Jones; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15840233.(Kane, Lisa) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.