This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/15/2022 at 07:35:54 (UTC).

Mike Wang v. Nikolaos Vlahos et al

Case Summary

On 12/17/2021 Mike Wang filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Nikolaos Vlahos. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Mark C. Scarsi and Paul L. Abrams. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-09763

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mark C. Scarsi

Referral Judge

Paul L. Abrams

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mike Wang

Defendants

Nikolaos Vlahos

Kelly Kennedy

Jessica Warren

Katie Bayne

Scott Dahnke

Susan Gentile

Eric Liaw

Jeremy Liew

Avik Pramanik

James White

The Honest Company, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Laurence M Rosen

Attorney at Rosen Law Firm PA

355 South Grand Avenue Suite 2450

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32498865 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Mike Wang. (Attorney Laurence M Rosen added to party Mike Wang(pty:pla))(Rosen, Laurence) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Mike Wang. (Rosen, Laurence) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

#3

(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Mike Wang. (Rosen, Laurence) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

#4

(#4) Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Mike Wang, (Rosen, Laurence) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2022
  • Docket(#12) ORDER CONSOLIDATING RELATED SHAREHOLDER DERIVATIVE ACTIONS, ESTABLISHING A LEADERSHIP STRUCTURE, AND STAYING CONSOLIDATED ACTION 19 by Judge Mark C. Scarsi: 1. The stay of proceedings in the action captioned Hayato Ono v. The Honest Company, Inc. et al., Case No. 2:21-cv-09281-MCS-PLA (C.D. Cal.) (the "Ono Action"), as set forth in this Courts Order Staying Case dated December 28, 2021, shall be temporarily lifted for the limited and exclusive purpose of the filing of the Stipulation and the entry of this Order. 2. The Individual Defendants accept service of the complaint in the action captioned Mike Wang v. Nikolaos Vlahos et al., Case No. 2:21-cv-09763-MCS-PLA. 3. The following actions are hereby consolidated for all purposes, including pre-trial proceedings and any trial, under Lead Case No. 2:21-cv-09281-MCS-PLA: Ono v. The Honest Company, Inc. et al. 2:21-cv-09281-MCS-PLA and Wang v. Vlahos et al. 2:21-cv-09763-MCS-PLA. 4. Every pleading filed in the Consolidated Action, or in any separate action included herein, must bear the following caption: UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT CENTRAL DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA IN RE THE HONEST COMPANY, INC. DERIVATIVE LITIGATION Lead Case No. 2:21-cv-09281-MCS-PLA. 5. All papers filed in connection with the Consolidated Action will be maintained in one file under Lead Case No. 2:21-cv-09281-MCS-PLA.6. Co-Lead Counsel for plaintiffs for the conduct of the Consolidated Action shall be: THE BROWN LAW FIRM, P.C. and Timothy Brown and THE ROSEN LAW FIRM, P.A. Laurence M. Rosen. SEE DOCUMENT RE ATTORNEY RESPONSIBILITIES AND OTHER SPECIFICS). Notwithstanding this stay, Plaintiffs may file a consolidated complaint, although Defendants shall be under no obligation to respond to the consolidated complaint during the pendency of the stay. Within twenty-one (21) days after the date that the stay is lifted, the Parties shall meet and confer and submit a proposed scheduling order governing further proceedings in the Consolidated Action. (lc) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • Docket(#11) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Mike Wang, upon Defendant The Honest Company, Inc. served on 12/21/2021, answer due 1/11/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Amy McLaren (Managing Agent of Company's Registered Agent) in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Rosen, Laurence) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • Docket(#10) INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE MARK C. SCARSI upon filing of the complaint by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (smo) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • Docket(#9) ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:21-cv-07405 MCS(PLAx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue and Judge Dale S. Fischer to Judge Mark C. Scarsi and Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:21-cv-09763 MCS(PLAx). Signed by Judge Mark C. Scarsi (rn) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Eric Liaw, Jeremy Liew, Avik Pramanik, The Honest Company, Inc., Nikolaos Vlahos, Jessica Warren, James White. (ghap) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • Docket(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. (ghap) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Mike Wang, (Rosen, Laurence) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Mike Wang. (Rosen, Laurence) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Mike Wang. (Rosen, Laurence) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32498865 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Mike Wang. (Attorney Laurence M Rosen added to party Mike Wang(pty:pla))(Rosen, Laurence) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Honest Company, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Laurence Mathew Rosen Esq.