This case was last updated from PACER on 11/27/2021 at 08:50:04 (UTC).

Wang v. Skype Communications S.a.r.l et al

Case Summary

On 09/28/2021 Wang filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Skype Communications S a r l. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Lorna G. Schofield. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-08082

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lorna G. Schofield

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hao Zhe Wang

New York, NY 10150

Defendants

Skype Communications S.a.r.l

Microsoft Corporation

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Microsoft Corporation served on 11/15/2021, answer due 12/6/2021. Service was accepted by Registered Agent wearing a baseball cap. Document filed by Hao Zhe Wang. (sac) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

#13

(#13) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Skype Communications S.a.r.l served on 11/15/2021, answer due 12/6/2021. Service was accepted by Registered Agent wearing a baseball cap. Document filed by Hao Zhe Wang. (sac) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

#11

(#11) SUMMONS ISSUED as to Skype Communications S.a.r.l. (aan) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

#10

(#10) SUMMONS ISSUED as to Microsoft Corporation. (aan) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

#9

(#9) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Skype Communications S.a.r.l., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Hao Zhe Wang. (sc) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

#8

Transmission to Pro Se Assistants. Transmitted re: #8 Request for Issuance of Summons, to the Pro Se Assistants for processing. (sc) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

5 #38

Exhibit

5 #35

Exhibit

5 #30

Exhibit

5 #24

Exhibit

5 #18

Exhibit

5 #8

Exhibit

5 #1

Exhibit

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Exhibit

1 #1

Main Document

56 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Microsoft Corporation served on 11/15/2021, answer due 12/6/2021. Service was accepted by Registered Agent wearing a baseball cap. Document filed by Hao Zhe Wang. (sac) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Skype Communications S.a.r.l served on 11/15/2021, answer due 12/6/2021. Service was accepted by Registered Agent wearing a baseball cap. Document filed by Hao Zhe Wang. (sac) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (wb) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(wb) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMailed a copy of #10 Summons Issued, #11 Summons Issued to Hao Zhe Wang P.O. Box 7075 New York, NY 10150. (aan) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SUMMONS ISSUED as to Skype Communications S.a.r.l. (aan) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS ISSUED as to Microsoft Corporation. (aan) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTransmission to Pro Se Assistants. Transmitted re: #9 Request for Issuance of Summons, to the Pro Se Assistants for processing. (sc) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Skype Communications S.a.r.l., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Hao Zhe Wang. (sc) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTransmission to Pro Se Assistants. Transmitted re: #8 Request for Issuance of Summons, to the Pro Se Assistants for processing. (sc) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Microsoft Corp., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Hao Zhe Wang. (sc) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketPro Se Payment of Fee Processed: $402 Check processed by the Finance Department on 10/19/2021, Receipt Number 465401287807. (smc) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION TO SEAL. Document filed by Hao Zhe Wang.(sc) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) PLAINTIFF'S DECLARATION of Hao Z. Wang IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO VACATE, re: #5 MOTION to Vacate Arbitration. Document filed by Hao Zhe Wang.(sc) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION TO VACATE ARBITRAL AWARD. Document filed by Hao Zhe Wang. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit, #24 Exhibit, #25 Exhibit, #26 Exhibit, #27 Exhibit, #28 Exhibit, #29 Exhibit, #30 Exhibit, #31 Exhibit, #32 Exhibit, #33 Exhibit, #34 Exhibit, #35 Exhibit, #36 Exhibit, #37 Exhibit, #38 Exhibit, #39 Exhibit, #40 Exhibit, #41 Exhibit, #42 Exhibit, #43 Exhibit, #44 Exhibit, #45 Exhibit, #46 Exhibit, #47 Exhibit, #48 Exhibit, #49 Exhibit, #50 Exhibit, #51 Exhibit, #52 Exhibit).(sc) Modified on 10/12/2021 (sc). (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Hao Zhe Wang. (rdz) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PRO SE CONSENT TO RECEIVE ELECTRONIC SERVICE. The following party: Hao Zhe Wang consents to receive electronic service via the ECF system. Document filed by Hao Zhe Wang..(rdz) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (rdz) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (rdz) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Microsoft Corporation, Skype Communications S.a.r.l. Document filed by Hao Zhe Wang.(rdz) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/30/2021: #1 Exhibit) (rdz). (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Microsoft Corporation is a litigant