This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/31/2019 at 07:10:37 (UTC).

Wang v. Array BioPharma, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 07/02/2019 Wang filed a Contract - Security lawsuit against Array BioPharma, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Gregory H. Woods. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-06168

  • Filing Date:

    07/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Security

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gregory H. Woods

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Elaine Wang

Defendants and Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Providers

Gil J. Van Lunsen

Arlington Acquisition Sub Inc.

Ron Squarer

Pfizer Inc.

Gwen A. Fyfe

Carrie S Cox

Kyle A. Lefkoff

Charles M. Baum

Array BioPharma, Inc.

Shalini Sharp

John A. Orwin

Charles M. Baum, M.D., Ph.D.

Gwen A. Fyfe, M.D.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gloria Kui Melwani

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) Arlington Acquisition Sub Inc., Array BioPharma, Inc., Charles M. Baum, M.D., Ph.D., Carrie S Cox, Gwen A. Fyfe, M.D., Kyle A. Lefkoff, John A. Orwin, Pfizer Inc., Shalini Sharp, Ron Squarer, Gil J. Van Lunsen. Document filed by Elaine Wang. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers).. (Melwani, Gloria) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

#3

(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Melwani, Gloria) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

#2

(#2) FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Melwani, Gloria) Modified on 7/3/2019 (jgo). (Entered: 07/02/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Arlington Acquisition Sub Inc., Array BioPharma, Inc., Charles M. Baum, Carrie S Cox, Gwen A. Fyfe, Kyle A. Lefkoff, John A. Orwin, Pfizer Inc., Shalini Sharp, Ron Squarer, Gil J. Van Lunsen. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17180141)Document filed by Elaine Wang.(Melwani, Gloria) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) Arlington Acquisition Sub Inc., Array BioPharma, Inc., Charles M. Baum, M.D., Ph.D., Carrie S Cox, Gwen A. Fyfe, M.D., Kyle A. Lefkoff, John A. Orwin, Pfizer Inc., Shalini Sharp, Ron Squarer, Gil J. Van Lunsen. Document filed by Elaine Wang. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers).. (Melwani, Gloria) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • Case Designated ECF. (jgo) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Gloria Kui Melwani. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Charles M. Baum, M.D., Ph.D.; Gwen A. Fyfe, M.D.; Gil J. Van Lunsen. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party role was entered incorrectly;. (jgo) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Gloria Kui Melwani. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (jgo) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Melwani, Gloria) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Melwani, Gloria) Modified on 7/3/2019 (jgo). (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Arlington Acquisition Sub Inc., Array BioPharma, Inc., Charles M. Baum, Carrie S Cox, Gwen A. Fyfe, Kyle A. Lefkoff, John A. Orwin, Pfizer Inc., Shalini Sharp, Ron Squarer, Gil J. Van Lunsen. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17180141)Document filed by Elaine Wang.(Melwani, Gloria) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less