This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/13/2020 at 13:01:13 (UTC).

Walton v. Dillon Companies, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 04/20/2020 Walton filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Dillon Companies, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judges overseeing this case are Lewis T. Babcock, Kristen L. Mix and Daniel D. Domenico. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01102

  • Filing Date:

    04/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Kristen L. Mix

Presiding Judges

Lewis T. Babcock

Daniel D. Domenico

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Chris Walton

Defendants

Dillon Companies, Inc.

Kroger Co., The

Dillon Companies, Inc. a Kansas corporation doing business as King Soopers, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Saugat K. Thapa

Attorney at Wells Anderson & Race LLC

1700 Broadway, Suite 1020

Denver, CO 80290-1001

Larry S. McClung

Attorney at Wells Anderson & Race LLC

1700 Broadway, Suite 1020

Denver, CO 80290-1001

Katherine M.L. Pratt

Attorney at Wells Anderson & Race LLC

1700 Broadway, Suite 1020

Denver, CO 80290-1001

 

Court Documents

15 #3

attachment 3

15 #2

attachment 2

15 #1

attachment 1

#15

(#15) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 4/24/20 Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 7/15/2020. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 7/22/2020 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (Attachments: #1 attachment 1, #2 attachment 2, #3 attachment 3) (nmarb, ) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

#13

(#13) MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE, by Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock. This case is randomly returned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-1102-DDD (angar, ) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

#12

(#12) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (cmadr, ) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

#9

(#9) ANSWER, Defenses, Affirmative Defenses, and Jury Demand to #7 Complaint by Dillon Companies, Inc. and Kroger Co., The.(cmadr, ) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

#8

(#8) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint upon Dillon Companies on 23 March 2020 (cmadr, ) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

#7

(#7) COMPLAINT for Damages and Jury Demand against Dillon Companies, Inc., Kroger Co., The, filed by Chris Walton.(cmadr, ) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Saugat K. Thapa on behalf of Dillon Companies, Inc., The Kroger Co.Attorney Saugat K. Thapa added to party Dillon Companies, Inc. (pty:dft), Attorney Saugat K. Thapa added to party The Kroger Co.(pty:dft) (Thapa, Saugat) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Larry S. McClung on behalf of Dillon Companies, Inc., The Kroger Co.Attorney Larry S. McClung added to party Dillon Companies, Inc. (pty:dft), Attorney Larry S. McClung added to party The Kroger Co.(pty:dft) (McClung, Larry) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Katherine M.L. Pratt on behalf of Dillon Companies, Inc., The Kroger Co. (Pratt, Katherine) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

#2

(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Pratt, Katherine) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

1 #6

Exhibit D - Defendant's Corporate Disclosure Statement

1 #5

Exhibit C - Dillon Companies, LLC Cert of Good Standing and Periodic Report

1 #4

Exhibit B - Summons and Notice of Service of Process

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet USDC Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Kroger Co., Dillon Companies, Inc. from Arapahoe District, Case Number 2020CV30665. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-7258000), filed by The Kroger Co., Dillon Companies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet USDC Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A - Complaint and District Court Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit B - Summons and Notice of Service of Process, #5 Exhibit C - Dillon Companies, LLC Cert of Good Standing and Periodic Report, #6 Exhibit D - Defendant's Corporate Disclosure Statement, #7 Exhibit E - The Kroger Co. Cert of Good Standing and Periodic Report, #8 Exhibit F - State Court Docket Sheet, #9 Exhibit G - Delay Reduction Order and Order Re Plan for Settlement, #10 Exhibit H - Defendant's Answer, #11 Exhibit I - Returns of Service)(Pratt, Katherine) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 4/24/20 Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 7/15/2020. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 7/22/2020 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (Attachments: #1 attachment 1, #2 attachment 2, #3 attachment 3) (nmarb, ) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • Docket(#14) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 4/22/2020. Text Only Entry (dddlc1, ) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE, by Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock. This case is randomly returned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-1102-DDD (angar, ) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (cmadr, ) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • Docket(#11) Case assigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry (cmadr, ) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • Docket(#10) FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, ) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER, Defenses, Affirmative Defenses, and Jury Demand to #7 Complaint by Dillon Companies, Inc. and Kroger Co., The.(cmadr, ) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint upon Dillon Companies on 23 March 2020 (cmadr, ) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) COMPLAINT for Damages and Jury Demand against Dillon Companies, Inc., Kroger Co., The, filed by Chris Walton.(cmadr, ) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Saugat K. Thapa on behalf of Dillon Companies, Inc., The Kroger Co.Attorney Saugat K. Thapa added to party Dillon Companies, Inc. (pty:dft), Attorney Saugat K. Thapa added to party The Kroger Co.(pty:dft) (Thapa, Saugat) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Larry S. McClung on behalf of Dillon Companies, Inc., The Kroger Co.Attorney Larry S. McClung added to party Dillon Companies, Inc. (pty:dft), Attorney Larry S. McClung added to party The Kroger Co.(pty:dft) (McClung, Larry) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • Docket(#4) Administrative Notice: Duplicate filing fee received. Financial notified and a refund is pending. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, ) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Katherine M.L. Pratt on behalf of Dillon Companies, Inc., The Kroger Co. (Pratt, Katherine) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Pratt, Katherine) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Kroger Co., Dillon Companies, Inc. from Arapahoe District, Case Number 2020CV30665. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-7258000), filed by The Kroger Co., Dillon Companies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet USDC Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A - Complaint and District Court Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit B - Summons and Notice of Service of Process, #5 Exhibit C - Dillon Companies, LLC Cert of Good Standing and Periodic Report, #6 Exhibit D - Defendant's Corporate Disclosure Statement, #7 Exhibit E - The Kroger Co. Cert of Good Standing and Periodic Report, #8 Exhibit F - State Court Docket Sheet, #9 Exhibit G - Delay Reduction Order and Order Re Plan for Settlement, #10 Exhibit H - Defendant's Answer, #11 Exhibit I - Returns of Service)(Pratt, Katherine) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Dillon is a litigant

Latest cases where The Kroger Co is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Saugat K. Thapa

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Larry S. McClung