This case was last updated from PACER on 05/05/2019 at 07:47:44 (UTC).

Walters v. Lowe's Home Centers LLC

Case Summary

On 03/06/2019 Walters filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Lowe's Home Centers LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are William C Lee and Susan L Collins. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00073

  • Filing Date:

    03/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William C Lee

Referral Judge

Susan L Collins

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

John Walters

Defendant

Lowe's Home Centers LLC

Not Classified By Court

John Whiteleather

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sarah E Reser

Attorney at Glaser & Ebbs - FW/IN

132 E Berry St

Fort Wayne, IN 46802

Defendant Attorneys

Renee J Mortimer

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP - Sch/IN

222 Indianapolis Blvd Ste 207-5

Schererville, IN 46375

Scott B Cockrum

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP - Sch/IN

222 Indianapolis Blvd Ste 207-5

Schererville, IN 46375

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) CERTIFICATE of Defendant and Defendant's Counsel. (Mortimer, Renee) (Entered: 04/23/2019)

#11

(#11) CERTIFICATE of Plaintiff and Plaintiff's Counsel. (Reser, Sarah) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

#10

(#10) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Reser, Sarah) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Scott B Cockrum on behalf of Lowe's Home Centers LLC (Cockrum, Scott) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses and Jury Demand by Lowe's Home Centers LLC.(Mortimer, Renee) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

#7

(#7) AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Lowe's Home Centers LLC ; answer due by April 1, 2019. (Mortimer, Renee) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

#6

(#6) MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (mr) (Entered: 03/08/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 4/25/2019 at 10:30 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Counsel, Plaintiff and Defendant representative to attend.(mr) (Entered: 03/08/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Renee J Mortimer on behalf of Lowe's Home Centers LLC (Mortimer, Renee) (Entered: 03/06/2019)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lowe's Home Centers LLC. (Mortimer, Renee) (Entered: 03/06/2019)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B - Email Confirming citizenship and amount in controversy

1 #1

Exhibit A - State Court Record

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3829141.) from Grant Circuit Court, Cause No. 27C01-1901-CT-000003, filed by Lowe's Home Centers LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Record, #2 Exhibit B - Email Confirming citizenship and amount in controversy, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mortimer, Renee) (Entered: 03/06/2019)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 4/25/2019 before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Pla appeared with atty Sarah Reser. Atty Scott Cockrum and Patrick Stutts, in-house counsel, appeared telephonically on behalf of Dft.The #10 Report of the Parties Planning Meeting is approved in all respects (except dispositive motions deadline and establishment of a trial date) and is hereby made an ORDER of the Court. The Summary Judgment deadline in Fed.R.Civ.P. 56(b) SHALL NOT control. Any dispositive motion SHALL brief out in accordance with L.R. 56-1. DISCOVERY DEADLINE is 11/22/2019. Following the close of discovery, unless otherwise ordered by the Court, the assigned District Judge will establish all further deadlines and dates. John Whiteleather appointed as Mediator. Atty Reser to notify Mediator by letter, copy to atty Cockrum. Results of the Mediation shall be filed with the Court no later than 10 days before the Final Pretrial Conference. Magistrate Consent forms due by 5/16/2019. (FTR 1st floor.) (mr) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) CERTIFICATE of Defendant and Defendant's Counsel. (Mortimer, Renee) (Entered: 04/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) CERTIFICATE of Plaintiff and Plaintiff's Counsel. (Reser, Sarah) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Reser, Sarah) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Scott B Cockrum on behalf of Lowe's Home Centers LLC (Cockrum, Scott) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses and Jury Demand by Lowe's Home Centers LLC.(Mortimer, Renee) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Lowe's Home Centers LLC ; answer due by April 1, 2019. (Mortimer, Renee) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (mr) (Entered: 03/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 4/25/2019 at 10:30 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Counsel, Plaintiff and Defendant representative to attend.(mr) (Entered: 03/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • Judge William C Lee and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. (NEW CASE) (ksp) (Entered: 03/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Renee J Mortimer on behalf of Lowe's Home Centers LLC (Mortimer, Renee) (Entered: 03/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lowe's Home Centers LLC. (Mortimer, Renee) (Entered: 03/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3829141.) from Grant Circuit Court, Cause No. 27C01-1901-CT-000003, filed by Lowe's Home Centers LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Record, #2 Exhibit B - Email Confirming citizenship and amount in controversy, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mortimer, Renee) (Entered: 03/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.