This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/25/2019 at 07:24:37 (UTC).

Walston v. Border City Transportation, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 08/26/2019 Walston filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Border City Transportation, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Mexico District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Laura Fashing, John F. Robbenhaar and Kevin R. Sweazea. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00776

  • Filing Date:

    08/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Referral Judge

John F. Robbenhaar

Presiding Judges

Laura Fashing

Kevin R. Sweazea

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Amanda Walston

Defendants

Jesus Villa

Border City Transportation, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Charlotte Itoh

Attorney at Fine Law Firm

220 9Th St. Nw

Albuquerque, NM 87102

David Matthew Fine

Attorney at Fine Law Firm

220 Ninth Street, Nw

Albuquerque, NM 87102

Defendant Attorneys

Donald A. DeCandia

Attorney at Hartline Barger LLP

141 E. Palace Avenue, Garden Level, Suite 2

Santa Fe, NM 87501

Laura K. Vega

Attorney at Hartline Barger, LLP

500 Marquette Nw, Suite 770

Albuquerque, NM 87102

Mary E. Jones

Attorney at Hartline Barger, LLP

500 Marquette Nw, Suite 770

Albuquerque, NM 87102

 

Court Documents

#27

#26

#25

#22

#19

#18

#17

#16

#14

#12

#10

#9

8 #1

Exhibit A B C

#8

#7

6 #1

Exhibit A B C

#6

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Border City Transportation, LLC, Jesus Villa of Initial Disclosures (Jones, Mary) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Amanda Walston for Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures (Itoh, Charlotte) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Amanda Walston Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production to Defendant Border City Transportation and Defendant Jesus Villa (Itoh, Charlotte) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • Docket(#24) NOTICE OF RULE 73 CONSENT Received by All Parties. Related documents: 23 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by Border City Transportation, LLC, Jesus Villa, 21 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by Amanda Walston. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (vrr) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • Docket(#23) CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Border City Transportation, LLC, Jesus Villa voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Jones, Mary)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) for Personal Injuries and Damages by Border City Transportation, LLC. (Jones, Mary) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • Docket(#21) CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Amanda Walston voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Itoh, Charlotte)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE OF NEW CONSENT SUBMISSION DEADLINE: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). Because the original deadline for consenting to the magistrate judge as trial judge under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) expired before one or more party(ies) appeared in this case, the parties are hereby advised the Clerk will now reassign this matter to a district judge as the trial judge no later than 14 days from the entry of this notice unless consents from all parties have been filed. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (cbf)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan by Border City Transportation, LLC, Jesus Villa (Jones, Mary) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE of Appearance by Mary E. Jones on behalf of Border City Transportation, LLC (Jones, Mary) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE by Jesus Villa Second Amended Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A B C) (DeCandia, Donald) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SECOND ORDER TO AMEND NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. Defendant shall amend the Amended Notice of Removal by no later than September 16, 2019. (smd) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE by Jesus Villa Amended Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A B C) (DeCandia, Donald) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) **FILED IN ERROR-NOTICE by Jesus Villa Amended Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A B C) (DeCandia, Donald) Modified to add error text as per Joan Jennings-Atty Assistant on 9/6/2019 (jjs). (Entered: 09/06/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar To Amend Notice of Removal. (kc) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Jesus Villa. (DeCandia, Donald) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • Docket(#2) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • DocketUnited States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing and United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar assigned. (jg) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFiling and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6630461 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Jesus Villa (Payment made via Pay.gov)(DeCandia, Donald) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Jesus Villa from First Judicial District, County of Santa Fe, case number D-101-CV-2019-01826. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Jesus Villa. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A and B, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(DeCandia, Donald) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less