This case was last updated from PACER on 10/10/2021 at 07:21:40 (UTC).

Walsh v. United Behavioral Health et al

Case Summary

On 08/11/2021 Walsh filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against United Behavioral Health. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are LaShann DeArcy Hall, Roanne L. Mann, Ann M Donnelly and Robert M. Levy. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-04519

  • Filing Date:

    08/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LaShann DeArcy Hall

Ann M Donnelly

Referral Judges

Roanne L. Mann

Robert M. Levy

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Martin J. Walsh

Defendants

United Behavioral Health

UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rosemary Almonte

Attorney at U.S. Department of Labor

201 Varick Street, Room 983

New York, NY 10014

Defendant Attorneys

Christopher Flynn

Attorney at Crowell & Moring LLP

1001 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Honor Rose Costello

Attorney at Crowell & Moring LLP

590 Madison Ave, 20Th Floor

New York, NY 10022

Jennifer Salzman Romano

Attorney at Crowell & Moring

515 S. Flower Street, Ste 40Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Michael W. Lieberman

Attorney at Crowell & Moring LLP

1001 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20004

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Salzman Romano on behalf of All Defendants (notification declined or already on case) (Romano, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

#16

(#16) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael W. Lieberman on behalf of All Defendants (notification declined or already on case) (Lieberman, Michael) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

14 #1

Affidavit of Christopher Flynn

13 #13

Main Document

12 #1

Affidavit of Jennifer S. Romano

#11

No Description Available

10 #2

Certificates of Good Standing

10 #10

Main Document

9 #1

Proposed Order authorizing and ordering release of Eligible Members Claims Data

9 #9

Main Document

#8

(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Martin J. Walsh. UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company waiver sent on 8/23/2021, answer due 10/22/2021. (Almonte, Rosemary) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

#7

(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Martin J. Walsh. United Behavioral Health waiver sent on 8/23/2021, answer due 10/22/2021. (Almonte, Rosemary) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

#3

(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Neptune, Pierre) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/06/2021
  • Docket.Status Report due by 10/12/2021 As to the Status of this Case, and how it relates to the proposed settlements in 21 cv 4519 and 17 cv 4160, and to the fairness hearing scheduled for 12/16/21 in 17 cv 4160.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 10/6/2021. (Levy, Robert) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER RESPECTFULLY REFERRING SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT. #5 Settlement Agreement filed by Martin J. Walsh, #4 Settlement Agreement filed by Martin J. Walsh respectfully referred to Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. Ordered by Judge Ann M. Donnelly on 9/19/2021. (Greene, Donna) (Entered: 09/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Ann M Donnelly and Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy for all further proceedings. Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall, Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Ordered by Chief Judge Margo K. Brodie on 8/30/2021. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Salzman Romano on behalf of All Defendants (notification declined or already on case) (Romano, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael W. Lieberman on behalf of All Defendants (notification declined or already on case) (Lieberman, Michael) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Flynn on behalf of All Defendants (notification declined or already on case) (Flynn, Christopher) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER finding as moot #13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 8/30/2021. (LK) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER granting #14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 8/30/2021. (LK) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Amended MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-14793444. by United Behavioral Health, UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Christopher Flynn, #2 Certificates of Good Standing) (Flynn, Christopher) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER deferring ruling on #13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The movant has failed to attach a Certificate of Good Standing from the District of Columbia. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 8/27/2021. (LK) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Martin J. Walsh. UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company waiver sent on 8/23/2021, answer due 10/22/2021. (Almonte, Rosemary) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Martin J. Walsh. United Behavioral Health waiver sent on 8/23/2021, answer due 10/22/2021. (Almonte, Rosemary) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Reassign Case by Martin J. Walsh. (Almonte, Rosemary) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT by Martin J. Walsh (Almonte, Rosemary) (Main Document 5 identified as malformed and replaced on 8/31/2021) (Lee, Tiffeny). (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT by Martin J. Walsh (Almonte, Rosemary) (Main Document 4 replaced due to corruption on 8/18/2021) (Lee, Tiffeny). (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Neptune, Pierre) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Neptune, Pierre) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketNotice of Related Case: The Civil Cover Sheet filed in this civil action indicates a related case (17-CV-4160-AMD-RML). (Neptune, Pierre) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall and Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Neptune, Pierre) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Martin J. Walsh. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Almonte, Rosemary) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United Behavioral Health, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant