This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/06/2021 at 08:42:31 (UTC).

Walsh v. Ramejo, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 05/07/2021 Walsh filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Ramejo, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District. The Judges overseeing this case are Eric C. Tostrud and Katherine M. Menendez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:21-CV-01171

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Courthouse:

    Minnesota District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Eric C. Tostrud

Referral Judge

Katherine M. Menendez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Martin J. Walsh

Defendants

Jorge Arcos

Fiesta Red Wing, LLC Minnesota limited liability companies doing business as Rancho Loco Grill & Bar

Ramon Ruelas

Medardo Arcos

Ramejo, LLC Minnesota limited liability companies doing business as Rancho Loco Mexican Grill & Bar

Nancy Arcos

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Barbara Villalobos

Attorney at U.S. Department of Labor

230 S. Dearborn, Ste 844

Chicago, IL 60604

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) ORDER granting #11 Motion to Approve Consent Judgment. See Consent Judgment for details and specifics. Signed by Judge Eric C. Tostrud on 5/12/2021. (RMM) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

#12

(#12) MEMORANDUM in Support re #11 MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment filed by Martin J. Walsh.(Villalobos, Barbara) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

#11

(#11) MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment filed by Martin J. Walsh. (Villalobos, Barbara) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

#10

(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Martin J. Walsh. Ramejo, LLC waiver sent on 5/7/2021, answer due 7/6/2021. (Villalobos, Barbara) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

#9

(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Martin J. Walsh. Ramon Ruelas waiver sent on 5/7/2021, answer due 7/6/2021. (Villalobos, Barbara) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

#8

(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Martin J. Walsh. Nancy Arcos waiver sent on 5/7/2021, answer due 7/6/2021. (Villalobos, Barbara) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

#7

(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Martin J. Walsh. Medardo Arcos waiver sent on 5/7/2021, answer due 7/6/2021. (Villalobos, Barbara) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Martin J. Walsh. Fiesta Red Wing, LLC waiver sent on 5/7/2021, answer due 7/6/2021. (Villalobos, Barbara) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Martin J. Walsh. Jorge Arcos waiver sent on 5/7/2021, answer due 7/6/2021. (Villalobos, Barbara) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Jorge Arcos, Medardo Arcos, Nancy Arcos, Fiesta Red Wing, LLC, Ramejo, LLC, Ramon Ruelas. (lmb) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Barbara Villalobos on behalf of Martin J. Walsh. (Villalobos, Barbara) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Jorge Arcos, Medardo Arcos, Nancy Arcos, Fiesta Red Wing, LLC, Ramejo, LLC, Ramon Ruelas, filed by Martin J. Walsh. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Villalobos, Barbara) Modified text on 5/7/2021 (lmb). (Entered: 05/07/2021)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER granting #11 Motion to Approve Consent Judgment. See Consent Judgment for details and specifics. Signed by Judge Eric C. Tostrud on 5/12/2021. (RMM) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MEMORANDUM in Support re #11 MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment filed by Martin J. Walsh.(Villalobos, Barbara) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment filed by Martin J. Walsh. (Villalobos, Barbara) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Martin J. Walsh. Ramejo, LLC waiver sent on 5/7/2021, answer due 7/6/2021. (Villalobos, Barbara) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Martin J. Walsh. Ramon Ruelas waiver sent on 5/7/2021, answer due 7/6/2021. (Villalobos, Barbara) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Martin J. Walsh. Nancy Arcos waiver sent on 5/7/2021, answer due 7/6/2021. (Villalobos, Barbara) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Martin J. Walsh. Medardo Arcos waiver sent on 5/7/2021, answer due 7/6/2021. (Villalobos, Barbara) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Martin J. Walsh. Fiesta Red Wing, LLC waiver sent on 5/7/2021, answer due 7/6/2021. (Villalobos, Barbara) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Martin J. Walsh. Jorge Arcos waiver sent on 5/7/2021, answer due 7/6/2021. (Villalobos, Barbara) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Jorge Arcos, Medardo Arcos, Nancy Arcos, Fiesta Red Wing, LLC, Ramejo, LLC, Ramon Ruelas. (lmb) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • Docket(#3) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Please use case number 21-cv-1171 (ECT/KMM). (lmb) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Barbara Villalobos on behalf of Martin J. Walsh. (Villalobos, Barbara) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Jorge Arcos, Medardo Arcos, Nancy Arcos, Fiesta Red Wing, LLC, Ramejo, LLC, Ramon Ruelas, filed by Martin J. Walsh. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Villalobos, Barbara) Modified text on 5/7/2021 (lmb). (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Barbara Villalobos