This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/10/2022 at 07:43:19 (UTC).

Walsh v. Life Time Athletic et al

Case Summary

On 05/11/2022 Walsh filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Life Time Athletic. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Margo K. Brodie and Arlene R. Lindsay. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-02728

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Margo K. Brodie

Referral Judge

Arlene R. Lindsay

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lindsey Walsh

Defendants

Life Time Athletic

LTF Club Operations Company, Inc.

Life Time Fitness, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Allen Jay Rosner

Attorney at Rosner Russo Shahabian PLLC

398 Conklin Street

Farmingdale, NY 11735

Joshua P. Quinonez

Attorney at Rosner Russo Shahabian PPLC

398 Conklin Street

Farmingdale, NY 11735

Defendant Attorney

Janice Berkowitz

Attorney at Ahmuty, Demers & McManus

200 I.U. Willets Road

Albertson, NY 11507

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit Ex A - S&C

1 #2

Exhibit Ex B - AOS

1 #3

Exhibit Ex C - Business Details Reports

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by LTF Club Operations Company, Inc., Life Time Athletic, Life Time Fitness, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Life Time, Inc. f/k/a Life Time Fitness, Inc. for LTF Club Operations Company, Inc.. (Berkowitz, Janice) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

#3

(#3) Civil Cover Sheet.. by LTF Club Operations Company, Inc., Life Time Athletic, Life Time Fitness, Inc. (Berkowitz, Janice) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

#4

(#4) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Landow, Concetta) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Allen Jay Rosner on behalf of Lindsey Walsh (aty to be noticed) (Rosner, Allen) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

6 #6

Main Document

6 #1

Rule 26(f) form

#7

(#7) Letter Motion for Conference by Lindsey Walsh (Rosner, Allen) Modified on 5/23/2022 (Valentin, Winnethka). (Entered: 05/16/2022)

#8

(#8) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Letter Motion for Conference (Dkt 7) served on Janice Berkowitz, Ahmuty Demers & McManus on May 16, 2022, filed by Lindsey Walsh. (Rosner, Allen) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

#9

(#9) Letter to the Court by LTF Club Operations Company, Inc., Life Time Athletic, Life Time Fitness, Inc. (Berkowitz, Janice) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

#10

(#10) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying #7 Motion for Pre-Motion Conference. For the reasons stated in the attached Memorandum and Order, the Court remands the action to the State Court for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to send a certified copy of this Order to the Clerk of the New York Supreme Court, Nassau County, and to close this case. Ordered by Chief Judge Margo K. Brodie on 5/23/2022. (Bacchi, Joseph) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Terminated. (Piper, Francine) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying #7 Motion for Pre-Motion Conference. For the reasons stated in the attached Memorandum and Order, the Court remands the action to the State Court for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to send a certified copy of this Order to the Clerk of the New York Supreme Court, Nassau County, and to close this case. Ordered by Chief Judge Margo K. Brodie on 5/23/2022. (Bacchi, Joseph) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Letter to the Court by LTF Club Operations Company, Inc., Life Time Athletic, Life Time Fitness, Inc. (Berkowitz, Janice) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Letter Motion for Conference (Dkt 7) served on Janice Berkowitz, Ahmuty Demers & McManus on May 16, 2022, filed by Lindsey Walsh. (Rosner, Allen) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Letter Motion for Conference by Lindsey Walsh (Rosner, Allen) Modified on 5/23/2022 (Valentin, Winnethka). (Entered: 05/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by June 17, 2022. See the attached Order for details. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 5/16/2022. c/ecf (Attachments: #1 Rule 26(f) form) (Imrie, Robert) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Allen Jay Rosner on behalf of Lindsey Walsh (aty to be noticed) (Rosner, Allen) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketThis attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. (Landow, Concetta) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketJoshua P. Quinonez : This case has been opened in the Eastern District of New York. If you plan to continue representing your client(s), you must be admitted to practice before this court. You must do so by applying for Pro Hac Vice or permanent admission. To apply for Pro Hac Vice admission, you must first register for an ECF login and password. Please visit the Court's website at www.nyed.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions for guidance. Once registered, you must electronically file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You must pay the required pro hac vice fee online. (Landow, Concetta) C/M to Attorney Joshua P. Quinonez on 5/12/2022. (Entered: 05/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Landow, Concetta) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketCase Assigned to Chief Judge Margo K. Brodie and Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Landow, Concetta) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Civil Cover Sheet.. by LTF Club Operations Company, Inc., Life Time Athletic, Life Time Fitness, Inc. (Berkowitz, Janice) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by LTF Club Operations Company, Inc., Life Time Athletic, Life Time Fitness, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Life Time, Inc. f/k/a Life Time Fitness, Inc. for LTF Club Operations Company, Inc.. (Berkowitz, Janice) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by LTF Club Operations Company, Inc., Life Time Athletic, Life Time Fitness, Inc. from Supreme Court, Nassau County, case number 604606/2022. Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANYEDC-15554544) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A - S&C, #2 Exhibit Ex B - AOS, #3 Exhibit Ex C - Business Details Reports) (Berkowitz, Janice) Modified on 5/12/2022 (Landow, Concetta). (Entered: 05/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LTF Club Operations Co., Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where LTF CLUB OPERATIONS COMPANY, INC., dba Life Time Fitness, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Janice Berkowitz