This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/05/2022 at 06:09:54 (UTC).

Walsh v. General Aluminum Manufacturing Company, et al

Case Summary

On 08/31/2021 Walsh filed an Other lawsuit against General Aluminum Manufacturing Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Solomon Oliver, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-MC-00067

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Solomon Oliver, Jr

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Martin J. Walsh

Respondents

General Aluminum Manufacturing Company

Craig Schlaugh

David Hill

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Christine Z. Heri

Attorney at U.S. Department of Labor

230 South Dearborn Street

Chicago, IL 60604

Elizabeth R. Ashley

Attorney at U.S. Department of Labor

881 Ajc Federal Bldg., 1240 East Ninth Street

Cleveland, OH 44199

Leah A. Williams

Attorney at U.S. Department of Labor - Cleveland

881 Anthony J. Celebreeze Federal Bldg., 1240 East Ninth Street

Cleveland, OH 44199

Lisa Hammond Johnson

Attorney at Office of the U.S. Attorney - Cleveland

801 Superior Avenue, W

Cleveland, OH 44113

Ruchi V. Asher

Attorney at Office of the U.S. Attorney - Cleveland

801 Superior Avenue, W

Cleveland, OH 44113

Respondent Attorneys

Jazmyn J. Stover

Attorney at Fisher & Phillips - Cleveland

200 Public Square

Cleveland, OH 44114

Scott W. Gedeon

Attorney at Fisher & Phillips - Cleveland

200 Public Square

Cleveland, OH 44114

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) Opposition to #11 Motion for leave to File, Instanter, Sur-Reply Brief in Support of Their Opposition to the Secretary of Labor's Petition to Enforce Administrative Subpoenas Ad Testificandum Issued by the Occupational Safety and Health Administration, I filed by Martin J. Walsh. (Asher, Ruchi) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

#11

(#11) Motion for leave to File, Instanter, Sur-Reply Brief in Support of Their Opposition to the Secretary of Labor's Petition to Enforce Administrative Subpoenas Ad Testificandum Issued by the Occupational Safety and Health Administration, Instanter filed by General Aluminum Manufacturing Company, David Hill, Craig Schlaugh. (Gedeon, Scott) Modified on 10/19/2021 to note, Sur-Reply (with exhibits) uploaded as part of main document (H,SP). (Entered: 10/07/2021)

#10

(#10) Reply in support of #1 Motion to enforce subpoenas filed by Martin J. Walsh. (Asher, Ruchi) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

#9

(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Park Ohio Industries, Inc., Other Affiliate Park-Ohio Holdings Corp. for General Aluminum Manufacturing Company filed by General Aluminum Manufacturing Company. (Gedeon, Scott) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

8 #1

Exhibit A - Memorandum in Support

8 #8

Main Document

#7

(#7) Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon General Aluminum Manufacturing Company c/o Parkohio Holding Corp (Statutory Agent) on 9/7/2021, filed on behalf of Martin J. Walsh. Related document(s) #3 . (L,Br) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

#6

(#6) Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon General Aluminum Manufacturing Company on 9/7/2021, no delivery date on green card, date obtained from U.S. Postal Service website, filed on behalf of Martin J. Walsh. Related document(s) #3 . (L,Br) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

5 #4

Exhibit

5 #2

Exhibit

5 #1

Exhibit

#3

(#3) Original Summons issued to counsel for service upon General Aluminum Manufacturing Company (2 addresses), David Hill, Craig Schlaugh. (S,SR) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

1 #5

Memorandum in Support of Petition

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Patrick L. Depace

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Howard Eberts

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - Subpoena Ad Testificandum

1 #1

Main Document

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Opposition to #11 Motion for leave to File, Instanter, Sur-Reply Brief in Support of Their Opposition to the Secretary of Labor's Petition to Enforce Administrative Subpoenas Ad Testificandum Issued by the Occupational Safety and Health Administration, I filed by Martin J. Walsh. (Asher, Ruchi) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Motion for leave to File, Instanter, Sur-Reply Brief in Support of Their Opposition to the Secretary of Labor's Petition to Enforce Administrative Subpoenas Ad Testificandum Issued by the Occupational Safety and Health Administration, Instanter filed by General Aluminum Manufacturing Company, David Hill, Craig Schlaugh. (Gedeon, Scott) Modified on 10/19/2021 to note, Sur-Reply (with exhibits) uploaded as part of main document (H,SP). (Entered: 10/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Reply in support of #1 Motion to enforce subpoenas filed by Martin J. Walsh. (Asher, Ruchi) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Park Ohio Industries, Inc., Other Affiliate Park-Ohio Holdings Corp. for General Aluminum Manufacturing Company filed by General Aluminum Manufacturing Company. (Gedeon, Scott) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Opposition to #1 Petition to Enforce Administrative Subpoenas Ad Testificandum filed by General Aluminum Manufacturing Company, David Hill, Craig Schlaugh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Memorandum in Support) (Gedeon, Scott) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon General Aluminum Manufacturing Company c/o Parkohio Holding Corp (Statutory Agent) on 9/7/2021, filed on behalf of Martin J. Walsh. Related document(s) #3 . (L,Br) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon General Aluminum Manufacturing Company on 9/7/2021, no delivery date on green card, date obtained from U.S. Postal Service website, filed on behalf of Martin J. Walsh. Related document(s) #3 . (L,Br) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Motion to consolidate cases filed by Respondent General Aluminum Manufacturing Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Motion filed in 21mc48, #2 Exhibit B - Petition filed in 21mc67, #3 Exhibit C - Notice of Motion, #4 Exhibit D - Motion filed in 21mc48)(Gedeon, Scott) Modified text on 9/9/2021 (S,SR). (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon David Hill on 9/4/21 (signed c-19), filed on behalf of Martin J. Walsh. Related document(s) #3 . (L,Br) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketService by Clerk. Summons and Petition addressed to General Aluminum Manufacturing Company Receipt # 7015166000001164 and 70151660000011649306, David Hill Receipt # 70151660000011649315, Craig Schlaugh Receipt # 70151660000011649322 placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. (S,SR) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Original Summons issued to counsel for service upon General Aluminum Manufacturing Company (2 addresses), David Hill, Craig Schlaugh. (S,SR) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons filed by Martin J. Walsh. (Attachments: #1 Summons -General Aluminum Manufacturing, #2 Summons -Statutory Agent General Aluminum Mtg. Co., #3 Summons -David Hill, #4 Summons -Craig A. Schlauch)(Asher, Ruchi) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketJudge Solomon Oliver, Jr assigned to case. (M,MT) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Petition to enforce administrative subpoenas Ad Testificandum filed by Petitioner Martin J. Walsh. Exempt from filing fee. Plaintiff has indicated that case may be related to pending civil action 5:21-mc-00048. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Subpoena Ad Testificandum, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Howard Eberts, #3 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Patrick L. Depace, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Memorandum in Support of Petition)(M,MT) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jazmyn J. Stover