This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/11/2020 at 08:08:23 (UTC).

Walls v. Union Pacific Railroad Company, Incorporated

Case Summary

On 10/12/2020 Walls filed a Personal Injury - Federal Employers Liability Act lawsuit against Union Pacific Railroad Company, Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nebraska District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Brian C. Buescher and Susan M. Bazis. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:20-CV-00413

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Federal Employers Liability Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brian C. Buescher

Referral Judge

Susan M. Bazis

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Christopher Walls

Defendants

Union Pacific Railroad Company, Incorporated

Union Pacific Railroad Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Randal W. LeNeave

Attorney at HUNEGS, LENEAVE LAW FIRM - MINNESOTA

1000 Twelve Oaks Center Drive, Suite 101

Wayzata, MN 55391

Jayson D. Nelson

Attorney at HUNEGS, LENEAVE LAW FIRM - NEBRASKA

6035 Binney Street

Omaha, NE 68104

Paul A. Banker

Attorney at HUNEGS, LENEAVE LAW FIRM - MINNESOTA

1000 Twelve Oaks Center Drive, Suite 101

Wayzata, MN 55391

Defendant Attorneys

Daniel Hassing

Attorney at LAMSON, DUGAN LAW FIRM

10306 Regency Parkway Drive

Omaha, NE 68114-3743

William M. Lamson, Jr.

Attorney at LAMSON, DUGAN LAW FIRM

10306 Regency Parkway Drive

Omaha, NE 68114-3743

 

Court Documents

#18

#17

#15

#14

#13

#12

#11

RESTRICTED

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) FINAL PROGRESSION ORDER - Depositions due 09/03/2021. The trial and pretrial conference will not be set at this time. A status conference to discuss case progression, the parties' interest in settlement, and the trial and pretrial conference settings will be held with the undersigned magistrate judge by telephone on June 17, 2021 at 1:00 p.m. Counsel shall use the conferencing instructions assigned to this case to participate in the conference. (Filing No. #11 .) Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRM) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE of Service of Defendant's Initial Disclosures by Attorney William M. Lamson, Jr. on behalf of Defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company (Lamson, William) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • Docket(#16) TEXT ORDER: The parties did not consent, in writing, to disposition of the case by a magistrate judge. Pursuant to NEGenR.1.4(a)(3)(C)(ii). Case reassigned to Judge Brian C. Buescher and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (LRM) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) STIPULATION as to Remote Deposition Procedures by Attorney Randal W. LeNeave on behalf of Plaintiff Christopher Walls.(LeNeave, Randal) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Attorney Randal W. LeNeave on behalf of Plaintiff Christopher Walls.(LeNeave, Randal) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Service of Requests for Production of Documents to Plaintiff, Set One by Attorney William M. Lamson, Jr. on behalf of Defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company (Lamson, William) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Service of Interrogatories to Plaintiff, Set One by Attorney William M. Lamson, Jr. on behalf of Defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company (Lamson, William) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (ADB) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 12/7/2020.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (ADB) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney William M. Lamson, Jr. on behalf of Defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company (Lamson, William) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Daniel Hassing on behalf of Defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company.(Hassing, Daniel) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Attorney Daniel Hassing on behalf of Defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company.(Hassing, Daniel) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to Complaint with with jury demand by Union Pacific Railroad Company (Hassing, Daniel) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company on 10/15/2020. (LeNeave, Randal) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LRM) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • Docket(#3) TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNED: Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Requested as to regarding Complaint, #1 . (LeNeave, Randal) (Entered: 10/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against Union Pacific Railroad Company, Incorporated ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-4256385), by Attorney Randal W. LeNeave on behalf of Christopher Walls (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LeNeave, Randal) (Entered: 10/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Union Pacific Railroad Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel J. Hassing

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William Maxwell Lamson Jr.