Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 12/24/2019 at 08:13:44 (UTC).

Walls v. Core Civic of Tennessee, LLC

Case Summary

On 10/25/2019 Walls filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Core Civic of Tennessee, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Christopher H Steger and Travis R McDonough. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00073

  • Filing Date:

    10/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Christopher H Steger

Presiding Judge

Travis R McDonough

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ricky A Walls

Defendants

Core Civic of Tennessee, LLC

CCA South Central Correctional Facility

Certain and Unnamed Employees of the Above-Named Unidentified Defendants

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Russell L Leonard

Attorney at Law Office of Russell L. Leonard

1016 West Main Street, Suite 3

Monteagle, TN 37356

Defendant Attorneys

Joseph F Welborn, III

Attorney at Butler Snow, LLP (Nash)

150 Third Avenue South, Suite 1600

Nashville, TN 37201

Erin Palmer Polly

Attorney at Butler Snow, LLP (Nash)

150 Third Avenue South, Suite 1600

Nashville, TN 37201

Terrence McKelvey

Attorney at Butler Snow, LLP (Nash)

150 Third Avenue South, Suite 1600

Nashville, TN 37201

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Polly, Erin) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

#18

(#18) AMENDED DOCUMENT by Core Civic of Tennessee, LLC. Amendment to #15 Stipulation Amended Stipulation of Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. (McKelvey, Terrence) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

#17

(#17) ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 1/8/2020, at 11:30 AM in Judge's Chambers before District Judge Travis R. McDonough.Signed by District Judge Travis R. McDonough on 12/10/2019. (CMH) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

#16

(#16) Certificate of Corporate Interest by Core Civic of Tennessee, LLC identifying Corporate Parent CoreCivic TRS, LLC for Core Civic of Tennessee, LLC. (McKelvey, Terrence) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

#15

(#15) STIPULATION of Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Core Civic of Tennessee, LLC. (McKelvey, Terrence) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Terrence McKelvey on behalf of Core Civic of Tennessee, LLC (McKelvey, Terrence) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Palmer Polly on behalf of Core Civic of Tennessee, LLC (Polly, Erin) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph F Welborn, III on behalf of Core Civic of Tennessee, LLC (Welborn, Joseph) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

#11

(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ricky A Walls. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons CT Corporation System)(Leonard, Russell) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

#7

(#7) Administrative Notice to Counsel #6 Summons Returned Unexecuted : Informational for future filings. (AML) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

#6

(#7) Administrative Notice to Counsel #6 Summons Returned Unexecuted : Informational for future filings. (AML) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

#5

(#5) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 10/28/2019. (AML) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

#4

(#4) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 10/28/2019. (AML) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

#3

(#3) Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 10/28/2019. (AML) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Core Civic of Tennessee, LLC. (AML) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

1 #2

Summons Summons of C T Corporation System

1 #1

Other Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Core Civic of Tennessee, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-4114809.), filed by Ricky A Walls. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons of C T Corporation System)(Leonard, Russell) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Polly, Erin) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) AMENDED DOCUMENT by Core Civic of Tennessee, LLC. Amendment to #15 Stipulation Amended Stipulation of Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. (McKelvey, Terrence) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 1/8/2020, at 11:30 AM in Judge's Chambers before District Judge Travis R. McDonough.Signed by District Judge Travis R. McDonough on 12/10/2019. (CMH) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Certificate of Corporate Interest by Core Civic of Tennessee, LLC identifying Corporate Parent CoreCivic TRS, LLC for Core Civic of Tennessee, LLC. (McKelvey, Terrence) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) STIPULATION of Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Core Civic of Tennessee, LLC. (McKelvey, Terrence) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Terrence McKelvey on behalf of Core Civic of Tennessee, LLC (McKelvey, Terrence) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Palmer Polly on behalf of Core Civic of Tennessee, LLC (Polly, Erin) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph F Welborn, III on behalf of Core Civic of Tennessee, LLC (Welborn, Joseph) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ricky A Walls. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons CT Corporation System)(Leonard, Russell) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Alias Summons Issued as to CCA South Central Correctional Facility. (AML) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Summons Issued as to CCA South Central Correctional Facility. (AML) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Administrative Notice to Counsel #6 Summons Returned Unexecuted : Informational for future filings. (AML) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Summons supplemented to be issued by Ricky A Walls as to CCA South Central Correctional Facility. (Leonard, Russell) Modified on 10/30/2019 to correct the docket text (AML). (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • No summons received with initiating documents for Defendant CCA South Central Correctional Facility. Therefore, summons not issued as to CCA South Central Correctional Facility. (AML) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 10/28/2019. (AML) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 10/28/2019. (AML) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 10/28/2019. (AML) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to Core Civic of Tennessee, LLC. (AML) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • District Judge Travis R McDonough and Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger added. (AML) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Core Civic of Tennessee, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-4114809.), filed by Ricky A Walls. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons of C T Corporation System)(Leonard, Russell) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Terrence McKelvey

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph F Welborn, III