This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/12/2020 at 15:53:02 (UTC).

Wallock v. A.H. Bennett Company et al

Case Summary

On 07/12/2019 Wallock filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against A H Bennett Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Dakota District. The Judges overseeing this case are Daniel L. Hovland and Alice R. Senechal. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00142

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Daniel L. Hovland

Referral Judge

Alice R. Senechal

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sally Wallock

Defendants

Foster Wheeler LLC

Superior Boiler Works, Inc.

S.O.S. Products

Whittier Filtration, Inc.

Owens-Illinois, Inc.

United Conveyor Corporation

Hobart Brothers Company

Grinnell Corporation

Weil McLain Company

Bell Asbestos Mines, Ltd.

Goodin Company

Lennox Industries, Inc.

Singer Safety Company

Rockwell Automation

General Engineering Development Corporation

Industrial Holdings Corporation

Ingersoll-Rand Company

A.H. Bennett Company

Rheem Manufacturing Company

72 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jeanette Boechler

Attorney at Boechler, PC

802 1St Avenue North

Fargo, ND 58102

Defendant Attorneys

John C. Hughes

Attorney at Meagher & Geer, P.L.L.P. (MN)

33 South Sixth Street, Suite 4400

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Claire Louise Smith

Attorney at Dorsey & Whitney LLP

3203 32Nd Avenue S., Suite 103, Po Box 1344

Fargo, ND 58107-1344

Paul Rudell Oppegard

Attorney at Oppegard Law Firm

2901 South Frontage Road, Po Box 657

Moorhead, MN 56561

Joanna M. Salmen

Attorney at Foley & Mansfield PLLP

250 Marquette Ave., Suite 1200

Minneapolis, MN 55401

Jason Mohr

Attorney at Foley & Mansfield PLLP

250 Marquette Ave., Suite 1200

Minneapolis, MN 55401

Elizabeth Sorenson Brotten

Attorney at Foley & Mansfield PLLP

250 Marquette Ave., Suite 1200

Minneapolis, MN 55401

Roland John Wells, III

Attorney at HKM

30 E. 7Th Street, Suite 3200

St. Paul, MN 55101

Joel A. Flom

Attorney at Flom Law Office, P.A.

1703 32Nd Avenue South

Fargo, ND 58103

Other Attorneys

Todd E. Zimmerman

Attorney at Fredrikson & Byron P.A. (Fargo)

51 Broadway North, Suite 400

Fargo, ND 58102

Michael C. McCarthy

Attorney at Maslon Edelman Borman & Brand, LLP

3300 Wells Fargo Center, 90 S 7Th Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402-4140

Brent J. Edison

Attorney at Vogel Law Firm (Fargo)

218 Np Avenue, Po Box 1389

Fargo, ND 58107-1389

Thomas D. Jensen

Attorney at Lind Jensen Sullivan & Peterson PA

1300 At&T Tower, 901 Marquette Ave S

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Stacey Elizabeth Tjon Bossart

Attorney at Haugen & Moeckel

520 Main Ave., Suite 702

Fargo, ND 58103

Richard J. Leighton

Attorney at Johnson Killen & Seiler PA

800 Wells Fargo Center, 230 W Superior St

Duluth, MN 55802

Jane L. Dynes

Attorney at Serkland Law Firm, P.C.

10 Roberts St., P.O. Box 6017

Fargo, ND 58108-6017

Scott J. Landa

Attorney at Zimney Foster PC

3100 S Columbia Rd, Suite 200

Grand Forks, ND 58201

Tyler Johnson Siewert

Attorney at Schweigert, Klemin & McBride, P.C.

116 N. 2Nd Street, Po Box 955

Bismarck, ND 58502

Cassandra A. Marka

Attorney at Zimney Foster PC

3100 S Columbia Rd, Suite 200

Grand Forks, ND 58201

Thomas M. Stieber

Attorney at Foley & Mansfield PLLP

250 Marquette Ave., Suite 1200

Minneapolis, MN 55401

26 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#100

#99

#98

#97

#96

#95

#94

#93

#48

1 #11

State Court Records Part 9 of 10 (Exhibits 224 - 229)

1 #10

State Court Records Part 8 of 10 (Exhibits 223 - 222)

1 #9

State Court Records Part 7 of 10 (Exhibits 197 - 205)

1 #8

State Court Records Part 6 of 10 (Exhibits 189 - 196)

1 #7

State Court Records Part 5 of 10 (Exhibits 184 - 188)

1 #5

State Court Records Part 3 of 10 (Exhibits 102 - 134)

1 #4

State Court Records Part 2 of 10 (Exhibits 59 - 101)

1 #3

Affidavit of Counsel, Heather H. Neubauer and State Court Records Part 1 of 10

1 #2

Exhibit A - Defendants Listed by Counsel

109 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#100) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Burnham LLC identifying Corporate Parent Burnham Holdings, Inc. for Burnham LLC.. (Neubauer, Heather) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#99) Corporate Disclosure Statement by A.W. Chesterton Company. (Brownson, Kristi) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#98) NOTICE of Appearance by Kristi K. Brownson on behalf of A.W. Chesterton Company (Brownson, Kristi) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#97) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Chicago-Wilcox Manufacturing Company. (Neubauer, Heather) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#96) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Building Sprinkler Company, Inc.. (Neubauer, Heather) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#95) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Baker Manufacturing Company, LLC. (Neubauer, Heather) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#94) REPLY to Response to Motion re #48 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Sally Wallock. (Thompson, David) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#93) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal: Scheduling Conference held on 8/20/2019. (DR #190820-001 JS Chambers Recorder) (lc) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#92) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal.Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/12/2021 at 10:00 AM in Fargo Chambers before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. (CS) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#91) SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Discovery due by 1/17/2020. Discovery Motions due by 2/1/2020. Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 12/15/2019. Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 1/17/2020. Discovery Depositions of Expert Witnesses due by 2/21/2020. Join Additional Parties due by 9/27/2019. Amend Pleadings due by 9/27/2019. Amend Pleadings to Add Punitive Damages due by 9/27/2019. Nondispositive Motions due by 3/13/2020. Threshold Motions due by 4/3/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 4/3/2020. (CS) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
80 More Docket Entries
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Weil McLain Company identifying Corporate Parent SPX Corporation, Other Affiliate The Marley Company, LLC, Other Affiliate The Marley-Wylain Company for Weil McLain Company.. (Mohr, Jason) (Entered: 07/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Riley Power, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Babcock Power Inc. for Riley Power, Inc... (Mohr, Jason) (Entered: 07/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER for Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting and Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference, and ORDER regarding resolution of Discovery Disputes by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Scheduling Conference set for 8/20/2019 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. (AS) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Industrial Holdings Corporation. (Wells, Roland) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Roland John Wells, III on behalf of Industrial Holdings Corporation (Wells, Roland) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Building Sprinkler Company, Inc.. (Neubauer, Heather) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by AWT Air Company, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Aqua Alliance Inc., Other Affiliate Research-Cottrell, Inc. for AWT Air Company, Inc... (Brotten, Elizabeth) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by A.W. Kuettel & Sons, Inc.. (Brotten, Elizabeth) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Goodin Company. (Brotten, Elizabeth) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Building Sprinkler Company, Inc. from Cass County District Court, case number 09-2018-CV-02167. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 319000409 filed by Building Sprinkler Company, Inc.(Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Defendants Listed by Counsel, #3 Affidavit of Counsel, Heather H. Neubauer and State Court Records Part 1 of 10 (Exhibits 1 - 58), #4 State Court Records Part 2 of 10 (Exhibits 59 - 101), #5 State Court Records Part 3 of 10 (Exhibits 102 - 134), #6 State Court Records Part 4 of 10 (Exhibits 135 - 183), #7 State Court Records Part 5 of 10 (Exhibits 184 - 188), #8 State Court Records Part 6 of 10 (Exhibits 189 - 196), #9 State Court Records Part 7 of 10 (Exhibits 197 - 205), #10 State Court Records Part 8 of 10 (Exhibits 223 - 222), #11 State Court Records Part 9 of 10 (Exhibits 224 - 229), #12 State Court Records Part 10 of 10 (Exhibits 230 - 250))(js) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOS PRODUCTS COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Singer Safety Company is a litigant

Latest cases where UNITED CONVEYOR CORPORATION is a litigant