This case was last updated from PACER on 02/18/2020 at 08:02:09 (UTC).

Wallis v. TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 12/20/2019 Wallis filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Utah District. The Judge overseeing this case is Bruce S. Jenkins. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00148

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Utah District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Bruce S. Jenkins

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lauren Wallis

Defendants

Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc.

The Cooper Companies, Inc.

Teva Women's Health, Inc.

Teva Pharmaceutical USA

Coopersurgical, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Nancy A. Mismash

Attorney at ROBERT J DEBRY & ASSOCIATES

4252 S 700 E

Salt Lake City, UT 84107

Kara D. Hill

Attorney at POGUST MILLROOD LLC

161 Washington St, Ste 940

Conshohocken, PA 19428

Defendant Attorneys

Thomas G. McIntosh

Attorney at ULMER & BERNE LLP

600 Vine St, Ste 2800

Cincinnati, OH 45202

Frederick M. Erny

Attorney at ULMER & BERNE LLP

600 Vine St Ste 2800

Cincinnati, OH 45202

Tracy H. Fowler

Attorney at SNELL & WILMER LLP

15 W South Temple Ste 1200, Gateway Tower West

Salt Lake City, UT 84101

 

Court Documents

1 #2

Designation Form

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#8) NOTICE by COOPERSURGICAL, INC., TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC. re #1 Notice of Removal, Notice of Amendment to Notice of Removal to Attach Additional State Court Process, Pleadings and Orders (STURGES, GREGORY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/20/2019.] (Entered: 09/17/2018)

1 #3

Case Management Track Form

#2

(#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Identifying Corporate Parent THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC for COOPERSURGICAL, INC.; Corporate Parent TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS INDUSTRIES, LTD. for TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC.; Corporate Parent TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LIMITED for TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.; Corporate Parent TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. for TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC.. by COOPERSURGICAL, INC., TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC.(ahf, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/20/2019.] (Entered: 09/17/2018)

#3

(#3) ANSWER to Complaint by TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC..(STURGES, GREGORY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/20/2019.] (Entered: 09/17/2018)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to Complaint by TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC..(STURGES, GREGORY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/20/2019.] (Entered: 09/17/2018)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint by TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC..(STURGES, GREGORY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/20/2019.] (Entered: 09/17/2018)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to Complaint by THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC..(STURGES, GREGORY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/20/2019.] (Entered: 09/17/2018)

#55

(#55) STATUS REPORT (Joint) by Coopersurgical, Inc., Teva Women's Health, Inc., The Cooper Companies, Inc.. (Fowler, Tracy) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

#54

(#54) ORDER granting #52 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Frederick M. Erny for Coopersurgical, Inc.,Frederick M. Erny for Teva Women's Health, Inc.,Frederick M. Erny for The Cooper Companies, Inc.. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Judge Bruce S. Jenkins on 1/30/20. (jmr) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

52 #2

Exhibit B - ECF Form

52 #1

Exhibit A - PHV Application Erny

#52

(#52) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Frederick M. Erny , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3473960, filed by Defendants Coopersurgical, Inc., Teva Women's Health, Inc., The Cooper Companies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - PHV Application Erny, #2 Exhibit B - ECF Form, #3 Text of Proposed Order Granting PHV Motion)(Fowler, Tracy) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

52 #3

Text of Proposed Order Granting PHV Motion

51 #1

Exhibit A - PHV Application McIntosh

51 #3

Text of Proposed Order re PHV Motion

51 #2

Exhibit B - ECF Form

86 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2020
  • Docket(#56) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Bruce S. Jenkins: Status Conference held on 2/4/2020. Detailed minute entry to follow pending Judge Jenkins' approval. Motion Hearing set for 3/16/2020 at 10:00 AM in Rm 7.200 before Judge Bruce S. Jenkins. Attorney for Plaintiff: Nancy Mismash, Kara Hill by telephone, Attorney for Defendant: Tracy Fowler, Thomas McIntosh and Frederick Erny by telephone. Court Reporter: Lindsay Payeur.(Time Start: 1:29, Time End: 1:38, Room 7.200.)(las) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) STATUS REPORT (Joint) by Coopersurgical, Inc., Teva Women's Health, Inc., The Cooper Companies, Inc.. (Fowler, Tracy) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) ORDER granting #52 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Frederick M. Erny for Coopersurgical, Inc.,Frederick M. Erny for Teva Women's Health, Inc.,Frederick M. Erny for The Cooper Companies, Inc.. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Judge Bruce S. Jenkins on 1/30/20. (jmr) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) ORDER granting #51 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Thomas G. McIntosh for Coopersurgical, Inc.,Thomas G. McIntosh for Teva Women's Health, Inc.,Thomas G. McIntosh for The Cooper Companies, Inc.. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Judge Bruce S. Jenkins on 1/30/20. (jmr) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Frederick M. Erny , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3473960, filed by Defendants Coopersurgical, Inc., Teva Women's Health, Inc., The Cooper Companies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - PHV Application Erny, #2 Exhibit B - ECF Form, #3 Text of Proposed Order Granting PHV Motion)(Fowler, Tracy) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Thomas G. McIntosh , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3473939, filed by Defendants Coopersurgical, Inc., Teva Women's Health, Inc., The Cooper Companies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - PHV Application McIntosh, #2 Exhibit B - ECF Form, #3 Text of Proposed Order re PHV Motion)(Fowler, Tracy) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) NOTICE of Appearance by Tracy H. Fowler on behalf of Coopersurgical, Inc., Teva Women's Health, Inc., The Cooper Companies, Inc. (Fowler, Tracy) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) ORDER granting #48 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kara D. Hill for Lauren Wallis. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Judge Bruce S. Jenkins on 1/21/20. (jmr) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kara D. Hill , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3466703, filed by Plaintiff Lauren Wallis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -Application, #2 Exhibit B -ECF Registration, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Mismash, Nancy) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) NOTICE of Appearance by Nancy A. Mismash on behalf of Lauren Wallis (Mismash, Nancy) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Hearing: STATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR 10/16/2018 09:30 AM IN JUDGE BARTLE'S CHAMBERS BEFORE HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE III.(km, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/20/2019.] (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER TO HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III FOR ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS, AS RELATED TO NICHOLLE BARCELO V. TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., ET AL., C.A. NO. 18-CV-3984.. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 9/18/2018. 9/19/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/20/2019.] (Entered: 09/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE by COOPERSURGICAL, INC., TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC. re #1 Notice of Removal, Notice of Amendment to Notice of Removal to Attach Additional State Court Process, Pleadings and Orders (STURGES, GREGORY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/20/2019.] (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ANSWER to Complaint by COOPERSURGICAL, INC..(STURGES, GREGORY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/20/2019.] (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ANSWER to Complaint by THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC..(STURGES, GREGORY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/20/2019.] (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ANSWER to Complaint by TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC..(STURGES, GREGORY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/20/2019.] (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ANSWER to Complaint by TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC..(STURGES, GREGORY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/20/2019.] (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ANSWER to Complaint by TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC..(STURGES, GREGORY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/20/2019.] (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Identifying Corporate Parent THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC for COOPERSURGICAL, INC.; Corporate Parent TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS INDUSTRIES, LTD. for TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC.; Corporate Parent TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LIMITED for TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.; Corporate Parent TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. for TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC.. by COOPERSURGICAL, INC., TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC.(ahf, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/20/2019.] (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by COOPERSURGICAL, INC., TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC. from Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County, case number 180300601. Certificate of Service. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 184812) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Case Management Track Form)(ahf) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/20/2019.] (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.