This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/28/2021 at 07:20:52 (UTC).

Wallace v. Oklahoma County Sheriff's Office et al

Case Summary

On 12/30/2020 Wallace filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Oklahoma County Sheriff's Office. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Scott L. Palk and Suzanne Mitchell. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-01305

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Scott L. Palk

Referral Judge

Suzanne Mitchell

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Eugene Evans Wallace, IV

Defendants

Oklahoma County Sheriff's Office

Oklahoma County Jail

 

Court Documents

#10

9 #3

Envelope

9 #2

Attachment 2 - Account

9 #1

Attachment 1 - Letter

#9

8 #1

Envelope

#8

#7

6 #3

Envelope

6 #2

Appendix 2 - Transaction List

6 #1

Appendix 1 - Letter

#6

5 #2

Envelope

5 #1

Attachment 1 - Letter

#5

#4

#3

1 #1

Envelope

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff shall pay an initial partial filing fee of $45.20 on or before 3/15/21. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 2/22/21. (lb) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Eugene Evans Wallace, IV. Motions referred to Suzanne Mitchell. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Letter, #2 Attachment 2 - Account, #3 Envelope)(kmt) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Change of Address by Eugene Evans Wallace, IV (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kmt) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER regarding #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff shall cure the deficiency by 2/16/21. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 1/25/21. (lb) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Eugene Evans Wallace, IV. Motions referred to Suzanne Mitchell. (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1 - Letter, #2 Appendix 2 - Transaction List, #3 Envelope)(kmt) (File stamp replaced on 1/27/2021 to correct Deputy Clerk error) (kmt). (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Change of Address by Eugene Evans Wallace, IV (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Letter, #2 Envelope)(knt) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER to Cure Deficiency by 1/26/21. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 1/5/21. (lb) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Mailing LCvR5.4/Change of Address form, #1 Complaint, and #3 Enter Order Referring Case to: Eugene Evans Wallace, IV#859689SAYRE-NFCC1605 E MainSayre, OK 73662 (kmt) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ENTER ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell. Signed by the direction of Honorable Scott L. Palk on 12/30/20. (kmt) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NO PREVIOUS Cases (kmt) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Oklahoma County Jail, Oklahoma County Sheriff's Office filed by Eugene Evans Wallace, IV. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kmt) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less