This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/28/2021 at 07:20:52 (UTC).

Wallace v. Oklahoma County Sheriff's Office et al

Case Summary

On 12/30/2020 Wallace filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Oklahoma County Sheriff's Office. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Scott L. Palk and Suzanne Mitchell. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-01305

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Courthouse:

    Oklahoma Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Scott L. Palk

Referral Judge

Suzanne Mitchell

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Eugene Evans Wallace, IV

Sayre, OK 73662

Defendants

Oklahoma County Sheriff's Office

Oklahoma County Jail

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff shall pay an initial partial filing fee of $45.20 on or before 3/15/21. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 2/22/21. (lb) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

9 #3

Envelope

9 #2

Attachment 2 - Account

9 #1

Attachment 1 - Letter

#9

(#9) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Eugene Evans Wallace, IV. Motions referred to Suzanne Mitchell. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Letter, #2 Attachment 2 - Account, #3 Envelope)(kmt) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

8 #1

Envelope

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Change of Address by Eugene Evans Wallace, IV (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kmt) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

#7

(#7) ORDER regarding #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff shall cure the deficiency by 2/16/21. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 1/25/21. (lb) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

6 #3

Envelope

6 #2

Appendix 2 - Transaction List

6 #1

Appendix 1 - Letter

#6

(#6) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Eugene Evans Wallace, IV. Motions referred to Suzanne Mitchell. (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1 - Letter, #2 Appendix 2 - Transaction List, #3 Envelope)(kmt) (File stamp replaced on 1/27/2021 to correct Deputy Clerk error) (kmt). (Entered: 01/22/2021)

5 #2

Envelope

5 #1

Attachment 1 - Letter

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Change of Address by Eugene Evans Wallace, IV (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Letter, #2 Envelope)(knt) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

#4

(#4) ORDER to Cure Deficiency by 1/26/21. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 1/5/21. (lb) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

#3

(#3) ENTER ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell. Signed by the direction of Honorable Scott L. Palk on 12/30/20. (kmt) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

1 #1

Envelope

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff shall pay an initial partial filing fee of $45.20 on or before 3/15/21. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 2/22/21. (lb) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Eugene Evans Wallace, IV. Motions referred to Suzanne Mitchell. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Letter, #2 Attachment 2 - Account, #3 Envelope)(kmt) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Change of Address by Eugene Evans Wallace, IV (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kmt) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER regarding #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff shall cure the deficiency by 2/16/21. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 1/25/21. (lb) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Eugene Evans Wallace, IV. Motions referred to Suzanne Mitchell. (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1 - Letter, #2 Appendix 2 - Transaction List, #3 Envelope)(kmt) (File stamp replaced on 1/27/2021 to correct Deputy Clerk error) (kmt). (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Change of Address by Eugene Evans Wallace, IV (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Letter, #2 Envelope)(knt) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER to Cure Deficiency by 1/26/21. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 1/5/21. (lb) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Mailing LCvR5.4/Change of Address form, #1 Complaint, and #3 Enter Order Referring Case to: Eugene Evans Wallace, IV#859689SAYRE-NFCC1605 E MainSayre, OK 73662 (kmt) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ENTER ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell. Signed by the direction of Honorable Scott L. Palk on 12/30/20. (kmt) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NO PREVIOUS Cases (kmt) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Oklahoma County Jail, Oklahoma County Sheriff's Office filed by Eugene Evans Wallace, IV. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kmt) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OKLAHOMA COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE is a litigant